Amalgamated Union Local 450-A Welfare Fund et al v. McKinsey & Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Amalgamated Union Local 450-A Welfare Fund, AFL-CIO Local 475 Health and Welfare Fund, Allied Security Health and Welfare Fund, Building Service Local 2 Welfare Fund, CWA Local 1181 Health Plan, CWA Local 1182 and 1183 Health and Welfare Funds, Drywall Tapers Insurance Fund 1974 - UIPAT District Council No. 9, IBEW Local 25 Health and Benefit Fund, International Brotherhood of Trade Unions Local 713 Health Plan, Iron Workers Local 361 Health Fund, Iron Workers Local 40 Health Fund, Iron Workers Local 417 Health Fund, Metallic Lathers and Reinforcing Iron Workers Local 46 Health and Benefit Fund, Iron Workers Local 580 Health and Benefit Fund, IUOE Local 138 Health Benefit Fund, Laborers Local 1298 of Nassau and Suffolk Counties Welfare Fund LIUNA, Laborers Local 235 Welfare Fund LIUNA, Local 342 United Marine Division Insurance Trust (ILA), Local 381 Group Insurance Fund (USWA), Westchester Heavy Construction Laborers Local 60 Health And Welfare Fund (LIUNA), Metal Polishers Local 8a-28a Welfare Fund (IUPAT), NOITU Insurance Trust Fund, Painting Industry Insurance Fund (Bridge Painters) Local 9, Roofers Local 8 WBPA Fund, Structural Steel Local 806 Health Plan, Suffolk Transportation Services; Inc., Teamsters Local 445 Welfare Fund, Teamsters Local 456 Welfare Fund, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, UFCW Local 342 Healthcare Fund, UFCW Local 342 Welfare Fund, Uniformed Fire Officers Association Benefits Fund (UFOA 854), United Crafts Benefits Fund (UA 21 Plumbers and Steamfitters), United Wire, Metal And Machine Local 810 Health Benefit Fund (Teamsters) and UOPW Local 175 Welfare Fund (Journeymen And Allied Trades)
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc., McKinsey & Company Inc. United States, McKinsey & Company Inc. Washington D.C. and McKinsey Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv07520
Filed: November 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2022 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 1:22-cv-06789. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 30, 2022 MEMBER CASE OPENED re MDL 2996: From Eastern District of New York, 1:22cv06789, Amalgamated Union Local 450-A Welfare Fund et al v. McKinsey & Company, Inc. et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:22-cv-07520-CRB pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 34 cc: JPMDL (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2022)
November 28, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFIED JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-34), Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of June 7, 2021, and, with the consent of that court, assigned tothe Honorable Charles R. Breyer. (TL)
November 28, 2022 Filing 6 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-34), Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of June 7, 2021, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. The transmittal of this order to said Clerk shall be stayed 7 days from the entry thereof. If any party files a notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel within this 7day period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel. (TL)
November 28, 2022 Case transferred to Northern District of California. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (TL)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #5 Letter MOTION for All Defendants Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint1, and a stay of further proceedings pending transfer to an MDL in California. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 11/13/2022. (MV)
November 12, 2022 Filing 5 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,, /David M. Cheifetz Unopposed Letter Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint and for a Stay of Further Proceedings by McKinsey & Company, Inc., McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States, McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington D.C., McKinsey Holdings, Inc.,. (Cheifetz, David)
November 10, 2022 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Removal and Exhibits, Corporate Disclosure Statement and Civil Cover Sheet served on David Grossman, Esq. on November 8, 2022, filed by McKinsey & Company, Inc., McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States, McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington D.C., McKinsey Holdings, Inc.,. (Bernard, James)
November 9, 2022 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
November 9, 2022 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (KD)
November 9, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)
November 9, 2022 This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (KD)
November 9, 2022 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (KD)
