Greeson et al v. Quicken Loans Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tami Greeson and Steven Greeson
Defendant: Quicken Loans Inc., Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Indenture Trustee, on Behalf of the Holders of the Terwin Mortgage Trust 2006-8, Asset-Backed Securities, Series 2006-8, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC and Affinia Default Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv04877
Filed: August 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by Steven Greeson, Tami Greeson (Estavillo, Jason) (Filed on 10/10/2022)
October 6, 2022 Filing 27 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Steven Greeson, Tami Greeson. (Estavillo, Jason) (Filed on 10/6/2022)
October 4, 2022 Filing 26 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING THE MOTION TO DISMISS HEARING TO BE HEARD WITH THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON 10/27/2022. Motion Hearing set for 10/27/2022, 01:00 PM, in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2022)
September 26, 2022 Filing 25 REPLY (re #15 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byDeutsche Bank National Trust Company as Indenture Trustee, on Behalf of the Holders of the Terwin Mortgage Trust 2006-8, Asset-Backed Securities, Series 2006-8, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Morris, Darlene) (Filed on 9/26/2022)
September 22, 2022 Filing 24 Declaration of Scott King in Support of #22 First MOTION for Summary Judgment , #23 Request for Judicial Notice, filed byQuicken Loans Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Note: Mortgage Loan with Quicken Loans Inc., #2 Exhibit Deed of Trust, #3 Exhibit redacted copy of the Funding Memo, #4 Exhibit redacted copy of the Trade Confirmation, #5 Exhibit Notice of Assignment, Sale or Transfer of Servicing Rights)(Related document(s) #22 , #23 ) (Whittemore, Brian) (Filed on 9/22/2022)
September 22, 2022 Filing 23 Request for Judicial Notice re #22 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byQuicken Loans Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Discharge of Debtor, #2 Exhibit Assignment of Deed of Trust)(Related document(s) #22 ) (Whittemore, Brian) (Filed on 9/22/2022)
September 22, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Points and Authorities filed by Quicken Loans Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/27/2022 01:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 10/6/2022. Replies due by 10/13/2022. (Whittemore, Brian) (Filed on 9/22/2022)
September 20, 2022 Filing 21 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #15 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed bySteven Greeson, Tami Greeson. (Estavillo, Jason) (Filed on 9/20/2022)
September 15, 2022 Filing 20 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2022, 01:00 PM, via Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearance s: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Wednesday, November 23, 2022. by 10:00 a.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2022)
September 13, 2022 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by Quicken Loans Inc. Identifying Corporate Parent Rocket Mortgage, LLC for Quicken Loans Inc.. re #18 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Rocket Mortgage, LLC (erroneously sued herein as Quicken Loans Inc.) (Isola, Peter) (Filed on 9/13/2022) Modified on 9/13/2022 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2022 Filing 18 Rocket Mortgage, LLC (erroneously sued herein as Quicken Loans Inc.) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byQuicken Loans Inc.. (Isola, Peter) (Filed on 9/13/2022)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria denying #7 and #10 Ex Parte Application For Temporary Restraining Order To Cancel And Enjoin The Sale Scheduled For September 8, 2022 And Order To Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction. (vclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2022)
September 6, 2022 Filing 16 Request for Judicial Notice re #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed byDeutsche Bank National Trust Company as Indenture Trustee, on Behalf of the Holders of the Terwin Mortgage Trust 2006-8, Asset-Backed Securities, Series 2006-8, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2006 Note, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2006 DOT, #3 Exhibit 3 - Modification Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 - Ch. 13 BK Petition, #5 Exhibit 5 - Discharge of Debtor, #6 Exhibit 6 - Assignment of DOT, #7 Exhibit 7 - Plaintiff's Dispute of Debts, #8 Exhibit 8 - Wrong Address for QWR, #9 Exhibit 9 - Response to Plaintiff's Dispute, #10 Exhibit 10 - Substitution of Trustee, #11 Exhibit 11 - Notice of Default, #12 Exhibit 12 - Notice of Trustee's Sale)(Related document(s) #15 ) (Morris, Darlene) (Filed on 9/6/2022)
September 6, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Indenture Trustee, on Behalf of the Holders of the Terwin Mortgage Trust 2006-8, Asset-Backed Securities, Series 2006-8, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/13/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 9/20/2022. Replies due by 9/27/2022. (Morris, Darlene) (Filed on 9/6/2022)
September 6, 2022 Filing 14 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #10 Second Ex Parte Application In Support Of Ex Parte Application For Temporary Restraining Order To Cancel And Enjoin The Sale Scheduled For September 8, 2022 And Order To Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction (with corrected counsel and notice) ) filed byDeutsche Bank National Trust Company as Indenture Trustee, on Behalf of the Holders of the Terwin Mortgage Trust 2006-8, Asset-Backed Securities, Series 2006-8, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cynthia Wallace, #2 Exhibit 1 - 2006 Note, #3 Exhibit 2 - 2006 DOT, #4 Exhibit 3 - Service Transfer, #5 Exhibit 4 - Loan Mod Agreement, #6 Exhibit 5 - Ch. 13 BK Petition, #7 Exhibit 6 - Discharge of Debtor, #8 Exhibit 7 - 2018 Mortgage Interest Statement, #9 Exhibit 8 - Breach Letter, #10 Exhibit 9 - Assignment of DOT, #11 Exhibit 10 - Plaintiff's Dispute of Debt, #12 Exhibit 11 - Wrong Address for QWR, #13 Exhibit 12 - Response to Plaintiff's Dispute, #14 Exhibit 13 - Post Referral Solicitation Letter, #15 Exhibit 14 - Substitution of Trustee, #16 Exhibit 15 - Notice of Default, #17 Exhibit 16 - Notice of Trustee's Sale, #18 Exhibit 17 - SPOC Letter, #19 Exhibit 18 - Payoff Statement, #20 Exhibit 19 - Load Mod Offer Letter)(Morris, Darlene) (Filed on 9/6/2022)
