Gemaehlich et al v.Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Keith Gemaehlich and Betty Gemaehlich
Defendant: AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, a subsidiary of AMPCO-PITTSBURGH CORPORATION, individually and as successor by merger to BUFFALO PUMPS, INC., individually and successor in interest to BUFFALO FORGE, Albay Construction Company, ALFA LAVAL, INC., individually and as successor in interest to THE DELAVAL SEPARATOR COMPANY and SHARPLES CORPORATION, Aurora Pump Company, A.W. Chesterton Co., Bigge Crane and Rigging Co., BW/IP, INC., individually and as successor in interest to BYRON JACKSON PUMP CO., CALAVERAS NATURAL RESOURCES, INC., CINCINNATI VALVE COMPANY, individually and as successor to LUNKENHEIMER VALVES, CLA-VAL CO. a division of GRISWOLD INDUSTRIES, Crosby Valve, Inc., ELLIOTT COMPANY a/k/a ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY CO., INC., FLOWSERVE US INC., individually and as successor in interest to EDWARD VALVE, INC., FMC CORPORATION, individually and as successor in interest to NORTHERN PUMP COMPANY aka NORTHERN FIRE APPARATUS COMPANY, CHICAGO PUMP COMPANY AND PEERLESS PUMP COMPANY, FOSTER WHEELER, LLC as successor in interest to FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION and FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION, GARDNER DENVER, INC. f/k/a GARDNER DENVER MACHINERY, INC., General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps, Inc., GRINNELL LLC d/b/a GRINNELL CORPORATION, IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. sued individually and as successor-in-interest to DELAVAL STEAM TURBINE COMPANY and DELAVAL, INC., ITT LLC f/k/a ITT CORPORATION, f/k/a ITT INDUSTRIES, INC. individually and as successor-in-interest to BELL & GOSSETT COMPANY, FOSTER ENGINEERING COMPANY and KENNEDY VALVE COMPANY, John Crane Inc., J.T. THORPE & SON, INC., MAR-IND SUPPLY OF SAN DIEGO, METALCLAD INSULATION LLC f/k/a METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION aa NORTHERN CALIFORNIA INSULATION COMPANY, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, PARAMOUNT GLOBAL f/k/a VIACOMCBS INC. f/k/a CBS CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation, f/k/a VIACOM INC., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC, Performance Mechanical, Inc., Petrochem Insulation, Inc., REDCO CORPORATION f/k/a CRANE CO. f/k/a CRANE COMPANY and JENKINS VALVES, REDWOOD PAINTING CO., INC., Republic Supply Company of California, SOCO WEST, INC. f/k/a BRENNTAG WEST, INC. f/k/a SOCO-LYNCH CORPORATION successor in interest to WESTERN CHEMICAL & MANUFACTURING CO., SYD Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc., TEMPORARY PLANT CLEANERS, INC. individually and as successor in interest to PLANT MAINTENANCE INC. OF CALIFORNIA, Thomas A. Short Co., Union Carbide Corporation, Viking Pump, Inc., WARREN PUMPS, LLC f/k/a WARREN PUMPS, INC. individually and as successor in interest to QUIMBY PUMP COMPANY, DOES 1 through 400, Inclusive, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, PARAMOUNT GLOBAL and Calaveras Asbestos, LTD.
