Center For Biological Diversity et al v. U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service et al
Plaintiff: Center For Biological Diversity, Environmental Protection Information Center and Klamath-Siskiyou Wildlands Center
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, Martha Williams and Debra Haaland
Case Number: 3:2022cv05216
Filed: September 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Referring Judge: Trina L Thompson
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16 U.S.C. ยง 1538 Endangered Species Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Center For Biological Diversity, Klamath-Siskiyou Wildlands Center, Environmental Protection Information Center. All Defendants. (Segee, Brian) (Filed on 9/27/2022)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order by Judge Trina L. Thompson granting #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Kristine Akland. (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2022)
September 14, 2022 Filing 12 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Trina L. Thompson upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Thompson's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov.Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2022 at 02:00 PM by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at tltcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Monday, December 12, 2022 by no later than 12:00 p.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2022)
September 14, 2022 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Debra Haaland, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, Martha Williams, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2022)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Trina L. Thompson for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Signed by The Clerk on 09/14/2022. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2022)
September 13, 2022 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2022)
September 13, 2022 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Center For Biological Diversity, Environmental Protection Information Center, Klamath-Siskiyou Wildlands Center.. (Segee, Brian) (Filed on 9/13/2022)
September 13, 2022 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Segee, Brian) (Filed on 9/13/2022)
September 13, 2022 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/14/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/21/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2022)
September 13, 2022 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/27/2022. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2022)
September 13, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17528992.) filed by Center For Biological Diversity, Environmental Protection Information Center, Klamath-Siskiyou Wildlands Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit good standing cert)(Akland, Kristine) (Filed on 9/13/2022)
September 13, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Center For Biological Diversity, Environmental Protection Information Center, Klamath-Siskiyou Wildlands Center (Segee, Brian) (Filed on 9/13/2022)
September 13, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Segee, Brian) (Filed on 9/13/2022)
September 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17528757.). Filed byCenter For Biological Diversity, Klamath-Siskiyou Wildlands Center, Environmental Protection Information Center. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Segee, Brian) (Filed on 9/13/2022)
September 13, 2022 #Electronic filing error. ONLY ONE SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED PER CASE, USE AN ATTACHMENT TO SUMMONS IF NEEDED TO LIST ADDITIONAL DEFENDANTS INFORMATION [err201]This filing will not be p rocessed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by Klamath-Siskiyou Wildlands Center, Environmental Protection Information Center, Center For Biological Diversity (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center For Biological Diversity et al v. U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center For Biological Diversity
Represented By: Kristine M. Akland
Represented By: Brian P. Segee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Environmental Protection Information Center
Represented By: Kristine M. Akland
Represented By: Brian P. Segee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Klamath-Siskiyou Wildlands Center
Represented By: Kristine M. Akland
Represented By: Brian P. Segee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Haaland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?