Meta Platforms, Inc. v. Bright Data Ltd.
Plaintiff: Meta Platforms, Inc.
Defendant: Bright Data Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00077
Filed: January 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Alex G Tse
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2023 Filing 170 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/16/2023 before Judge Edward M Chen by Meta Platforms, Inc., for Court Reporter Christine M Coaly. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 11/20/2023)
November 20, 2023 Filing 169 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/16/2023 before Judge Edward M Chen by Bright Data Ltd., for Court Reporter Christine M Coaly. (Kass, Colin) (Filed on 11/20/2023)
November 16, 2023 Filing 168 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M Chen: Motion Hearing held on 11/16/2023 re #75 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count One and #105 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Liability on Meta's Contract Claim based on Bright Data's Sale of Scraped Data and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Total Time in Court: 52 Minutes. Court Reporter: Christine Coaly. (vla, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/16/2023)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying #164 Motion for Administrative Leave to File Supplemental Evidence; finding as moot #165 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed. (emclc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2023)
November 13, 2023 Filing 166 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #164 MOTION for Administrative Relief for Leave to File Supplemental Evidence in Support of Its Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Bright Data's Motion for Summary Judgment ) filed byBright Data Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David A. Munkittrick with Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Kass, Colin) (Filed on 11/13/2023)
November 10, 2023 Filing 165 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Version of Meta Platforms, Inc.'s Motion for Administrative Relief for Leave to File Supplemental Evidence in Support of Its Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Bright Data's Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Unredacted Version of Supplemental Declaration of Ari Holtzblatt in Support, #3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H, #5 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 11/10/2023)
November 10, 2023 Filing 164 MOTION for Administrative Relief for Leave to File Supplemental Evidence in Support of Its Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Bright Data's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Responses due by 11/24/2023. Replies due by 12/1/2023. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Ari Holtzblatt in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 11/10/2023)
November 10, 2023 Filing 163 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Non-Waiver of Privilege filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 11/10/2023)
November 9, 2023 Filing 162 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Third Joint filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 11/9/2023)
November 6, 2023 Filing 161 CLERK'S NOTICE CONVERTING MOTIONS HEARING FROM ZOOM TO IN-PERSON. Motions Hearing as to #75 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count One; #105 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Liability on Meta's Contract Claim based on Bright Data's Sale of Scraped Data and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment reset from 11/16/2023 via Zoom to 11/16/2023, at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M Chen. Status Conference reset from 11/16/2023 via Zoom to 11/16/2023, at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2023)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER by Judge Edward M Chen GRANTING #159 Joint Stipulation Requesting Extension to Propose a Mediator. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2023)
November 1, 2023 Filing 159 Joint STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting Extension to Propose a Mediator filed by Meta Platforms, Inc. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 11/1/2023)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Order by Judge Edward M Chen GRANTING #157 STIPULATION REGARDING JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO DISMISS.(vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2023)
October 16, 2023 Filing 157 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Jurisdictional Discovery and Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Holtzblatt, Ari) (Filed on 10/16/2023)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting Stipulation Regarding Deadline for META's Declaration Regarding Data Fields signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting #155 Stipulation. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2023)
October 12, 2023 Filing 155 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Deadline for Meta's Declaration Regarding Data Fields filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 10/12/2023)
October 6, 2023 Per ECF #154 CASE REFERRED to Private ADR. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2023)