September 3, 2022 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Steven Greeson, Tami Greeson re #12 Order re Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Supplement Order on Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order)(Estavillo, Jason) (Filed on 9/3/2022)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #10 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 09/02/2022. (vclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2022)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 09/01/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2022)
September 1, 2022 Filing 10 Second Ex Parte Application In Support Of Ex Parte Application For Temporary Restraining Order To Cancel And Enjoin The Sale Scheduled For September 8, 2022 And Order To Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction (with corrected counsel and notice) filed by Steven Greeson, Tami Greeson. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Of Ex Parte Application For Temporary Restraining Order To Cancel And Enjoin The Sale Scheduled For September 8, 2022 And Order To Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction, #2 Declaration of Tami Greeson In Support Of Ex Parte Application For Temporary Restraining Order To Cancel And Enjoin The Sale Scheduled For September 8, 2022 And Order To Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction, #3 Declaration of Maria Yolanda Lepe In Support Of Ex Parte Application For Temporary Restraining Order To Cancel And Enjoin The Sale Scheduled For September 8, 2022 And Order To Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction, #4 Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Application For Temporary Restraining Order To Cancel And Enjoin The Sale Scheduled For September 8, 2022 And Order To Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Estavillo, Jason) (Filed on 9/1/2022)
September 1, 2022 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2022)
August 31, 2022 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs and Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/7/2022. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2022)
August 31, 2022 Filing 7 Ex Parte Application filed by Steven Greeson, Tami Greeson. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Ex Parte Application For Temporary Restraining Order To Cancel And Enjoin The Sale Scheduled For September 8, 2022 And Order To Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction, #2 Declaration Declaration of Tami Greeson In Support Of Ex Parte Application For Temporary Restraining Order To Cancel And Enjoin The Sale Scheduled For September 8, 2022 And Order To Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction, #3 Declaration Declaration of Maria Yolanda Lepe In Support Of Ex Parte Application For Temporary Restraining Order To Cancel And Enjoin The Sale Scheduled For September 8, 2022 And Order To Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Application For Temporary Restraining Order To Cancel And Enjoin The Sale Scheduled For September 8, 2022 And Order To Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Estavillo, Jason) (Filed on 8/31/2022)
August 26, 2022 Filing 6 Joinder re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Quicken Loans Inc.. (Morris, Darlene) (Filed on 8/26/2022)
August 25, 2022 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/22/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/29/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2022)
August 25, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Indenture Trustee, on Behalf of the Holders of the Terwin Mortgage Trust 2006-8, Asset-Backed Securities, Series 2006-8, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC (Morris, Darlene) (Filed on 8/25/2022)
August 25, 2022 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/8/2022. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2022)
August 25, 2022 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Indenture Trustee, on Behalf of the Holders of the Terwin Mortgage Trust 2006-8, Asset-Backed Securities, Series 2006-8, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC (Morris, Darlene) (Filed on 8/25/2022)
August 25, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Action Based on Federal Question Jurisdiction from Contra Costa County Superior Court. Their case number is C22-01671. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number ACANDC-17478201). Filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Indenture Trustee, on Behalf of the Holders of the Terwin Mortgage Trust 2006-8, Asset-Backed Securities, Series 2006-8, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Morris, Darlene) (Filed on 8/25/2022) Modified on 8/25/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greeson et al v. Quicken Loans Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tami Greeson
Represented By: Elizabeth Brand Cermak
Represented By: Jason W. Estavillo
Represented By: Allison Cecchini Erggelet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Greeson
Represented By: Allison Cecchini Erggelet
Represented By: Elizabeth Brand Cermak
Represented By: Jason W. Estavillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans Inc.
Represented By: Brian Stratton Whittemore
Represented By: Peter L. Isola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Indenture Trustee, on Behalf of the Holders of the Terwin Mortgage Trust 2006-8, Asset-Backed Securities, Series 2006-8
Represented By: Darlene M Morris
Represented By: Robert Wayne Norman, Jr.
Represented By: Darlene M. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Darlene M Morris
Represented By: Darlene M. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affinia Default Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?