Case Number: 3:2022cv07518
Filed: November 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Referring Judge: Alex G Tse
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2023 Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Marshall Thacker on behalf of Viking Pump, Inc. (Thacker, Todd) (Filed on 1/24/2023)
January 24, 2023 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter K. Renstrom on behalf of Viking Pump, Inc. (Renstrom, Peter) (Filed on 1/24/2023)
January 23, 2023 Filing 98 NOTICE by REDCO CORPORATION f/k/a CRANE CO. f/k/a CRANE COMPANY and JENKINS VALVES of Withdrawal of Counsel (Goodrich, Christina) (Filed on 1/23/2023)
January 23, 2023 Filing 97 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE on March 3, 2023 before the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. VACATING MOTION TO REMAND hearing set for February 10, 2023 before the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. Motion Hearing set for 4/21/2023 10:00 AM in San Francisco - To be determined before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2023)
January 23, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #56 MOTION to Remand . Motion Hearing set for 4/21/2023 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco - To be determined before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2023)
January 19, 2023 Filing 96 Certificate of Interested Entities by Aurora Pump Company (Bellow, Rebecca) (Filed on 1/19/2023)
January 19, 2023 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by James G. Scadden (Scadden, James) (Filed on 1/19/2023)
January 19, 2023 Filing 94 NOTICE by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation Re-Filing State Court Answer to Complaint and State Court Jury Demand (Powell, Glen) (Filed on 1/19/2023)
January 19, 2023 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Glen R. Powell (Powell, Glen) (Filed on 1/19/2023)
January 19, 2023 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by Carla Lynn Crochet (Crochet, Carla) (Filed on 1/19/2023)
January 19, 2023 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy David Milbrodt (Milbrodt, Jeremy) (Filed on 1/19/2023)
January 19, 2023 Filing 90 DEFENDANT REDWOOD PAINTING CO., INC.S ANSWER to Complaint FOR PERSONAL INJURY-ASBESTOS byREDWOOD PAINTING CO., INC.. (Bernard, Randall) (Filed on 1/19/2023)
January 19, 2023 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall Keith Bernard for DEFENDANT REDWOOD PAINTING CO. (Bernard, Randall) (Filed on 1/19/2023)
January 19, 2023 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall Keith Bernard for DEFENDANT REPUBLIC SUPPLY COMPANY (Bernard, Randall) (Filed on 1/19/2023)
January 17, 2023 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Arpi Galfayan (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 1/17/2023)
January 11, 2023 Filing 86 Certificate of Interested Entities by CALAVERAS NATURAL RESOURCES, INC. identifying Other Affiliate Calaveras Asbestos, LTD. for CALAVERAS NATURAL RESOURCES, INC.. (Thompson, Hanna) (Filed on 1/11/2023)
January 11, 2023 Filing 85 Notice of Re-Filing State Court ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byCALAVERAS NATURAL RESOURCES, INC.. (Thompson, Hanna) (Filed on 1/11/2023)
January 11, 2023 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Hanna M. Thompson for Defendant Calaveras Natural Resources, Inc. (Thompson, Hanna) (Filed on 1/11/2023)
January 11, 2023 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie Leigh Ameele for Defendant Calaveras Natural Resources, Inc. (Ameele, Melanie) (Filed on 1/11/2023)
January 11, 2023 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie Leigh Ameele for Defendant Calaveras Asbestos, LTD. (Ameele, Melanie) (Filed on 1/11/2023)
January 10, 2023 Filing 81 Certificate of Interested Entities by Calaveras Asbestos, LTD. identifying Other Affiliate CALAVERAS NATURAL RESOURCES, INC. for Calaveras Asbestos, LTD.. (Thompson, Hanna) (Filed on 1/10/2023)
January 10, 2023 Filing 80 NOTICE OF RE-FILING STATE COURT ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byCalaveras Asbestos, LTD.. (Thompson, Hanna) (Filed on 1/10/2023)
January 10, 2023 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Hanna M. Thompson (Thompson, Hanna) (Filed on 1/10/2023)
January 9, 2023 Filing 78 REPLY (re #56 MOTION to Remand ) filed byBetty Gemaehlich, Keith Gemaehlich. (Parker, Josiah) (Filed on 1/9/2023)
January 9, 2023 Filing 77 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Dismiss Defendant Crosby Valve filed by Betty Gemaehlich, Keith Gemaehlich. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parker, Josiah) (Filed on 1/9/2023)
January 6, 2023 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey M. Davis of Damon M. Pitt (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 1/6/2023)
January 6, 2023 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey M. Davis of Christina N. Goodrich (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 1/6/2023)
December 30, 2022 Filing 74 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #56 MOTION to Remand ) filed byCrosby Valve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration and Exhibits)(Sharp, Andrew) (Filed on 12/30/2022)
December 29, 2022 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Livingston Sharp (Sharp, Andrew) (Filed on 12/29/2022)
December 21, 2022 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Viiu Spangler Khare (Khare, Viiu) (Filed on 12/21/2022)
