Marcus et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL R. MARCUS and VICTORIA L. MARCUS
Defendant: CLEAVER BROOKS, INC., DOMCO PR.O.DUCTS TEXAS, INC., Honeywell International, Inc. FKA Allied Signal Inc, Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to the Bendix Corporation, Pneumo Abex LLC, REDCO CORPORATION, SB Decking, Inc., SCHNEIDERELECTRIC USA, INC., Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONA.L, INC., BW/IP, INC., individually and as successor in interest to BYRON JACKSON PUMP CO., BWDAC, INC., CLARK RELIANCE CORPORATION, f, THE DARCOID COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA, DOMCO INC., FLOOR PRODUCTS (TEXAS), AZROCIC 1NDUSTRIES INC., UVALDE ROCK ASPHALT COMPANY, EATON CORPORATION, Electrolux Home Products, Inc., FLOWSERVE US, INC. as successor-in-interest to DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION, Flowserve US, Inc., solely as successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company, FMC Corporation Inc, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, GARDNER DENVER, INC., General Electric Company, Genuine Parts Company, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc., Grinnell LLC, HILL BROTHERS C.HEMICAL COMPANY, SIGNAL OIL & GAS COMPANY, IMO Industries, Inc., Individually and as successor in interest to Delaval Turbine Inc. and Sharples, Inc., ITT LLC, J.R. Clarkson Company LLC, J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc., Metalclad Insulation, LLC, Morse Tec LLC fka Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to Borgwarner Corporation, PARAMOUNT GLOBAL f/k/a VIACOMCBS INC. f/k/a CBS CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation, f/k/a VIACOM INC., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC, Parker Hannifin Corporation, Parker Hannifin Corporation as Successor-In-Interest to Sacomo-Sierra, Pfizer, Inc., Plant Products & Supply Company, formerly known as CRANE CO., ROCKWELL AUTOMATION,INC., formerly known as SELBY, BATTERSBY & CO., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Standard Motor Products, Inc., Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc., Triple A Machine Shop, Inc., Velan Valve Corporation, Verizon Communications, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY and PARAMOUNT GLOBAL
Case Number: 3:2022cv09058
Filed: December 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 116 REPLY (re #87 MOTION to Remand ) filed byMICHAEL R. MARCUS, VICTORIA L. MARCUS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Amell, David) (Filed on 2/10/2023)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 115 NOTICE of Appearance by Saleem Belbahri (Belbahri, Saleem) (Filed on 2/6/2023)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 114 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #87 MOTION to Remand ) filed byJ.R. Clarkson Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Sharp, #2 Declaration of Christopher Herfel)(Sharp, Andrew) (Filed on 2/3/2023)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 113 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #87 MOTION to Remand ) filed byGreene, Tweed & Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of David M. Glaspy, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-AAA - Forman Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B-1 - Forman Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B-2 - Forman Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit BB-EEE - Forman Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F-FFF - Forman Declaration, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G-GGG - Forman Declaration, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H-MMM - Forman Declaration, #9 Exhibit Exhibit N-NN - Forman Declaration, #10 Exhibit Exhibit NNN-1 - Forman Declaration, #11 Exhibit Exhibit NNN-2 - Forman Declaration, #12 Exhibit Exhibit NNN-3 - Forman Declaration, #13 Exhibit Exhibit NNN-4 - Forman Declaration, #14 Exhibit Exhibit O-PPP - Forman Declaration, #15 Exhibit Exhibit Q-ZZ - Forman Declaration)(Massenburg, Christopher) (Filed on 2/3/2023)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 112 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #87 MOTION to Remand ) filed byFoster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Counsel in Support, #2 Proof of Service)(Bugatto, Robert) (Filed on 2/3/2023)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 111 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #87 MOTION to Remand ) filed byAir & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Glen R. Powell, #3 Exhibit B, Part 1 to the Declaration of Glen R. Powell, #4 Exhibit B, Part 2 to the Declaration of Glen R. Powell, #5 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Glen R. Powell)(Powell, Glen) (Filed on 2/3/2023)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance by Narine Levonyan (Levonyan, Narine) (Filed on 2/1/2023)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ERRATA re #105 Joinder , Adding Exhibits A-C, Inadvertently Omitted by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Bugatto, Robert) (Filed on 1/27/2023)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Answer to Removal Complaint byFoster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Bugatto, Robert) (Filed on 1/27/2023)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 107 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.. (Bugatto, Robert) (Filed on 1/26/2023)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Certificate of Interested Entities by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Amec Foster Wheeler plc for Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Bugatto, Robert) (Filed on 1/26/2023)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Joinder re #1 Notice of Removal, by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Bugatto, Robert) (Filed on 1/26/2023)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J Bugatto for Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Bugatto, Robert) (Filed on 1/26/2023)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by Carla Lynn Crochet (Crochet, Carla) (Filed on 1/24/2023)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy David Milbrodt (Milbrodt, Jeremy) (Filed on 1/24/2023)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Paige Gardiner on Behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Gardiner, Katherine) (Filed on 1/24/2023)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Elizabeth Anselmo on Behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Anselmo, Emily) (Filed on 1/24/2023)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles T. Sheldon on Behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Sheldon, Charles) (Filed