Traxcell Technologies, LLC. v. Google LLC
Plaintiff: Traxcell Technologies LLC
Defendant: Google LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv04807
Filed: August 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2022 Filing 60 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING MOTION HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Please take notice the hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No. #31 ) and the initial case management conference are continued to November 3, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, Courtroom 8, 19th Floor in San Francisco. Joint case management conference statement shall be filed by October 27, 2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2022)
September 20, 2022 Filing 59 NOTICE by Google LLC of Hearing On Motion to Dismiss Traxcell's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) (Caine, David) (Filed on 9/20/2022)
September 8, 2022 Filing 58 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Lee, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/8/2022)
September 6, 2022 Filing 57 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/22/2022. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 9/29/2022 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc Court Appearances: A dvanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than noon on 9/28/2022.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2022)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 9/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2022)
September 6, 2022 Filing 55 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2022)
September 6, 2022 Filing 54 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Google LLC.. (Caine, David) (Filed on 9/6/2022)
August 23, 2022 Filing 53 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/6/2022. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2022)
August 23, 2022 Filing 52 CLERK'S NOTICE ON REASSIGNMENT. You are noticed that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Laurel Beeler upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Laurel Beeler's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/1/2022 at 9:30 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2022. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb General Ord er 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2022)
August 22, 2022 Filing 51 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/24/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/1/2022 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2022)
August 22, 2022 Filing 50 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 6:21-cv-01312. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING #38 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (zv)
August 15, 2022 Filing 48 Joint Claim Construction Brief or Statement by TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC.. (Ramey, William)
August 11, 2022 Filing 47 SurReply Claim Construction Brief regarding #45 Brief by TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ramey, William)
August 4, 2022 Filing 46 STATUS REPORT ON MOTION TO TRANSFER re #38 by Google LLC. (Thompson, G.) Modified on 8/5/2022 to link to Motion (zv).
July 21, 2022 Filing 45 BRIEF Reply Claim Construction Brief re #44 by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Assad H. Rajani, #2 Exhibit 22)(Mann, J.) Modified on 7/21/2022 to link to previous claim construction(zv).
June 30, 2022 Filing 44 BRIEF Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction by TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Mitch Harris, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Ramey, William)
June 9, 2022 Filing 43 BRIEF Opening Claim Construction Brief by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Assad H. Rajani, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21)(Thompson, G.)
May 18, 2022 Filing 42 NOTICE of Venue Discovery by TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. re #38 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California Pursuant to 1404(a) (Ramey, William)
May 18, 2022 Filing 41 NOTICE Regarding Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Pursuant to 1404(a) re #38 by Google LLC (Thompson, G.) Modified on 5/18/2022 linked to Motion (zv).
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING #37 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (zv)
May 3, 2022 Filing 39 Sealed Document: Sealed Exhibit 9 of #38 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California Pursuant to 1404(a) by Google LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9) (Mann, J.)
May 3, 2022 Filing 38 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California Pursuant to 1404(a) by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Y. Chen, #2 Declaration of Kathleen M. McCarte, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Proposed Order)(Mann, J.)
May 2, 2022 Filing 37 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Thompson, G.)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING #34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kathleen McCarte. Attorney added for Google LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot1)
April 28, 2022 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Google LLC, re #31 MOTION to Dismiss Traxcell's Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Google LLC (Mann, J.)
April 28, 2022 Filing 34 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Mark Mann for Kathleen McCarte ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15975337) by on behalf of Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mann, J.)
April 21, 2022 Filing 33 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC., re #31 MOTION to Dismiss Traxcell's Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Google LLC (Ramey, William)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright.
April 7, 2022 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss Traxcell's Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) re #23 by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Assad H. Rajani, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Mann, J.)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING #28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David A. Caine. Attorney added for Google LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot1)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Assad H. Rajani. Attorney added for Google LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot1)
March 23, 2022 Filing 28 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Mark Mann for David A. Caine ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15846139) by on behalf of Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mann, J.) (Main Document 28 replaced on 3/23/2022) (zv). (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/23/2022) (zv). Modified on 3/23/2022 to flatten documents (zv).
March 23, 2022 Filing 27 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Mark Mann for Assad H. Rajani ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15846065) by on behalf of Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mann, J.)
