Bhonopha v. L'Oreal U.S.A., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rugieyatu Bhonopha
Defendant: L'Oreal U.S.A., Inc., L'Oreal U.S.A. Products, Inc., Strength of Nature Global, LLC, Dabur International LTD, Dabur USA, Inc. and Namaste Laboratories, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv06395
Filed: October 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2022 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rugieyatu Bhonopha. Strength of Nature Global, LLC served on 12/9/2022, answer due 12/30/2022. (Baskin, James) (Filed on 12/13/2022)
December 13, 2022 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rugieyatu Bhonopha. Dabur International LTD served on 12/8/2022, answer due 12/29/2022. (Baskin, James) (Filed on 12/13/2022)
December 13, 2022 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rugieyatu Bhonopha. Namaste Laboratories, LLC served on 12/9/2022, answer due 12/30/2022. (Baskin, James) (Filed on 12/13/2022)
December 13, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rugieyatu Bhonopha. Dabur USA, Inc. served on 12/8/2022, answer due 12/29/2022; L'Oreal U.S.A. Products, Inc. served on 12/8/2022, answer due 12/29/2022; L'Oreal U.S.A., Inc. served on 12/8/2022, answer due 12/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Executed Summons, #2 Executed Summons)(Baskin, James) (Filed on 12/13/2022)
December 5, 2022 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference is reset for 1/19/2023 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley via a Zoom webinar. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/12/2023.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than noon on 1/18/2023.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2 022)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 12/05/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2022)
December 5, 2022 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2022)
December 5, 2022 Filing 11 Notice of Motion Filed in MDL 3060 In re: Hair Relaxer Products Liability Litigation. Movants Jenny Mitchell, Rugieyatu Bhonopha, Diane Grant, and Bernadette Gordon Motion to Transfer Actions to the Northern District of Illinois pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2022)
December 1, 2022 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Dabur International LTD, Dabur USA, Inc., L'Oreal U.S.A. Products, Inc., L'Oreal U.S.A., Inc., Namaste Laboratories, LLC, Strength of Nature Global, LLC. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2022)
December 1, 2022 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Parties to Serve Summons)(Baskin, James) (Filed on 12/1/2022)
December 1, 2022 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Baskin, James) (Filed on 12/1/2022)
November 28, 2022 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Rugieyatu Bhonopha.. (Baskin, James) (Filed on 11/28/2022)
November 15, 2022 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/29/2022. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2022)
October 25, 2022 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING: Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/19/2023 at 9:30 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 1/12/2023. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2022)
October 25, 2022 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/12/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/19/2023 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2022)
October 25, 2022 Filing 3 Erroneous Entry--Please Ignore--See Corrected Document Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/12/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/19/2022 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2022) Modified on 10/25/2022 (msr, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2022 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/8/2022. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2022)
October 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17654209.). Filed byRugieyatu Bhonopha. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Baskin, James) (Filed on 10/21/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bhonopha v. L'Oreal U.S.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rugieyatu Bhonopha
Represented By: James D. Baskin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L'Oreal U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L'Oreal U.S.A. Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strength of Nature Global, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dabur International LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dabur USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Namaste Laboratories, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?