on 1/24/2023)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 1/24/2023)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Certificate of Interested Entities by General Electric Company identifying Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc. for General Electric Company. (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 1/24/2023)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Defendant General Electric Company's ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand byGeneral Electric Company. (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 1/24/2023)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Johnson on Behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 1/24/2023)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Certificate of Interested Entities by Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc. (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 1/24/2023)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 93 NOTICE by Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc. OF FILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 1/24/2023)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 92 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE set for March 24, 2023 before the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. Motion Hearing set for 4/21/2023 10:00 AM in San Francisco - To be determined before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2023)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #87 MOTION to Remand . Motion Hearing set for 4/21/2023 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco - To be determined before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2023)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ERRATA re #87 MOTION to Remand by MICHAEL R. MARCUS, VICTORIA L. MARCUS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Amell, David) (Filed on 1/20/2023)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Certificate of Interested Entities by Velan Valve Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Velan Inc. for Velan Valve Corporation. (Powell, Glen) (Filed on 1/20/2023)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byVelan Valve Corporation. (Powell, Glen) (Filed on 1/20/2023)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byAir & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Powell, Glen) (Filed on 1/20/2023)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MOTION to Remand filed by MICHAEL R. MARCUS, VICTORIA L. MARCUS. Responses due by 2/3/2023. Replies due by 2/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Rabiah N. Oral, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Declaration of Francis J. Burger, #18 Exhibit 1, #19 Exhibit 2, #20 Exhibit 3, #21 Exhibit 4, #22 Exhibit 5, #23 Exhibit 6, #24 Exhibit 7, #25 Exhibit 8, #26 Exhibit 9, #27 Exhibit 10, #28 Exhibit 11, #29 Exhibit 12 Part 1, #30 Exhibit 12 Part 2, #31 Exhibit 13, #32 Exhibit 14, #33 Exhibit 15, #34 Exhibit 16, #35 Exhibit 17 Part 1, #36 Exhibit 17 Part 2, #37 Exhibit 17 Part 3, #38 Exhibit 18, #39 Proposed Order, #40 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Amell, David) (Filed on 1/20/2023)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Notice of Filing State Court ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byWarren Pumps, LLC. (Cunningham, James) (Filed on 1/18/2023)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Finnell Cronin on behalf of Paramount Global, et al. (Cronin, Justin) (Filed on 1/10/2023)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Douglas Jamison on behalf of Defendant Paramount Global, et al. (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 1/10/2023)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Certificate of Interested Entities by PARAMOUNT GLOBAL f/k/a VIACOMCBS INC. f/k/a CBS CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation, f/k/a VIACOM INC., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC identifying Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc., Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for PARAMOUNT GLOBAL f/k/a VIACOMCBS INC. f/k/a CBS CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation, f/k/a VIACOM INC., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC. (Empting, Erin) (Filed on 1/10/2023)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Nicole Empting on behalf of Defendant Paramount Global, et al. (Empting, Erin) (Filed on 1/10/2023)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Demand for Jury Trial byPARAMOUNT GLOBAL f/k/a VIACOMCBS INC. f/k/a CBS CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation, f/k/a VIACOM INC., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC. (Empting, Erin) (Filed on 1/10/2023)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Certificate of Interested Entities by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company identifying Other Affiliate Blackrock, Inc. for The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Young, Kristi) (Filed on 1/9/2023)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE OF RE-FILING STATE COURT ANSWER by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Young, Kristi) (Filed on 1/9/2023) Modified on 1/9/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristi L.K. Young NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Jennifer A. Cormier, Kristi L.K. Young, and Sean C. McGah (Young, Kristi) (Filed on 1/9/2023)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Honeywell International, Inc. FKA Allied Signal Inc, Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to the Bendix Corporation. (Lashinsky, Natalie) (Filed on 1/4/2023) Modified on 1/5/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Metalclad Insulation, LLC.. (Hoye, Daniel) (Filed on 1/4/2023)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by EATON CORPORATION re #73 Certificate of Interested Entities, #74 Notice (Other), #72 Notice of Appearance (Ghanaat, Bina) (Filed on 1/3/2023)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 NOTICE by EATON CORPORATION OF REFILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (Ghanaat, Bina) (Filed on 1/3/2023)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Certificate of Interested Entities by EATON CORPORATION identifying Corporate Parent Eaton Corporation, plc (Ireland) for EATON CORPORATION. (Ghanaat, Bina) (Filed on 1/3/2023)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Bina Ghanaat (Ghanaat, Bina) (Filed on 1/3/2023)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BWDAC, INC. re #69 Certificate of Interested Entities, #70 Notice (Other), #68 Notice of Appearance (Ghanaat, Bina) (Filed