Doe v. Hey Favor, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Hey Favor, Inc., FullStory, Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc., TikTok, Inc. and ByteDance Inc.
Interested Party: Google LLC
Not Classified By Court: GoodRx Holdings, Inc. and Healthcare Plaintiffs in 22-cv-3580
Case Number: 3:2023cv00059
Filed: January 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2023 Filing 106 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/15/2023 before Judge William H. Orrick by FullStory, Inc., for Court Reporter Jan Davis. (Verdin, Matthew) (Filed on 11/20/2023)
November 16, 2023 Filing 105 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/15/2023 before Judge William H. Orrick by Meta Platforms, Inc., for Court Reporter Jan Davis. (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 11/16/2023)
November 16, 2023 Filing 104 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/15/2023, before Judge William H. Orrick for Court Reporter Jan Davis, ordered by Amanda Fiorilla. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2023)
November 16, 2023 Filing 103 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/15/2023 before Judge William H. Orrick by ByteDance Inc., TikTok, Inc., for Court Reporter Jan Davis. (Mancall-Bitel, Sophia) (Filed on 11/16/2023) Modified on 11/16/2023 (knm, COURT STAFF).
November 15, 2023 Filing 102 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 11/15/2023 re #88 , #90 , #91 Motions to Dismiss. Motions taken under submission; written order to follow. Total Time in Court: 47 minutes. Court Reporter: Janet Davis. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/15/2023)
November 15, 2023 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffine Malamphy (Malamphy, Tiffine) (Filed on 11/15/2023)
November 13, 2023 Filing 100 CLERKS NOTICE RE ZOOM HEARING - The motion hearing set for 11/15/2023 at 2:00 p.m. will be held via Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2023)
October 30, 2023 Filing 99 REPLY (re #90 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint ) filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Reply in Support of Request for Judicial Notice)(Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 10/30/2023)
October 30, 2023 Filing 98 REPLY (re #91 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint ) filed byByteDance Inc., TikTok, Inc.. (Weibell, Anthony) (Filed on 10/30/2023)
October 30, 2023 Filing 97 REPLY (re #88 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint ) -- Defendant FullStory, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, filed byFullStory, Inc.. (Henn, Emily) (Filed on 10/30/2023)
October 13, 2023 Filing 96 Request for Judicial Notice re #95 Opposition/Response to Motion, #92 Opposition/Response to Motion, #93 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byJane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Levis, #2 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #95 , #92 , #93 ) (Levis, Christian) (Filed on 10/13/2023)
October 13, 2023 Filing 95 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #88 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint ) filed byJane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Levis, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O)(Levis, Christian) (Filed on 10/13/2023)
October 13, 2023 Filing 94 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #90 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint ) to Defendants' Joint Request for Judicial Notice filed byJane Doe. (Levis, Christian) (Filed on 10/13/2023)
October 13, 2023 Filing 93 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #91 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint ) filed byJane Doe. (Kim, Jae) (Filed on 10/13/2023)
October 13, 2023 Filing 92 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #90 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint ) filed byJane Doe. (Kim, Jae) (Filed on 10/13/2023)
September 1, 2023 Filing 91 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by ByteDance Inc., TikTok, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 10/13/2023. Replies due by 10/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Weibell, Anthony) (Filed on 9/1/2023)
September 1, 2023 Filing 90 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 10/13/2023. Replies due by 10/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 Joint Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Declaration of Abigail A. Barrera, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Proposed Order)(Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 9/1/2023)
September 1, 2023 Filing 89 Correction of Opposition/Response or Reply Deadlines pertaining to #88 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Reason: By order of the court) filed byFullStory, Inc.. Responses due by 10/13/2023. Replies due by 10/30/2023. (Henn, Emily) (Filed on 9/1/2023)
September 1, 2023 Filing 88 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by FullStory, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 9/15/2023. Replies due by 9/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Q. Verdin, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Henn, Emily) (Filed on 9/1/2023)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Case Management Statement due by 1/2/2024. Case Management Conference reset for 1/9/2024 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2023 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/11/2023. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2023)