March 10, 2022 Parties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated #standing orders and # COVID-19 standing order available by clicking the included hyperlinks. The updated orders are as follows:1. #Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness for Patent Cases 030722,2. #Standing Order on Pretrial Procedures and Requirements in Civil Cases 030722,3. #Standing Order Governing Proceedings 4.0 - Patent Cases 030722,4. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Coronavirus (COVID-19) and Court Proceedings,5. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Joint Or Unopposed Request To Change Deadlines 030722,6. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal and Redacted Public Versions 030722. (jkda)
March 9, 2022 Reset Deadlines: Google LLC answer due 4/7/2022. (zv)
March 9, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE (Unopposed) of Stipulation Regarding Time for Google LLC to Respond to Traxcell Technologies, LLC's Amended Complaint by Google LLC (Samartino, Mark)
March 3, 2022 Filing 25 ATTACHMENT to #24 Response to Motion by TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC.. (Ramey, William)
March 3, 2022 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #24 Response to Motion. Per Standing Order, Proposed Orders cannot have the word "Proposed" in the title of the Order. Please refile only using event attachment and link to the Response to Motion. Thank you. (zv)
March 2, 2022 Filing 24 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC., re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) filed by Defendant Google LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ramey, William)
March 2, 2022 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Google LLC amending #1 , filed by TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US10820147)(Ramey, William) Modified on 3/3/2022 to link to original complaint (zv).
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Markman Hearing set for 9/1/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Joinder of Parties due by 10/6/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 12/22/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 6/8/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 8/10/2023 before Judge Alan D Albright. Jury Selection set for 8/31/2023 before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Jury Trial set for 8/31/2023 before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (zv)
February 24, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Extension to Respond to Motion to Dismiss by TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (Ramey, William)
February 24, 2022 Filing 20 Proposed Scheduling Order correcting #19 by TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC.. (Ramey, William) Modified on 2/24/2022 (lad).
February 24, 2022 Filing 19 Proposed Scheduling Order by TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC.. (Ramey, William)
February 24, 2022 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #19 Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Proceedings dated 10/08/2021. The Proposed Order shall omit the word "Proposed" from the title. Please refile the corrected Order using the attachment event and link it to the Proposed Scheduling Order #19 . Thank you. (zv)
February 2, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE UNOPPOSED FOR EXT OF TIME TO RSPD TO MTD by TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (Ramey, William)
January 27, 2022 Filing 17 STATUS REPORT Case Readiness by TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC.. (Ramey, William)
January 24, 2022 Filing 16 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Google LLC. (Mann, J.)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark J. Samartino. Attorney added for Google LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jzda)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael A. Berta. Attorney added for Google LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jzda)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nicholas H. Lee. Attorney added for Google LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jzda)
January 20, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mann, J.)
January 19, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Mark Mann for Mark J. Samartino ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15627191) by on behalf of Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mann, J.)
January 19, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Mark Mann for Michael A. Berta ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15627159) by on behalf of Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mann, J.)
January 19, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Mark Mann for Nicholas H. Lee ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15627120) by on behalf of Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mann, J.)
January 7, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Google LLC (Mann, J.)
January 7, 2022 Reset Deadlines: Google LLC answer due 1/20/2022. (ir)
January 3, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Mark Mann on behalf of Google LLC. Attorney J. Mark Mann added to party Google LLC(pty:dft) (Mann, J.)
January 3, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by G. Blake Thompson on behalf of Google LLC. Attorney G. Blake Thompson added to party Google LLC(pty:dft) (Thompson, G.)
December 21, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC.. Google LLC served on 12/20/2021, answer due 1/10/2022. (Ramey, William)
December 16, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Google LLC. (lad)
December 16, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC.. (Ramey, William)
December 16, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William) (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/16/2021) (lad).
December 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15544246), filed by TRAXCELL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US10820147, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramey, William) (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/16/2021) (lad).
December 16, 2021 All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad)
December 16, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Traxcell Technologies, LLC. v. Google LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Traxcell Technologies LLC
Represented By: Donald H. Mahoney, III
Represented By: William P. Ramey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: J. Mark Mann
Represented By: Assad H. Rajani
Represented By: David A. Caine
Represented By: Kathleen M. Mccarte
Represented By: Mark J. Samartino
Represented By: Michael A. Berta
Represented By: Nicholas H. Lee
Represented By: G. Blake Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?