Hughes et al v. Apple, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lauren Hughes and Jane Doe
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv07668
Filed: December 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Referring Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2023 Filing 29 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17901653.) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Greer, Jocelyn) (Filed on 1/17/2023)
January 9, 2023 Filing 28 Case reassigned to Judge Vince Chhabria. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 1/9/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2023)
January 9, 2023 Filing 27 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #https://cand.uscourts.gov/notices/northern-district-extends-caseload-rebalancing-pilot-program/. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2023)
January 9, 2023 Filing 26 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2023)
January 6, 2023 Filing 25 STIPULATION Extending Defendant Apple Inc.'s Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Apple, Inc.. (Cheung, Tiffany) (Filed on 1/6/2023)
January 6, 2023 Filing 24 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple, Inc... (Cheung, Tiffany) (Filed on 1/6/2023)
January 6, 2023 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple, Inc. (Cheung, Tiffany) (Filed on 1/6/2023)
January 6, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Melody Ellen Wong (Wong, Melody) (Filed on 1/6/2023)
January 6, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark David McPherson (McPherson, Mark) (Filed on 1/6/2023)
January 6, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany Cheung (Cheung, Tiffany) (Filed on 1/6/2023)
January 6, 2023 Filing 19 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jane Doe, Lauren Hughes. (Wade, Gillian) (Filed on 1/6/2023)
December 23, 2022 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination. All parties are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 1/6/2023. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document a ssociated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2022)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #15 Application for Admission of Attorney Jessica Hall Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2022)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #14 Application for Admission of Attorney Brandon Haubert Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2022)
December 19, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17833937.) filed by Jane Doe, Lauren Hughes. (Hall, Jessica) (Filed on 12/19/2022)
December 19, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17833376.) filed by Jane Doe, Lauren Hughes. (Haubert, Brandon) (Filed on 12/19/2022)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #12 Application for Admission of Attorney David Slade Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2022)
December 16, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17829952.) filed by Jane Doe, Lauren Hughes. (Slade, David) (Filed on 12/16/2022)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #6 Application for Admission of Attorney Kenneth A. Held Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2022)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #5 Application for Admission of Attorney Elizabeth Pollock-Avery Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2022)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #4 Application for Admission of Attorney Edwin J. Kilpela Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/1/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/8/2023 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17793472.) filed by Jane Doe, Lauren Hughes. (Held, Kenneth) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17793426.) filed by Jane Doe, Lauren Hughes. (Pollock-Avery, Elizabeth) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 7, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17793374.) filed by Jane Doe, Lauren Hughes. (Kilpela, Edwin) (Filed on 12/7/2022)
December 6, 2022 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/20/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2022)
December 5, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Wade, Gillian) (Filed on 12/5/2022)
December 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17785930.). Filed byLauren Hughes, Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wade, Gillian) (Filed on 12/5/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes et al v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Hughes
Represented By: Gillian Leigh Wade
Represented By: Brandon M. Haubert
Represented By: Kenneth A. Held
Represented By: David F. Slade
Represented By: Edwin John Kilpela, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth L Pollock-Avery
Represented By: Jessica Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Gillian Leigh Wade
Represented By: Brandon M. Haubert
Represented By: Elizabeth L Pollock-Avery
Represented By: David F. Slade
Represented By: Edwin John Kilpela, Jr.
Represented By: Jessica Hall
Represented By: Kenneth A. Held
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany Cheung
Represented By: Mark David McPherson
Represented By: Melody Ellen Wong
Represented By: Jocelyn E. Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?