August 11, 2023 Filing 86 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule on Motions to Dismiss and Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Darcy C. Harris)(Harris, Darcy) (Filed on 8/11/2023)
July 31, 2023 Filing 85 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ByteDance Inc., FullStory, Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc., TikTok, Inc.. Filed byJane Doe. (Levis, Christian) (Filed on 7/31/2023)
July 31, 2023 Filing 84 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Hey Favor, Inc. and Plaintiff's Seventh Claim for Relief With Prejudice by Jane Doe (Levis, Christian) (Filed on 7/31/2023)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER LIFTING STAY by Judge William H. Orrick granting #76 Motion to Lift Stay. Case Management Conference set for 9/19/2023 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Case Management Statement due by 9/12/2023. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2023)
July 10, 2023 Filing 82 CLERK'S NOTICE - Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-1(b), it has been determined that the #76 Motion to Dismiss is appropriate for disposition without oral argument; as such, the hearing set for 7/12/2023 is VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2023)
July 6, 2023 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Sophia Morris Mancall-Bitel for Defendants TikTok Inc. and ByteDance Inc. (Mancall-Bitel, Sophia) (Filed on 7/6/2023)
June 26, 2023 Filing 80 REPLY (re #76 MOTION to Lift Stay ) filed byJane Doe. (Levis, Christian) (Filed on 6/26/2023)
June 19, 2023 Filing 79 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #76 MOTION to Lift Stay ) Defendants Tiktok Inc., Bytedance Inc., Fullstory Inc. and Meta Platforms, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Stay filed byByteDance Inc., TikTok, Inc.. (Weibell, Anthony) (Filed on 6/19/2023)
June 15, 2023 Filing 78 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 16, 2023, before Judge Willaim H. Orrick. Court Reporter Elaine Cropper; 602-322-7245; elaine_cropper@azd.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/13/2023. (Cropper, Elaine) (Filed on 6/15/2023)
June 14, 2023 Filing 77 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/16/2023 before Judge William H. Orrick by ByteDance Inc., TikTok, Inc., for Court Reporter Elaine Cropper. (Wakefield, Thomas) (Filed on 6/14/2023)
June 5, 2023 Filing 76 MOTION to Lift Stay filed by Jane Doe. Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2023 02:00 PM before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 6/19/2023. Replies due by 6/26/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Levis, Christian) (Filed on 6/5/2023)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER DENYING #54 MOTION TO SEVER by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2023)
May 22, 2023 Filing 74 Plaintiff's Response to Non-Party's Memorandum in Support of Meta's Motion to Sever Claims Against Meta re #73 filed by Jane Doe. (Related document(s) #73 ) ( Levis, Christian) (Filed on 5/22/2023) Modified on 5/24/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
May 18, 2023 Filing 73 Brief re #54 MOTION to Sever Claims Against Defendant Meta Platforms, Inc. (Healthcare Plaintiffs Memorandum in Support of Metas Motion to Sever Claims Against Meta in the Hey Favor Action) filed byHealthcare Plaintiffs in 22-cv-3580. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Geoffrey Graber, #2 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #54 ) (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/18/2023)
May 16, 2023 Filing 72 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Further Case Management Conference held on 5/16/2023. Any additional briefing in support of the motion to sever should be submitted by Thursday, May 18, 2023; further briefing in opposition may be submitted by Monday, May 22, 2023. Total Time in Court: 12 minutes. Court Reporter: Elaine Cropper. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/16/2023)
May 15, 2023 Filing 71 CLERKS NOTICE RE ZOOM HEARING - The Civil Case Management Conference set for 05/16/2023 at 2:00 p.m. will be held via Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2023)
May 12, 2023 Filing 70 Letter from FullStory, Inc., TikTok Inc., ByteDance Inc. regarding Plaintiff's May 5, 2023 Letter. (Lannin, Cortlin) (Filed on 5/12/2023)
May 12, 2023 Filing 69 Letter from Meta Platforms, Inc. Regarding Plaintiff's May 5, 2023 Letter. (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 5/12/2023)
May 10, 2023 Filing 68 CLERK'S NOTICE - A Case Management Conference is set for May 16, 2023 at 2:00 pm. All parties, except Hey Favor, shall appear. No Case Management Statement need be filed, but defendants (other than Hey Favor) shall file a response not to exceed two pages by May 12, 2023, regarding their position on plaintiff's #65 letter. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2023)