November 7, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by McKinsey & Company, Inc., McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States, McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington D.C., McKinsey Holdings, Inc., from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Queens, case number 719535/2022. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-16116484) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #4 Exhibit 2 - Purdue Voluntary Petition, #5 Exhibit 3 - Claim No. 119446, #6 Exhibit 4 - Claim No. 119184, #7 Exhibit 5 - Claim No. 122120, #8 Exhibit 6 - Claim No. 119705, #9 Exhibit 7 - Claim No. 119676, #10 Exhibit 8 - Claim No. 116322, #11 Exhibit 9 - Claim No. 121506, #12 Exhibit 10 - Claim No. 122257, #13 Exhibit 11 - Claim No. 117729, #14 Exhibit 12 - Claim No. 121895, #15 Exhibit 13 - Claim No. 120950, #16 Exhibit 14 - Claim No. 122096, #17 Exhibit 15 - Claim No. 122117, #18 Exhibit 16 - Claim No. 118425, #19 Exhibit 17 - Claim No. 122141, #20 Exhibit 18 - Claim No. 122132, #21 Exhibit 19 - Claim No. 122145, #22 Exhibit 20 - Claim No. 116084, #23 Exhibit 21 - Claim No. 122181, #24 Exhibit 22 - Claim No. 118929, #25 Exhibit 23 - Claim No. 119703, #26 Exhibit 24 - Claim No. 117070, #27 Exhibit 25 - Claim No. 119721, #28 Exhibit 26 - Claim No. 119540, #29 Exhibit 27 - Claim No. 113033, #30 Exhibit 28 - Claim No. 121301, #31 Exhibit 29 - Claim No. 116281, #32 Exhibit 30 - Claim No. 117090, #33 Exhibit 31 - Claim No. 119277, #34 Exhibit 32 - Claim No. 122168, #35 Exhibit 33 - Claim No. 122178, #36 Exhibit 34 - Claim No. 122221, #37 Exhibit 35 - Claim No. 118245, #38 Exhibit 36 - Claim No. 121797, #39 Exhibit 37 - Ex. 37 - Claim No. 119365) (Bernard, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amalgamated Union Local 450-A Welfare Fund et al v. McKinsey & Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amalgamated Union Local 450-A Welfare Fund
Represented By: David Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AFL-CIO Local 475 Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: David Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allied Security Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: David Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Building Service Local 2 Welfare Fund
Represented By: David Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CWA Local 1181 Health Plan
Represented By: David Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CWA Local 1182 and 1183 Health and Welfare Funds
Represented By: David Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drywall Tapers Insurance Fund 1974 - UIPAT District Council No. 9
Represented By: David Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW Local 25 Health and Benefit Fund
Represented By: David Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Trade Unions Local 713 Health Plan
Represented By: David Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iron Workers Local 361 Health Fund
Represented By: David Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iron Workers Local 40 Health Fund
Represented By: David Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iron Workers Local 417 Health Fund
Represented By: David Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metallic Lathers and Reinforcing Iron Workers Local 46 Health and Benefit Fund
Represented By: David Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iron Workers Local 580 Health and Benefit Fund
Represented By: David Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IUOE Local 138 Health Benefit Fund
Represented By: David Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers Local 1298 of Nassau and Suffolk Counties Welfare Fund LIUNA
Represented By: David Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers Local 235 Welfare Fund LIUNA
Represented By: David Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local 342 United Marine Division Insurance Trust (ILA)
Represented By: David Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local 381 Group Insurance Fund (USWA)
Represented By: David Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westchester Heavy Construction Laborers Local 60 Health And Welfare Fund (LIUNA)
Represented By: David Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metal Polishers Local 8a-28a Welfare Fund (IUPAT)
Represented By: David Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOITU Insurance Trust Fund
Represented By: David Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Painting Industry Insurance Fund (Bridge Painters) Local 9
Represented By: David Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roofers Local 8 WBPA Fund
Represented By: David Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Structural Steel Local 806 Health Plan
Represented By: David Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suffolk Transportation Services; Inc.
Represented By: David Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local 445 Welfare Fund
Represented By: David Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local 456 Welfare Fund
Represented By: David Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund
Represented By: David Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UFCW Local 342 Healthcare Fund
Represented By: David Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UFCW Local 342 Welfare Fund
Represented By: David Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uniformed Fire Officers Association Benefits Fund (UFOA 854)
Represented By: David Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Crafts Benefits Fund (UA 21 Plumbers and Steamfitters)
Represented By: David Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Wire, Metal And Machine Local 810 Health Benefit Fund (Teamsters)
Represented By: David Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UOPW Local 175 Welfare Fund (Journeymen And Allied Trades)
Represented By: David Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc.
Represented By: David M. Cheifetz
Represented By: James Lawrence Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc. United States
Represented By: David M. Cheifetz
Represented By: James Lawrence Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc. Washington D.C.
Represented By: David M. Cheifetz
Represented By: James Lawrence Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: David M. Cheifetz
Represented By: James Lawrence Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?