December 21, 2022 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Davit Shanto (Shanto, Davit) (Filed on 12/21/2022)
December 21, 2022 Filing 70 Certificate of Interested Entities by J.T. THORPE & SON, INC. identifying Corporate Parent Terra Millennium Corporation, Corporate Parent J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc. for J.T. THORPE & SON, INC.. (Khare, Viiu) (Filed on 12/21/2022)
December 21, 2022 Filing 69 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by J.T. THORPE & SON, INC.. (Khare, Viiu) (Filed on 12/21/2022)
December 21, 2022 Filing 68 NOTICE by J.T. THORPE & SON, INC. of filing State Court Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Khare, Viiu) (Filed on 12/21/2022)
December 21, 2022 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven S. Spaulding for JTTS (Spaulding, Steven) (Filed on 12/21/2022)
December 19, 2022 Filing 66 Notice of Filing Answer to Removal Complaint for Personal Injury byAurora Pump Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bellow, Rebecca) (Filed on 12/19/2022)
December 19, 2022 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Anne Bellow counsel of record for Aurora Pump Company (Bellow, Rebecca) (Filed on 12/19/2022)
December 19, 2022 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Martinovich (Martinovich, Edward) (Filed on 12/19/2022)
December 19, 2022 Filing 63 Certificate of Interested Entities by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. sued individually and as successor-in-interest to DELAVAL STEAM TURBINE COMPANY and DELAVAL, INC. identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation, Corporate Parent Colfax Fluid Handling LLC, Corporate Parent IMO Holdings Inc for IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. sued individually and as successor-in-interest to DELAVAL STEAM TURBINE COMPANY and DELAVAL, INC.. (Martinovich, Edward) (Filed on 12/19/2022)
December 19, 2022 Filing 62 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byIMO INDUSTRIES, INC. sued individually and as successor-in-interest to DELAVAL STEAM TURBINE COMPANY and DELAVAL, INC.. (Martinovich, Edward) (Filed on 12/19/2022)
December 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Dismiss Defendant John Crane Inc. by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #49 Stipulation. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2022)
December 16, 2022 Filing 60 NOTICE by Union Carbide Corporation of Adoption of Previously Filed State Court Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Damages (Smith, Deborah) (Filed on 12/16/2022)
December 16, 2022 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah Ann Smith (Smith, Deborah) (Filed on 12/16/2022)
December 16, 2022 Filing 58 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ELLIOTT COMPANY a/k/a ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY CO., INC.. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/16/2022)
December 16, 2022 Filing 57 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION TO REMAND hearing set for January 20, 2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.). Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2023 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco - To be determined before Judge Charles R. Breyer. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/crb General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting o f court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2023 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - To be determined before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2022)
December 16, 2022 Filing 56 MOTION to Remand filed by Betty Gemaehlich, Keith Gemaehlich. Motion Hearing set for 1/20/2023 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 12/30/2022. Replies due by 1/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Josiah Parker, #2 Proposed Order)(Parker, Josiah) (Filed on 12/16/2022)
December 16, 2022 Filing 55 CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/24/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2023 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco - To be determined. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2022)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 12/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2022)
December 16, 2022 Filing 53 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2022)
December 16, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #56 Motion to Remand. Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2023 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco - To be determined before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2022)
December 14, 2022 Filing 52 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by SYD Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc... (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 12/14/2022)
December 14, 2022 Filing 51 Certificate of Interested Entities by SYD Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc. (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 12/14/2022)
December 14, 2022 Filing 50 NOTICE by SYD Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc. Filing State Court Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 12/14/2022)
December 14, 2022 Filing 49 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Dismiss Defendant John Crane Inc. filed by Betty Gemaehlich, Keith Gemaehlich. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parker, Josiah) (Filed on 12/14/2022)