May 9, 2023 Filing 67 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #66 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Request that the Court Rule on Meta's Pending Motion to Sever re #54 MOTION to Sever Claims Against Defendant Meta Platforms, Inc. ) filed byJane Doe. (Levis, Christian) (Filed on 5/9/2023)
May 5, 2023 Filing 66 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Request that the Court Rule on Meta's Pending Motion to Sever re #54 MOTION to Sever Claims Against Defendant Meta Platforms, Inc. filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Responses due by 5/9/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 5/5/2023)
May 5, 2023 Filing 65 Letter from Christian Levis regarding Notice of Pendency of Bankruptcy . (Levis, Christian) (Filed on 5/5/2023)
April 29, 2023 Filing 64 CLERK'S NOTICE - Given the #63 Suggestion of Bankruptcy, the hearing on 954] Motion to Sever Claims is VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2023)
April 27, 2023 Filing 63 NOTICE by Hey Favor, Inc. of Suggestion on Pendency of Bankruptcy and Automatic Stay of Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Notice of Commencement)(Cheung, Tiffany) (Filed on 4/27/2023)
April 13, 2023 Filing 62 REPLY (re #54 MOTION to Sever Claims Against Defendant Meta Platforms, Inc. ) filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 4/13/2023)
April 6, 2023 Filing 61 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #54 MOTION to Sever Claims Against Defendant Meta Platforms, Inc. ) filed byJane Doe. (Levis, Christian) (Filed on 4/6/2023)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #55 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Response to Complaint. Defendants shall file their answer or other response within twenty days of the Court's decision on the motion to sever. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wholc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2023)
March 29, 2023 Filing 59 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by ByteDance Inc., TikTok, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ByteDance Ltd. for ByteDance Inc.; Corporate Parent TikTok LLC for TikTok, Inc., Corporate Parent TikTok Ltd. for TikTok, Inc. (Weibell, Anthony) (Filed on 3/29/2023) Modified on 3/29/2023 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
March 29, 2023 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Robert Wakefield on Behalf of TikTok Inc. and ByteDance Inc. (Wakefield, Thomas) (Filed on 3/29/2023)
March 29, 2023 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Victor Jih on Behalf of TikTok Inc. and ByteDance Inc. (Jih, Victor) (Filed on 3/29/2023)
March 28, 2023 Filing 56 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #55 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Administrative Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to Complaint ) filed byJane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Levis, #2 Exhibit A)(Levis, Christian) (Filed on 3/28/2023)
March 24, 2023 Filing 55 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Administrative Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Darcy C. Harris in Support of Motion to Enlarge Time, #2 Proposed Order)(Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 3/24/2023)
March 23, 2023 Filing 54 MOTION to Sever Claims Against Defendant Meta Platforms, Inc. filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 4/6/2023. Replies due by 4/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Darcy C. Harris in Support of Motion to Sever, #2 Proposed Order)(Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 3/23/2023)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER (1) EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT, (2) SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS' ANTICIPATED MOTIONS TO DISMISS, AND (3) CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge William H. Orrick granting #52 Stipulation. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2023)
March 7, 2023 Filing 52 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (1) Extending Time to Respond to Complaint, (2) Setting Briefing Schedule of Defendants Anticipated Motions to Dismiss, and (3) Continuing Initial Case Management Conference filed by Hey Favor, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tiffany Cheung In Support of Stipulation and [Proposed] Order)(Cheung, Tiffany) (Filed on 3/7/2023)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #45 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Darcy C. Harris. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2023)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Order by Judge William H. Orrick denying #44 Motion to relate Case No. 23-cv-501-LB. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2023)
February 21, 2023 Filing 49 NOTICE by GoodRx Holdings, Inc. re #47 Opposition/Response to Motion, #44 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to consider whether cases should be related / DEFENDANT META PLATFORMS, INC.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED Notice of Lodging of [Proposed] Order Denying Meta Platforms, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Meta Platforms, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related)(Shipley, Michael) (Filed on 2/21/2023)