on 1/3/2023)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 NOTICE OF REFILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES by BWDAC, INC. (Ghanaat, Bina) (Filed on 1/3/2023) Modified on 1/4/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Certificate of Interested Entities by BWDAC, INC. identifying Corporate Parent DCo LLC for BWDAC, INC.. is the parent company of BWDAC, Inc (Ghanaat, Bina) (Filed on 1/3/2023)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Bina Ghanaat (Ghanaat, Bina) (Filed on 1/3/2023)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/17/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/24/2023 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2023)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 12/30/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2022)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2022)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Morse Tec LLC fka Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to Borgwarner Corporation.. (Rickenbacher, Lisa) (Filed on 12/30/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) DEFENDANT CLARK-RELIANCE CORPORATION'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT byCLARK RELIANCE CORPORATION. (Yuen, Nicole) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Denine Brown Yuen NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Yuen, Nicole) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Certificate of Interested Entities by BW/IP, INC., individually and as successor in interest to BYRON JACKSON PUMP CO. identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for BW/IP, INC., individually and as successor in interest to BYRON JACKSON PUMP CO.. (Yuen, Nicole) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 DEFENDANT BW/IP, INC. and Its Wholly-Owned Subsidiaries' ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byBW/IP, INC., individually and as successor in interest to BYRON JACKSON PUMP CO.. (Yuen, Nicole) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Livingston Sharp (Sharp, Andrew) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byJ.R. Clarkson Company LLC. (Sharp, Andrew) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by J.R. Clarkson Company LLC (Sharp, Andrew) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Denine Brown Yuen NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY COUNSEL (Yuen, Nicole) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Certificate of Interested Entities by Morse Tec LLC fka Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to Borgwarner Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Enstar Holdings (US) LLC, a wholly-owned indirect subsidiary of Enstar Group Limited for Morse Tec LLC fka Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to Borgwarner Corporation. (Rickenbacher, Lisa) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Marie Rickenbacher for Morse TEC LLC, f/k/a BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC, as successor-by-merger to Borg-Warner Corporation (Rickenbacher, Lisa) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE by Morse Tec LLC fka Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to Borgwarner Corporation of Re-Filing State Court Answer to Complaint (Rickenbacher, Lisa) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Grinnell LLC.. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Certificate of Interested Entities by Grinnell LLC DEFENDANT GRINNELL LLCS CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Statement DEFENDANT GRINNELL LLCS DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Grinnell LLC. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 DEFENDANT GRINNELL LLCS ANSWER to Complaint FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUMASBESTOS; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL byGrinnell LLC. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by CLEAVER BROOKS, INC... (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Certificate of Interested Entities by CLEAVER BROOKS, INC. [DEFENDANT CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC.'S CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS] (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE by FLOWSERVE US, INC. as successor-in-interest to DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION RE-FILING OF STATE COURT ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT (Yuen, Nicole) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Duffy AS COUNSEL FOR GRINNELL LLC (Duffy, Joseph) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Statement [DEFENDANT CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC.'S DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES] by CLEAVER BROOKS, INC.. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by HILL BROTHERS C.HEMICAL COMPANY.. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Certificate of Interested Entities by HILL BROTHERS C.HEMICAL COMPANY [DEFENDANT HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANYS CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS] (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 CERTIFICATE of Counsel FLOWSERVE US INC. as successor-in- interest to DURAMETALLIC CORPORATIONS CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Nicole Denine Brown Yuen on behalf of FLOWSERVE US, INC. as successor-in-interest to DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION (Yuen, Nicole) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand [DEFENDANT CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUMASBESTOS; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL] byCLEAVER BROOKS, INC.. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Jo Talarico AS COUNSEL FOR GRINNELL LLC (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Statement [DEFENDANT HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANYS DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES] by HILL BROTHERS C.HEMICAL COMPANY. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 [DEFENDANT HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANYS] ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand [FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM ASBESTOS] byHILL BROTHERS C.HEMICAL COMPANY. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Duffy [DEFENDANT CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC.'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF JOSEPH DUFFY AS COUNSEL FOR CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC.] (Duffy, Joseph) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Jo Talarico [DEFENDANT CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC.'