September 21, 2023 Filing 152 Transcript of Proceedings held on 09/18/23, before Judge Magistrate Judge Alex Tse. Court Reporter/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., telephone number echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: 8:57 - 9:54. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #149 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 10/12/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/23/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/20/2023. (Related documents(s) #149 ) (Jauregui, Tara) (Filed on 9/21/2023)
September 20, 2023 Filing 151 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/19/2023 before Judge Edward M Chen by Meta Platforms, Inc., for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 9/20/2023)
September 20, 2023 Filing 149 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/19/2023 before Judge Edward M Chen by Bright Data Ltd., for Recorded Proceeding - San Francisco. (Kass, Colin) (Filed on 9/20/2023)
September 20, 2023 Filing 148 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/18/2023 before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse by Bright Data Ltd., for Recorded Proceeding - San Francisco. (Kass, Colin) (Filed on 9/20/2023)
September 20, 2023 Filing 147 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/18/2023 before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse by Meta Platforms, Inc., for Recorded Proceeding - San Francisco. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 9/20/2023)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 154 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Close of Fact Discovery 8/1/2024. Opening Reports due by 10/4/2024. Rebuttal Reports due by 11/8/2024. Close of Expert Discovery 12/6/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 1/24/2025; Oppositions due by 2/28/2025; Replies due by 2/28/2025; Hearing Date 4/24/2025, at 1:30 PM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/27/2025, at 2:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Jury Selection set for 6/23/2025, at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M Chen. Jury Trial set for 6/23/2025, 6/24/2023, 6/25/2025, 6/27/2025, 6/30/2025, 7/1/2025, and 7/2/2025, at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Jury Questionnaire)(vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2023)
September 19, 2023 Filing 150 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M Chen: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/19/2023. Joint Status Report due by 11/9/2023. Status Conference set for 11/16/2023, at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. ALL COUNSEL PARTICIPATING IN THE HEARING ARE REQUIRED TO LOG INTO ZOOM NO LATER THAN 1:20 PMWebinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Total Time in Court: 14 Minutes. Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez. (vla, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/19/2023)
September 18, 2023 Filing 146 Minute Entry for discovery hearing held on 9/18/2023 before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse regarding discovery letter briefs filed at dkt #116 and dkt #117 . Discussion held. Rulings stated on the record. Zoom Recording Time: 8:57 - 9:54. Plaintiff Attorneys: Sonal Mehta and Allison Que. Defendant Attorneys: David Munkittrick and Colin Kass. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/18/2023) Proceedings transcribed by Tara Jauregui of Echo Reporting (echoreporting@yahoo.com). (bns, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 145 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse on 9/18/2023. (agtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2023)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 144 Discovery Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse re: #116 #117 discovery disputes. (agtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2023)
September 18, 2023 Filing 143 Proposed Order re #142 Order /Proposed Protective Order by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A: [Proposed] Protective Order)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 9/18/2023)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse re #135 Joint Submission Regarding Provisions in Dispute Concerning the Model Protective Order. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2023)
September 14, 2023 Filing 141 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING DISCOVERY HEARING: The parties are hereby notified that a discovery hearing is set for 9/18/2023 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/agt General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2023)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 140 DISCOVERY ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: denying #90 Discovery Letter Brief; denying #99 Discovery Letter Brief; denying #100 Discovery Letter Brief; denying #101 Discovery Letter Brief; denying #102 Discovery Letter Brief; denying #103 Discovery Letter Brief; denying #109 Discovery Letter Brief; denying #110 Discovery Letter Brief; denying #111 Discovery Letter Brief; denying #118 Discovery Letter Brief; denying #119 Discovery Letter Brief; denying #121 Discovery Letter Brief. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2023)
September 13, 2023 Filing 139 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING MOTIONS HEARING. Motions Hearing as to #105 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Liability on Meta's Contract Claim based on Bright Data's Sale of Scraped Data and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and #75 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count One reset from 10/19/2023 to 11/16/2023, at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. ALL COUNSEL PARTICIPATING IN THE HEARING ARE REQUIRED TO LOG INTO ZOOM NO LATER THAN 1:20 PM.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2023)