December 14, 2022 Filing 48 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Betty Gemaehlich, Keith Gemaehlich.. (Parker, Josiah) (Filed on 12/14/2022)
December 14, 2022 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Josiah Parker PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR JOSIAH PARKER (Parker, Josiah) (Filed on 12/14/2022)
December 14, 2022 Filing 46 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Performance Mechanical, Inc... (Petty, Ross) (Filed on 12/14/2022)
December 14, 2022 Filing 45 NOTICE by Performance Mechanical, Inc. of Re-filing Its State Court Answer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - state court Answer)(Petty, Ross) (Filed on 12/14/2022)
December 14, 2022 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Ross Morton Petty (Petty, Ross) (Filed on 12/14/2022)
December 8, 2022 Filing 43 Certificate of Interested Entities by FLOWSERVE US INC., individually and as successor in interest to EDWARD VALVE, INC. identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for FLOWSERVE US INC., individually and as successor in interest to EDWARD VALVE, INC.. (Kelly, Daniel) (Filed on 12/8/2022)
December 8, 2022 Filing 42 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byFLOWSERVE US INC., individually and as successor in interest to EDWARD VALVE, INC.. (Kelly, Daniel) (Filed on 12/8/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Carter Pieper on behalf of Defendant FMC Corporation (Pieper, Timothy) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis Dennis Pond on behalf of Defendant FMC Corporation (Pond, Francis) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by John R Ybarra on behalf of Defendant FMC Corporation (Ybarra, John) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 38 NOTICE by FMC CORPORATION, individually and as successor in interest to NORTHERN PUMP COMPANY aka NORTHERN FIRE APPARATUS COMPANY, CHICAGO PUMP COMPANY AND PEERLESS PUMP COMPANY DEF FMC CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (Ybarra, John) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 37 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by FMC CORPORATION, individually and as successor in interest to NORTHERN PUMP COMPANY aka NORTHERN FIRE APPARATUS COMPANY, CHICAGO PUMP COMPANY AND PEERLESS PUMP COMPANY identifying Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group for FMC CORPORATION, individually and as successor in interest to NORTHERN PUMP COMPANY aka NORTHERN FIRE APPARATUS COMPANY, CHICAGO PUMP COMPANY AND PEERLESS PUMP COMPANY. (Ybarra, John) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 36 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by ELLIOTT COMPANY a/k/a ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY CO., INC... (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 35 ANSWER to Complaint byJohn Crane Inc.. (Mahoney, Kelley) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 34 Certificate of Interested Entities by ELLIOTT COMPANY a/k/a ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY CO., INC. [DEFENDANT ELLIOTT COMPANY'S CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS] (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelley Mahoney (Mahoney, Kelley) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 32 Statement [DEFENDANT ELLIOTT COMPANY'S CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT] by ELLIOTT COMPANY a/k/a ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY CO., INC.. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint [DEFENDANT ELLIOTT COMPANY'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES] byELLIOTT COMPANY a/k/a ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY CO., INC.. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa Renee Chaves [DEFENDANT ELLIOTT COMPANY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF MARISA R. CHAVES AS COUNSEL FOR ELLIOTT COMPANY] (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Jo Talarico [DEFENDANT ELLIOTT COMPANY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF AMY J. TALARICO AS COUNSEL FOR ELLIOTT COMPANY] (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Duffy [DEFENDANT ELLIOTT COMPANY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF JOSEPH DUFFY AS COUNSEL FOR ELLIOTT COMPANY] (Duffy, Joseph) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 27 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Goulds Pumps, Inc... (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 26 Certificate of Interested Entities by Goulds Pumps, Inc. [DEFENDANT GOULDS PUMPS LLC'S CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS] (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 25 Statement [DEFENDANT GOULDS PUMPS LLC'S DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES] by Goulds Pumps, Inc.. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE by Goulds Pumps, Inc. [DEFENDANT GOULDS PUMPS LLC'S NOTICE OF FILING OF STATE COURT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT] (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa Renee Chaves [DEFENDANT GOULDS PUMPS LLC'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF MARISA R. CHAVES AS COUNSEL FOR GOULDS PUMPS LLC] (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Jo Talarico [DEFENDANT GOULDS PUMPS LLC'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF AMY J. TALARICO AS COUNSEL FOR GOULDS PUMPS LLC] (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 21 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by GRINNELL LLC d/b/a GRINNELL CORPORATION.. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by GRINNELL LLC d/b/a GRINNELL CORPORATION [DEFENDANT GRINNELL LLC'S CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS] (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Duffy [DEFENDANT GOULDS PUMPS LLC'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF JOSEPH DUFFY AS COUNSEL FOR GOULDS PUMPS LLC] (Duffy, Joseph) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 18 Statement [DEFENDANT GRINNELL LLC'S DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES] by GRINNELL LLC d/b/a GRINNELL CORPORATION. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE by GRINNELL LLC d/b/a GRINNELL CORPORATION [DEFENDANT GRINNELL LLC'S NOTICE OF FILING OF STATE COURT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT] (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa Renee Chaves [DEFENDANT GRINNELL LLC'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF MARISA R. CHAVES AS COUNSEL FOR GRINNELL LLC] (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Jo Talarico [DEFENDANT GRINNELL LLC'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF AMY J. TALARICO AS COUNSEL FOR GRINNELL LLC] (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Duffy [DEFENDANT GRINNELL LLC'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF JOSEPH DUFFY AS COUNSEL FOR GRINNELL LLC] (Duffy, Joseph) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by ITT LLC f/k/a ITT CORPORATION, f/k/a ITT INDUSTRIES, INC. individually and as successor-in-interest to BELL & GOSSETT COMPANY, FOSTER ENGINEERING COMPANY and KENNEDY VALVE COMPANY.. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by ITT LLC f/k/a ITT CORPORATION, f/k/a ITT INDUSTRIES, INC. individually and as successor-in-interest to BELL & GOSSETT COMPANY, FOSTER ENGINEERING COMPANY and KENNEDY VALVE COMPANY [DEFENDANT ITT LLC'S CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS] (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 11 Statement [DEFENDANT ITT LLC'S DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES] by ITT LLC f/k/a ITT CORPORATION, f/k/a ITT INDUSTRIES, INC. individually and as successor-in-interest to BELL & GOSSETT COMPANY, FOSTER ENGINEERING COMPANY and KENNEDY VALVE COMPANY. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE by ITT LLC f/k/a ITT CORPORATION, f/k/a ITT INDUSTRIES, INC. individually and as successor-in-interest to BELL & GOSSETT COMPANY, FOSTER ENGINEERING COMPANY and KENNEDY VALVE COMPANY [DEFENDANT ITT LLC'S NOTICE OF FILING OF STATE COURT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT] (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa Renee Chaves [DEFENDANT ITT LLC'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF MARISA CHAVES] (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Jo Talarico [DEFENDANT ITT LLC'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF AMY TALARICO] (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Duffy [DEFENDANT ITT LLC'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF JOSEPH DUFFY AS COUNSEL FOR ITT LLC] (Duffy, Joseph) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 6, 2022 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by CLA-VAL CO. a division of GRISWOLD INDUSTRIES (Lister, John) (Filed on 12/6/2022)
December 6, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REFILING STATE COURT Answer to Removal Complaint byCLA-VAL CO. a division of GRISWOLD INDUSTRIES. (Lister, John) (Filed on 12/6/2022)
December 1, 2022 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/24/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 30, 2022 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by John Crane Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Smiths Group PLC for John Crane Inc.. (Lin, Carrie) (Filed on 11/30/2022)
November 30, 2022 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/14/2022. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2022)
November 30, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda Superior Court. Their case number is 22CV020120. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-17770369). Filed byJohn Crane Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E iso Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lin, Carrie) (Filed on 11/30/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gemaehlich et al v.Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Gemaehlich
Represented By: Benno Behnam Ashrafi
Represented By: Josiah Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Gemaehlich
Represented By: Benno Behnam Ashrafi
Represented By: Josiah Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, a subsidiary of AMPCO-PITTSBURGH CORPORATION, individually and as successor by merger to BUFFALO PUMPS, INC., individually and successor in interest to BUFFALO FORGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albay Construction Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALFA LAVAL, INC., individually and as successor in interest to THE DELAVAL SEPARATOR COMPANY and SHARPLES CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: Rebecca Anne Bellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bigge Crane and Rigging Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP, INC., individually and as successor in interest to BYRON JACKSON PUMP CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CALAVERAS NATURAL RESOURCES, INC.