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF AMY J. TALARICO AS COUNSEL FOR CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC.] (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa Renee Chaves AS COUNSEL FOR GRINNELL LLC (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa Renee Chaves [DEFENDANT CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC.'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF MARISA R. CHAVES AS COUNSEL FOR CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC.] (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Denine Brown Yuen (Yuen, Nicole) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Duffy [DEFENDANT HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANYS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF JOSEPH DUFFY AS COUNSEL FOR HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANY] (Duffy, Joseph) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Jo Talarico [DEFENDANT HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANYS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF AMY J. TALARICO AS COUNSEL FOR HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANY] (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Certificate of Interested Entities by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Air & Liquid Systems Corporation for Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Powell, Glen) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa Renee Chaves [DEFENDANT HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANYS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF MARISA R. CHAVES AS COUNSEL FOR HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANY] (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Joinder in Defendant Greene Tweed & Co., Inc.'s Notice of Removal of Action Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sections 1442(a)(1) by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Powell, Glen) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by ITT LLC.. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Certificate of Interested Entities by ITT LLC [DEFENDANT ITT LLC'S CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS] (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Statement [DEFENDANT ITT LLC'S DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES] by ITT LLC. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand [DEFENDANT ITT LLC'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM ASBESTOS; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL] byITT LLC. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Duffy [DEFENDANT ITT LLC'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF JOSEPH DUFFY AS COUNSEL FOR ITT LLC] (Duffy, Joseph) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Jo Talarico [DEFENDANT ITT LLC'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF AMY J. TALARICO AS COUNSEL FOR ITT LLC] (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa Renee Chaves [DEFENDANT ITT LLC'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF MARISA R. CHAVES AS COUNSEL FOR ITT LLC] (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byGreene, Tweed & Co., Inc.. (Massenburg, Christopher) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis Dennis Pond on behalf of Defendant FMC Corporation, on behalf of its former Peerless Pump, Northern Pump and Stearns Businesses (Pond, Francis) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Entities by FMC Corporation Inc identifying Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group for FMC Corporation Inc. (Buck, James) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byFMC Corporation Inc. (Buck, James) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Carter Pieper on behalf of Defendant FMC Corporation, on behalf of its former Peerless Pump, Northern Pump and Stearns Businesses (Pieper, Timothy) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by James Michael Buck on behalf of Defendant FMC Corporation, on behalf of its former Peerless Pump, Northern Pump and Stearns Businesses (Buck, James) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by GARDNER DENVER, INC. identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll Rand Inc., Other Affiliate KKR & Co. L.P. for GARDNER DENVER, INC.. (Jenkins, Charles) (Filed on 12/27/2022)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles W. Jenkins, Jr (Jenkins, Charles) (Filed on 12/27/2022)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byGARDNER DENVER, INC.. (Jenkins, Charles) (Filed on 12/27/2022)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Owen Massenburg and David M. Glaspy counsel for Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc. (Massenburg, Christopher) (Filed on 12/23/2022)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Metalclad Insulation, LLC identifying Other Affiliate ENTRX LLC (Holding Company), Other Affiliate Central National Insurance Company (ACE Group), Other Affiliate Industrial Underwriters (ACE Group), Other Affiliate Motor Vehicle Insurance Company (ACE Group), Other Affiliate Hartford Fire Insurance Company (Hartford Group), Other Affiliate Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company (Hartford Group), Other Affiliate First State Insurance Company (Hartford Group), Other Affiliate Continental Casualty Company (CNA Group), Other Affiliate Harbor Insurance Company (CNA Group), Other Affiliate Northbrook Insurance Company (Allstate), Other Affiliate Granite State Insurance Company (AIG Group), Other Affiliate National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA (AIG Group), Other Affiliate American Home Insurance Company (AIG Group), Other Affiliate American Motorist Insurance Company, in liquidation (Chubb Group), Other Affiliate Transport Case Insurance Company for Metalclad Insulation, LLC. (Hoye, Daniel) (Filed on 12/22/2022)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel B. Hoye Lisa L. Oberg & Lisa M. Rickenbacher (Hoye, Daniel) (Filed on 12/22/2022)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE by Metalclad Insulation, LLC Of Re-Filing State Court Answer To Complaint (Hoye, Daniel) (Filed on 12/22/2022)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honeywell International, Inc. FKA Allied Signal Inc, Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to the Bendix Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Bendix Corporation, The for Honeywell International, Inc. FKA Allied Signal Inc, Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to the Bendix Corporation. and Certification as to Interested Parties (Lashinsky, Natalie) (Filed on 12/22/2022)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie Garcia Lashinsky for Defendant Honeywell International, Inc., f/k/a AlliedSignal Inc., Successor-in-Interest to The Bendix Corporation (Lashinsky, Natalie) (Filed on 12/22/2022)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE by Honeywell International, Inc. FKA Allied Signal Inc, Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to the Bendix Corporation of Re-Filing State Court Answer to Complaint (Lashinsky, Natalie) (Filed on 12/22/2022)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/4/2023. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2022)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent GT Global Holdings, Inc. for Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc.. (Massenburg, Christopher) (Filed on 12/21/2022)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda Superior Court. Their case number is 22CV021840. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-17844401). Filed byGreene, Tweed & Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A iso Removal, #2 Exhibit B iso Removal, #3 Exhibit C iso Removal, #4 Exhibit D0 iso Removal, #5 Exhibit D1 iso Removal, #6 Exhibit D2 iso Removal, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Massenburg, Christopher) (Filed on 12/21/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marcus et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAVER BROOKS, INC.
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Marisa Renee Chaves
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOMCO PR.O.DUCTS TEXAS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc. FKA Allied Signal Inc, Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to the Bendix Corporation
Represented By: Natalie Garcia Lashinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REDCO CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SB Decking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHNEIDERELECTRIC USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Glen R. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONA.L, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP, INC., individually and as successor in interest to BYRON JACKSON PUMP CO.
Represented By: Nicole Denine Brown Yuen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BWDAC, INC.
Represented By: Bina Ghanaat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLARK RELIANCE CORPORATION
Represented By: Nicole Denine Brown Yuen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: f
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Marisa Renee Chaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE DARCOID COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOMCO INC., FLOOR PRODUCTS (TEXAS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AZROCIC 1NDUSTRIES INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UVALDE ROCK ASPHALT COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EATON CORPORATION
Represented By: Bina Ghanaat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLOWSERVE US, INC. as successor-in-interest to DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION
Represented By: Nicole Denine Brown Yuen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US, Inc., solely as successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation Inc
Represented By: Francis Dennis Pond
Represented By: James Michael Buck
Represented By: Timothy Carter Pieper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: Robert J Bugatto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARDNER DENVER, INC.
Represented By: Charles W. Jenkins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Derek S. Johnson
Represented By: Charles T. Sheldon
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Anselmo
Represented By: Katherine Paige Gardiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Jennifer Anne Cormier
Represented By: Kristi L.K. Young
Represented By: Sean Christopher McGah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Owen Massenburg
Represented By: David Michael Glaspy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Marisa Renee Chaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HILL BROTHERS C.HEMICAL COMPANY
Represented By: Marisa Renee Chaves
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIGNAL OIL & GAS COMPANY
Represented By: Natalie Garcia Lashinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc., Individually and as successor in interest to Delaval Turbine Inc. and Sharples, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT LLC
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Marisa Renee Chaves
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.R. Clarkson Company LLC
Represented By: Andrew Livingston Sharp
Represented By: Saleem Belbahri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc.
Represented By: Narine Levonyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation, LLC
Represented By: Daniel B. Hoye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morse Tec LLC fka Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to Borgwarner Corporation
Represented By: Lisa Marie Rickenbacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARAMOUNT GLOBAL f/k/a VIACOMCBS INC. f/k/a CBS CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation, f/k/a VIACOM INC., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker Hannifin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker Hannifin Corporation as Successor-In-Interest to Sacomo-Sierra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plant Products & Supply Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: formerly known as CRANE CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROCKWELL AUTOMATION,INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: formerly known as SELBY, BATTERSBY & CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirax Sarco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Motor Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc.
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Represented By: Carla Lynn Crochet
Represented By: Jeremy David Milbrodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triple A Machine Shop, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corporation
Represented By: Glen R. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: James P. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARAMOUNT GLOBAL
Represented By: Erin Nicole Empting
Represented By: Justin Finnell Cronin
Represented By: Kevin Douglas Jamison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL R. MARCUS
Represented By: David Lee Amell
Represented By: Rabiah N. Oral
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICTORIA L. MARCUS
Represented By: David Lee Amell
Represented By: Rabiah N. Oral
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?