February 21, 2023 Filing 48 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #44 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to consider whether cases should be related / DEFENDANT META PLATFORMS, INC.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED ) filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 2/21/2023)
February 21, 2023 Filing 47 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #44 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to consider whether cases should be related / DEFENDANT META PLATFORMS, INC.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED ) filed byGoodRx Holdings, Inc.. (Shipley, Michael) (Filed on 2/21/2023)
February 21, 2023 Filing 46 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #44 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to consider whether cases should be related / DEFENDANT META PLATFORMS, INC.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED ) filed byJane Doe. (Levis, Christian) (Filed on 2/21/2023)
February 17, 2023 Filing 45 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Defendant Meta Platforms, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18003469.) filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Harris, Darcy) (Filed on 2/17/2023)
February 17, 2023 Filing 44 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to consider whether cases should be related / DEFENDANT META PLATFORMS, INC.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed by Meta Platforms, Inc. Responses due by 2/21/2023. (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 2/17/2023) Modified on 2/17/2023 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2023 Filing 43 Certificate of Interested Entities by FullStory, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Google Ventures for FullStory, Inc.. (Henn, Emily) (Filed on 2/6/2023)
February 6, 2023 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, do NOT bypass the screen, enter all affiliates or corporate parents.This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #40 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by FullStory, Inc. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2023)
February 3, 2023 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Quinn Verdin as Counsel of Record for Defendant FullStory, Inc. (Verdin, Matthew) (Filed on 2/3/2023)
February 3, 2023 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Cortlin Hall Lannin as Counsel of Record for Defendant FullStory, Inc. (Lannin, Cortlin) (Filed on 2/3/2023)
February 3, 2023 Filing 40 Certificate of Interested Entities by FullStory, Inc. (Henn, Emily) (Filed on 2/3/2023)
February 3, 2023 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Johnson Henn as Counsel of Record for Defendant FullStory, Inc. (Henn, Emily) (Filed on 2/3/2023)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #36 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Adam J. Hunt. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2023)
February 1, 2023 Filing 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hey Favor, Inc. [and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Cheung, Tiffany) (Filed on 2/1/2023)
February 1, 2023 Filing 36 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17948418.) filed by Hey Favor, Inc.. (Hunt, Adam) (Filed on 2/1/2023)
February 1, 2023 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Anissa Chitour (Chitour, Anissa) (Filed on 2/1/2023)
February 1, 2023 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany Cheung (Cheung, Tiffany) (Filed on 2/1/2023)
January 30, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline A. Lebel for Defendant Meta Platforms, Inc. (Lebel, Caroline) (Filed on 1/30/2023)
January 30, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Wong for Defendant Meta Platforms, Inc. (Wong, Kyle) (Filed on 1/30/2023)
January 30, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Graham Rhodes for Defendant Meta Platforms, Inc. (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 1/30/2023)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Lauren Goldman. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2023)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 4/4/2023 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Case Management Statement due by 3/28/2023. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 1/27/2023. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2023)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Judge Maxine M. Chesney no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 01/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2023)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 27, 2023. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2023)
January 27, 2023 Filing 26 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to the Complaint filed by ByteDance Inc., TikTok, Inc.. (Weibell, Anthony) (Filed on 1/27/2023)
January 26, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Katharine McCloskey for Defendant Meta Platforms, Inc. (McCloskey, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/26/2023)
January 26, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17933969.) filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 1/26/2023)
January 26, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M. Kasabian for Defendant Meta Platforms, Inc. (Kasabian, Andrew) (Filed on 1/26/2023)
January 26, 2023 Filing 22 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Meta Platforms, Inc. (Barrera, Abigail) (Filed on 1/26/2023)
