Village of Amityville, NY et al v. McKinsey & Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Village of Amityville, NY, Town of Babylon, NY, Village of Babylon, NY, Bellmore Fire District, NY, Village of Bellport, NY, Town of Brookhaven, NY, Brookhaven Ambulance, NY, Centereach Fire District, NY, Centerport Fire District, NY, Town of Clarkstown, NY, Village of East Hampton, NY, Village of East Rockaway, NY, Village of Farmingdale, NY, Village of Floral Park, NY, Friendship Engine & Hose Co, NY, Village of Garden City, NY, Village of Great Neck, NY, Village of Greenport, NY, Hauppauge Fire District, NY, Town of Haverstraw, NY, Garden City Village, NY, Village of Hempstead, NY, Hicksville Water District, NY, Town of Huntington, NY, Village of Island Park, NY, Village of Islandia, NY, Town of Islip, NY, Islip Terrace Fire District, NY, Village of Lake Grove, NY, Village of Lawrence, NY, Levittown Fire District, NY, Village of Lindenhurst, NY, Village of Lloyd Harbor, NY, City of Long Beach, NY, Village of Lynbrook, NY, Village of Massapequa Park, NY, Medford Volunteer Ambulance, NY, Melville Fire District, NY, Merrick Library, NY, Village of Mill Neck, NY, Miller Place Fire District, NY, Village of Millerton, NY, Mount Sinai Fire District, NY, Nesconset Fire District, NY, Village of New Hyde Park, NY, Village of Nissequoge, NY, North Patchogue Fire District, NY, Town of North Hempstead, NY, North Merrick Fire District, NY, Village of Northport, NY, Town of Orangetown, NY, Town of Oyster Bay, NY, Village of Patchogue, NY, Village of Poquott, NY, Port Washington Water District, NY, Town of Ramapo, NY, Ridge Fire District, NY, Town of Riverhead, NY, Roslyn Water District, NY, Village of Saltaire, NY, Town of Smithtown, NY, Smithtown Fire District, NY, South Farmindale Fire District, NY, Town of Southhampton, NY, Town of Southold, NY, St. James Fire District, NY, Village of Stewart Manor, NY, Stony Brook Fire District, NY, Town of Stony Point, NY, Village of Suffern, NY, Uniondale Fire District, NY, Village of Valley Stream, NY, Village of the Branch, NY, Town of Wappinger Falls, NY, Village of Wappinger Falls, NY, Village of West Hampton Dunes, NY, Village of West Haverstraw, NY and Village of Westbury, NY.
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc., McKinsey Holdings, Inc., McKinsey & Company Inc. United States and McKinsey & Company Inc. Washington D.C.
Case Number: 3:2022cv07521
Filed: November 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2022 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 2:22-cv-06773. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 30, 2022 MEMBER CASE OPENED re MDL 2996: From Eastern District of New York, 2:22cv06773, Village of Amityville, NY et al v. McKinsey & Company, Inc. et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:22-cv-07521-CRB pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 34 cc: JPMDL (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2022)
November 28, 2022 Filing 8 Certified JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 34): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of June 7, 2021, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. (LF)
November 28, 2022 Case transferred to District of Northern District of California. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (LF)
November 23, 2022 Filing 7 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 34): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of June 7, 2021, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. (LF)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint and for a Stay of Further Proceedings. On consent of the parties, Defendants' request for a stay of further proceedings is GRANTED. Further, in light of this stay, Defendants' request for an extension of time to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is also GRANTED. Consequently, the deadline by which Defendants must respond to Plaintiffs' complaint is extended sine die. Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 11/14/2022. (LWC)
November 12, 2022 Filing 6 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,, /David M. Cheifetz Unopposed Letter Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint and for a Stay of Further Proceedings by McKinsey & Company, Inc., McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States, McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington D.C., McKinsey Holdings, Inc.,. (Cheifetz, David)
November 10, 2022 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Removal and Exhibits, Corporate Disclosure Statement and Civil Cove Sheet served on David Grossman, Esq. on November 8, 2022, filed by McKinsey & Company, Inc., McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States, McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington D.C., McKinsey Holdings, Inc.,. (Bernard, James)
November 7, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. 22-CV-6773(JS)(ARL) (CL)
November 7, 2022 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (CL)
November 7, 2022 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (CL)
November 7, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by McKinsey & Company, Inc., McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States, McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington D.C., McKinsey Holdings, Inc., from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau, case number 612878/2022. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-16114698) Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #4 Exhibit 2 - Purdue Voluntary Petition, #5 Exhibit 3 - Claim No. 148137, #6 Exhibit 4 - Claim No. 148199, #7 Exhibit 5 - Claim No. 148245, #8 Exhibit 6 - Claim No. 148132, #9 Exhibit 7 - Claim No. 148220, #10 Exhibit 8 - Claim No. 148180, #11 Exhibit 9 - Claim No. 148210, #12 Exhibit 10 - Claim No. 148040, #13 Exhibit 11 - Claim No. 149342, #14 Exhibit 12 - Claim No. 136083, #15 Exhibit 13 - Claim No. 148169, #16 Exhibit 14 - Claim No. 148267, #17 Exhibit 15 - Claim No. 148265, #18 Exhibit 16 - Claim No. 148233, #19 Exhibit 17 - Claim No. 148263, #20 Exhibit 18 - Claim No. 148252, #21 Exhibit 19 - Claim No. 148172, #22 Exhibit 20 - Claim No. 137323, #23 Exhibit 21 - Claim No. 148257, #24 Exhibit 22 - Claim No. 133548, #25 Exhibit 23 - Claim No. 134234, #26 Exhibit 24 - Claim No. 139750, #27 Exhibit 25 - Claim No. 135974, #28 Exhibit 26 - Claim No. 136192, #29 Exhibit 27 - Claim No. 148269, #30 Exhibit 28 - Claim No. 148128, #31 Exhibit 29 - Claim No. 137183, #32 Exhibit 30 - Claim No. 148091, #33 Exhibit 31 - Claim No. 148211, #34 Exhibit 32 - Claim No. 148221, #35 Exhibit 33 - Claim No. 133561, #36 Exhibit 34 - Claim No. 148236, #37 Exhibit 35 - Claim No. 133977, #38 Exhibit 36 - Claim No. 148170, #39 Exhibit 37 - Claim No. 148197, #40 Exhibit 38 - Claim No. 133964, #41 Exhibit 39 - Claim No. 148194, #42 Exhibit 40 - Claim No. 147830, #43 Exhibit 41 - Claim No. 148229, #44 Exhibit 42 - Claim No. 148139, #45 Exhibit 43 - Claim No. 134231, #46 Exhibit 44 - Claim No. 148189, #47 Exhibit 45 - Claim No. 148166, #48 Exhibit 46 - Claim No. 136438, #49 Exhibit 47 - Claim No. 148206, #50 Exhibit 48 - Claim No. 148212, #51 Exhibit 49 - Claim No. 148248, #52 Exhibit 50 - Claim No. 136033, #53 Exhibit 51 - Claim No. 145849, #54 Exhibit 52 - Claim No. 136137, #55 Exhibit 53 - Claim No. 136263, #56 Exhibit 54 - Claim No. 148095, #57 Exhibit 55 - Claim No. 149360, #58 Exhibit 56 - Claim No. 133667, #59 Exhibit 57 - Claim No. 136594, #60 Exhibit 58 - Claim No. 139792, #61 Exhibit 59 - Claim No. 136173, #62 Exhibit 60 - Claim No. 148205, #63 Exhibit 61 - Claim No. 148216, #64 Exhibit 62 - Claim No. 148270, #65 Exhibit 63 - Claim No. 148217, #66 Exhibit 64 - Claim No. 113889, #67 Exhibit 65 - Claim No. 147979, #68 Exhibit 66 - Claim No. 148235, #69 Exhibit 67 - Claim No. 136008, #70 Exhibit 68 - Claim No. 148239, #71 Exhibit 69 - Claim No. 148179, #72 Exhibit 70 - Claim No. 148268, #73 Exhibit 71 - Claim No. 148271, #74 Exhibit 72 - Claim No. 147892, #75 Exhibit 73 - Claim No. 147513, #76 Exhibit 74 - Claim No. 136697, #77 Exhibit 75 - Claim No. 148225, #78 Exhibit 76 - Claim No. 147916, #79 Exhibit 77 - Claim No. 148228, #80 Exhibit 78 - Claim No. 148213, #81 Exhibit 79 - Claim No. 134184) (Bernard, James) Modified on 11/7/2022 (CL).