September 12, 2023 Filing 138 SECOND JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 9/12/2023) Modified on 9/12/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2023 Filing 137 REPLY (re #105 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Liability on Meta's Contract Claim based on Bright Data's Sale of Scraped Data and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment ) filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 9/11/2023)
September 8, 2023 Filing 136 STATUS REPORT Regarding Outstanding Discovery Disputes in Response to Dkt. 131 (Joint) by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 9/8/2023)
September 7, 2023 Filing 135 JOINT SUBMISSION REGARDING PROVISIONS IN DISPUTE CONCERNING THE MODEL PROTECTIVE ORDER by Meta Platforms, Inc. re #131 Order on Discovery Letter Brief,of Joint Submission Regarding Provisions in Dispute Concerning the Model Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Appendix A: Model Protective Order) (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 9/7/2023) Modified on 9/7/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2023 Filing 134 AFFIDAVIT /Declaration of Mehta re #126 Order by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 9/1/2023)
August 31, 2023 Filing 133 NOTICE by Bright Data Ltd. re #126 Order re: Submission of Party Declarations (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Or Lenchner), #2 Exhibit B (Declaration of Ethan Gadon), #3 Exhibit C (Declaration of Mor Avisar))(Kass, Colin) (Filed on 8/31/2023)
August 30, 2023 Filing 132 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8/25/2023, before Judge Alex G. Tse. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kelly Shainline, Official Court Reporter, telephone number (510) 828-9404, E-mail kelly_shainline@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #130 Transcript Order, #129 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/28/2023. (Related documents(s) #130 , #129 ) (Shainline, Kelly) (Filed on 8/30/2023)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Discovery Order re: #91 #113 #115 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. (agtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2023)
August 28, 2023 Filing 130 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/25/2023 before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse by Bright Data Ltd., for Court Reporter Kelly Shainline. (Kass, Colin) (Filed on 8/28/2023)
August 28, 2023 Filing 129 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/25/2023 before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse by Meta Platforms, Inc., for Court Reporter Kelly Shainline. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 8/28/2023)
August 25, 2023 Filing 128 Minute Entry for proceedings held on 8/25/2023 before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Discussion held regarding motion for protective order and some of the pending discovery disputes. The Court will issue an order memorializing the rulings made on the record. The parties shall submit supplemental information pertaining to the provisions in dispute concerning the model protective order. The parties shall meet and confer further regarding their outstanding disputes, then submit a written update not later than 9/8/2023. Court Reporter: Kelly Shainline.Plaintiff Attorneys: Sonal N. Mehta and Ari Holtzblatt. Defendant Attorneys: Colin Kass and David Munkittrick. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/25/2023)
August 24, 2023 Filing 127 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/12/2023. Further Case Management Conference reset from 8/29/2023, to 9/19/2023, at 2:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. ALL COUNSEL PARTICIPATING IN THE HEARING ARE REQUIRED TO LOG INTO ZOOM NO LATER THAN 2:20 PMWebinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2023)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER re #125 Case Management Conference Statement. The Court strikes the filing from the record and continues the CMC to September 19, 2023, at 2:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/24/2023. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2023)
August 22, 2023 Filing 125 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 8/22/2023)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse regarding the Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2023. The parties seek guidance on how to prepare for the hearing. In addition to the motion for protective order #106 , the Court has identified issues related to the prospective protective order in the discovery letters at Dkts. #90 , #91 , #100 , #103 , and #118 . It makes sense to have a full discussion of the protective order and the related discovery concurrently. The Court's intention is to address only the issues involving the protective order at the hearing. Letters found at Dkts. #90 , #91 , and #103 , raise additional issues unrelated to the protective order and Court intends to resolve those disputes at a later time. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (agtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2023)