January 26, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Abigail Augus Barrera for Defendant Meta Platforms, Inc. (Barrera, Abigail) (Filed on 1/26/2023)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/7/2023 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/31/2023.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 1/23/2023. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2023)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 01/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2023)
January 19, 2023 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2023)
January 19, 2023 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jane Doe.. (Levis, Christian) (Filed on 1/19/2023)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Rachel Isabel Kesten representing Plaintiff. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2023)
January 18, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17906018.) filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kesten, Rachel) (Filed on 1/18/2023)
January 17, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Doe. TikTok, Inc. served on 1/9/2023, answer due 1/30/2023. (Kim, Jae) (Filed on 1/17/2023)
January 17, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Doe. Meta Platforms, Inc. served on 1/9/2023, answer due 1/30/2023. (Kim, Jae) (Filed on 1/17/2023)
January 17, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Doe. Hey Favor, Inc. served on 1/9/2023, answer due 1/30/2023. (Kim, Jae) (Filed on 1/17/2023)
January 17, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Doe. FullStory, Inc. served on 1/9/2023, answer due 1/30/2023. (Kim, Jae) (Filed on 1/17/2023)
January 17, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Doe. ByteDance Inc. served on 1/9/2023, answer due 1/30/2023. (Kim, Jae) (Filed on 1/17/2023)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Amanda Grace Fiorilla representing Plaintiff. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2023)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Christian Levis representing Plaintiff. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2023)
January 17, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number BCANDC-17902414.) filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Fiorilla, Amanda) (Filed on 1/17/2023)
January 17, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17902394.) filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Levis, Christian) (Filed on 1/17/2023)
January 5, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to ByteDance Inc., FullStory, Inc., Hey Favor, Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc., TikTok, Inc. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2023)
January 5, 2023 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/30/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/6/2023 11:00 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2023)
January 5, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/19/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2023)
January 5, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Kim, Jae) (Filed on 1/5/2023)
January 5, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ByteDance Inc., FullStory, Inc., Hey Favor, Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc., TikTok, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17873832.). Filed byJane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kim, Jae) (Filed on 1/5/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Hey Favor, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Jae K. Kim
Represented By: Amanda Grace Fiorilla
Represented By: Christian Levis
Represented By: Rachel Isabel Kesten
Represented By: Tiffine Malamphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hey Favor, Inc.
Represented By: Anissa Chitour
Represented By: Tiffany Cheung
Represented By: Adam James Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FullStory, Inc.
Represented By: Cortlin Hall Lannin
Represented By: Emily Johnson Henn
Represented By: Matthew Quinn Verdin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meta Platforms, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Abigail Augus Barrera
Represented By: Andrew M. Kasabian
Represented By: Elizabeth Katharine McCloskey
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Caroline A. Lebel
Represented By: Kyle Wong
Represented By: Darcy Caitlyn Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TikTok, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony J. Weibell
Represented By: Victor Jih
Represented By: Thomas Robert Wakefield
Represented By: Sophia Morris Mancall-Bitel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ByteDance Inc.
Represented By: Anthony J. Weibell
Represented By: Thomas Robert Wakefield
Represented By: Victor Jih
Represented By: Sophia Morris Mancall-Bitel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Google LLC
Represented By: Benedict Y. Hur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: GoodRx Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Michael John Shipley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Healthcare Plaintiffs in 22-cv-3580
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Koncius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?