Represented By: Hanna M. Thompson
Represented By: Melanie Leigh Ameele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CINCINNATI VALVE COMPANY, individually and as successor to LUNKENHEIMER VALVES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLA-VAL CO. a division of GRISWOLD INDUSTRIES
Represented By: John Russell Lister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crosby Valve, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Livingston Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELLIOTT COMPANY a/k/a ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY CO., INC.
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Marisa Renee Chaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLOWSERVE US INC., individually and as successor in interest to EDWARD VALVE, INC.
Represented By: Daniel James Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC CORPORATION, individually and as successor in interest to NORTHERN PUMP COMPANY aka NORTHERN FIRE APPARATUS COMPANY, CHICAGO PUMP COMPANY AND PEERLESS PUMP COMPANY
Represented By: Francis Dennis Pond
Represented By: John R Ybarra
Represented By: Timothy Carter Pieper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER, LLC as successor in interest to FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION and FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARDNER DENVER, INC. f/k/a GARDNER DENVER MACHINERY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Marisa Renee Chaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRINNELL LLC d/b/a GRINNELL CORPORATION
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Marisa Renee Chaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. sued individually and as successor-in-interest to DELAVAL STEAM TURBINE COMPANY and DELAVAL, INC.
Represented By: Edward Martinovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT LLC f/k/a ITT CORPORATION, f/k/a ITT INDUSTRIES, INC. individually and as successor-in-interest to BELL & GOSSETT COMPANY, FOSTER ENGINEERING COMPANY and KENNEDY VALVE COMPANY
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Marisa Renee Chaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane Inc.
Represented By: Carrie S. Lin
Represented By: Kelley Mahoney
Represented By: Stephen Vincent Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.T. THORPE & SON, INC.
Represented By: Viiu Spangler Khare
Represented By: Davit Shanto
Represented By: Steven S. Spaulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAR-IND SUPPLY OF SAN DIEGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METALCLAD INSULATION LLC f/k/a METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION aa NORTHERN CALIFORNIA INSULATION COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARAMOUNT GLOBAL f/k/a VIACOMCBS INC. f/k/a CBS CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation, f/k/a VIACOM INC., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Performance Mechanical, Inc.
Represented By: Ross Morton Petty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petrochem Insulation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REDCO CORPORATION f/k/a CRANE CO. f/k/a CRANE COMPANY and JENKINS VALVES
Represented By: Christina Noel Goodrich
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REDWOOD PAINTING CO., INC.
Represented By: Randall Keith Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Supply Company of California
Represented By: Randall Keith Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCO WEST, INC. f/k/a BRENNTAG WEST, INC. f/k/a SOCO-LYNCH CORPORATION successor in interest to WESTERN CHEMICAL & MANUFACTURING CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYD Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc.
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Represented By: Carla Lynn Crochet
Represented By: Jeremy David Milbrodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEMPORARY PLANT CLEANERS, INC. individually and as successor in interest to PLANT MAINTENANCE INC. OF CALIFORNIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas A. Short Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Deborah Ann Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pump, Inc.
Represented By: Peter K. Renstrom
Represented By: Todd Marshall Thacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN PUMPS, LLC f/k/a WARREN PUMPS, INC. individually and as successor in interest to QUIMBY PUMP COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 400, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: James G. Scadden
Represented By: Glen R. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARAMOUNT GLOBAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calaveras Asbestos, LTD.
Represented By: Hanna M. Thompson
Represented By: Melanie Leigh Ameele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?