November 7, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Village of Amityville, NY et al v. McKinsey & Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Amityville, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town of Babylon, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Babylon, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bellmore Fire District, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Bellport, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town of Brookhaven, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brookhaven Ambulance, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Centereach Fire District, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Centerport Fire District, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town of Clarkstown, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of East Hampton, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of East Rockaway, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Farmingdale, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Floral Park, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friendship Engine & Hose Co, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Garden City, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Great Neck, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Greenport, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hauppauge Fire District, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town of Haverstraw, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garden City Village, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Hempstead, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hicksville Water District, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town of Huntington, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Island Park, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Islandia, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town of Islip, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Islip Terrace Fire District, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Lake Grove, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Lawrence, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levittown Fire District, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Lindenhurst, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Lloyd Harbor, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Long Beach, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Lynbrook, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Massapequa Park, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medford Volunteer Ambulance, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melville Fire District, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merrick Library, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Mill Neck, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miller Place Fire District, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Millerton, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mount Sinai Fire District, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nesconset Fire District, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of New Hyde Park, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Nissequoge, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Patchogue Fire District, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town of North Hempstead, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Merrick Fire District, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Northport, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town of Orangetown, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town of Oyster Bay, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Patchogue, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Poquott, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Port Washington Water District, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town of Ramapo, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ridge Fire District, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town of Riverhead, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roslyn Water District, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Saltaire, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town of Smithtown, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smithtown Fire District, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Farmindale Fire District, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town of Southhampton, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town of Southold, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. James Fire District, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Stewart Manor, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stony Brook Fire District, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town of Stony Point, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Suffern, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uniondale Fire District, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Valley Stream, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of the Branch, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town of Wappinger Falls, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Wappinger Falls, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of West Hampton Dunes, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of West Haverstraw, NY
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Westbury, NY.
Represented By: David C. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc.
Represented By: David M. Cheifetz
Represented By: James Lawrence Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: David M. Cheifetz
Represented By: James Lawrence Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc. United States
Represented By: David M. Cheifetz
Represented By: James Lawrence Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc. Washington D.C.
Represented By: David M. Cheifetz
Represented By: James Lawrence Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?