August 21, 2023 Filing 123 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING LOCATION FOR HEARING ON MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER: The parties are hereby notified that the hearing on #106 motion for protective order, which is set for 8/25/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse, will be held in San Francisco, courtroom A, 15th floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2023)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 122 Order by Judge Edward M Chen GRANTING #120 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Ryan Daily.(vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2023)
August 17, 2023 Filing 121 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding a Discovery Dispute Relating to Bright Data's Search Methodology and Responsiveness Determinations filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J)(Perio, Ryanne) (Filed on 8/17/2023)
August 17, 2023 Filing 120 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18556415.) filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Daily, Ryan) (Filed on 8/17/2023)
August 15, 2023 Filing 119 Joint Discovery Letter Brief regarding use of Facebook and Instagram Documents filed by Bright Data Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David A. Munkittrick with Exhibits)(Kass, Colin) (Filed on 8/15/2023)
August 14, 2023 Filing 118 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Discovery Dispute Involving Meta's Request for Bright Data's Identification of Customers filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Perio, Ryanne) (Filed on 8/14/2023)
August 14, 2023 Filing 117 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Discovery Dispute Involving Bright Data's Affiliated Entities filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Perio, Ryanne) (Filed on 8/14/2023)
August 14, 2023 Filing 116 Joint Discovery Letter Brief on Dispute re Data Field Information filed by Bright Data Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Karumudi Declaration)(Kass, Colin) (Filed on 8/14/2023)
August 11, 2023 Filing 115 Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Bright Data's Letter Brief (Dkt. 113) filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 8/11/2023)
August 11, 2023 Filing 114 REPLY JUDGMENT REPLY AND CROSS-OPPOSITION (re #75 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count One, #105 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Liability on Meta's Contract Claim based on Bright Data's Sale of Scraped Data and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment ) filed by Bright Data Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David A. Munkittrick, with exhibits)(Kass, Colin) (Filed on 8/11/2023) Modified on 8/14/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2023 Filing 113 Discovery Letter Brief regarding Account Activity Evidence filed by Bright Data Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David A. Munkittrick, with exhibits)(Kass, Colin) (Filed on 8/10/2023)
August 7, 2023 Filing 112 REPLY (re #106 MOTION for Protective Order ) filed byBright Data Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David A. Munkittrick with Exhibits)(Kass, Colin) (Filed on 8/7/2023)
August 2, 2023 Filing 111 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Non-Account Holder Services filed by Bright Data Ltd.. (Kass, Colin) (Filed on 8/2/2023)
August 2, 2023 Filing 110 Joint Discovery Letter Brief regarding Public Availability of User Information filed by Bright Data Ltd.. (Kass, Colin) (Filed on 8/2/2023)
August 2, 2023 Filing 109 Joint Discovery Letter Brief regarding Term Interpretation Evidence filed by Bright Data Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David A. Munkittrick, with exhibits)(Kass, Colin) (Filed on 8/2/2023)
July 31, 2023 Filing 108 DECLARATION of Ari Holtzblatt in Opposition to #106 MOTION for Protective Order filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Related document(s) #106 ) (Holtzblatt, Ari) (Filed on 7/31/2023)
July 31, 2023 Filing 107 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #106 MOTION for Protective Order ) filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. (Holtzblatt, Ari) (Filed on 7/31/2023)
July 17, 2023 Filing 106 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Bright Data Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2023 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Responses due by 7/31/2023. Replies due by 8/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David A. Munkittrick, with exhibits)(Kass, Colin) (Filed on 7/17/2023)
July 12, 2023 Filing 105 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Liability on Meta's Contract Claim based on Bright Data's Sale of Scraped Data and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/19/2023 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Judge Edward M Chen. Responses due by 7/26/2023. Replies due by 8/2/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ari Holtzblatt in Support and Exhibits A-F, #2 Declaration of Tushar Karumudi in Support and Exhibits A-B, #3 Declaration of Michael Clark in Support, #4 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 7/12/2023)
July 10, 2023 Filing 104 NOTICE by Meta Platforms, Inc. of Withdrawal of Counsel (Teuber, Stephanie) (Filed on 7/10/2023)
July 5, 2023 Filing 103 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding High-Level Documents and Exemplars filed by Bright Data Ltd.. (Kass, Colin) (Filed on 7/5/2023)
July 5, 2023 Filing 102 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Post-Termination Discovery filed by Bright Data Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Kass, Colin) (Filed on 7/5/2023)
July 5, 2023 Filing 101 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Discovery of Public Search Mechanics filed by Bright Data Ltd.. (Kass, Colin) (Filed on 7/5/2023)
July 5, 2023 Filing 100 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Discovery of Customer-Specific Information filed by Bright Data Ltd.. (Kass, Colin) (Filed on 7/5/2023)
July 5, 2023 Filing 99 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Scope of Phase 1 Discovery filed by Bright Data Ltd.. (Kass, Colin) (Filed on 7/5/2023)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Order by Judge Edward M Chen granting #97 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Juan Manuel Ruiz Toro. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2023)
June 30, 2023 Filing 97 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18412331.) filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Ruiz Toro, Juan) (Filed on 6/30/2023)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Discovery Order re: #88 #89 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2023)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Order by Judge Edward M Chen granting #94 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Nathaniel W. Reisinger. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2023)
June 29, 2023 Filing 94 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18408395.) filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Reisinger, Nathaniel) (Filed on 6/29/2023)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Order by Judge Edward M Chen granting #92 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Natalie Bilbrough. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2023)
June 28, 2023 Filing 92 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18403851.) filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Bilbrough, Natalie) (Filed on 6/28/2023)
June 27, 2023 Filing 91 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Meta's Interrogatory 7 filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Holtzblatt, Ari) (Filed on 6/27/2023)
June 27, 2023 Filing 90 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Meta's Requests for Production 2 and 16 filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6)(Holtzblatt, Ari) (Filed on 6/27/2023)
June 26, 2023 Filing 89 Letter from Ari Holtzblatt Regarding Discovery Disputes. (Holtzblatt, Ari) (Filed on 6/26/2023)
June 26, 2023 Filing 88 Letter from Colin R. Kass to Judge Alex G. Tse regarding Meta's Joint Discovery Letters . (Kass, Colin) (Filed on 6/26/2023)
June 21, 2023 Filing 87 Letter from Ari Holtzblatt Regarding Discovery Disputes. (Holtzblatt, Ari) (Filed on 6/21/2023)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER re #84 BD's Letter. The Court has already referred all discovery matters to a magistrate judge. This includes BD's letter. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/21/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2023)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR EARLY DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS - AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Although the parties stipulated that their early summary judgment motions would be without prejudice to the filing of a second summary judgment motion, the Court shall require a party that files an early summary judgment motion to seek permission to file a second summary judgment motion. Meta shall file Opposition due by 7/12/2023. Bright Data Reply due by 8/11/2023. Meta Reply in Support of any Cross-Motion due by 9/11/2023. Motion Hearing set for 10/19/2023 at 1:30 PM by Zoom. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/21/2023. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2023) Modified on 6/21/2023 (jlg, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/21/2023 (vla, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/21/2023 (vla, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2023 Filing 84 Letter from Colin Kass regarding Phase 1 Discovery Disputes . (Kass, Colin) (Filed on 6/21/2023)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen striking #81 Plaintiff's Discovery Letter Brief; striking #82 Plaintiff's Discovery Letter Brief. Meta has filed two discovery letters. The letters contain only Meta's position on the discovery disputes. According to Meta, this is because BD has failed to properly engage in the meet-and-confer and discovery dispute process. The Court hereby strikes the letters from the record and orders the parties to submit joint letters on the discovery disputes raised by Meta within three court days. The Court is also referring all discovery disputes, including these, to a magistrate judge. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2023)
June 21, 2023 Filing 82 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Holtzblatt, Ari) (Filed on 6/21/2023)
June 21, 2023 Filing 81 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Holtzblatt, Ari) (Filed on 6/21/2023)
June 21, 2023 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse for Discovery (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2023)
June 20, 2023 Filing 80 Transcript of Proceedings held on 6/8/2023, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cathy J. Taylor, RMR, CRR, CRC, telephone number (602) 322-7249; Cathy_Taylor@azd.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #78 Transcript Order, #77 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 7/11/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/21/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/18/2023. (Related documents(s) #78 , #77 ) (Taylor, Catherine) (Filed on 6/20/2023)
June 15, 2023 Filing 79 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule for Early Dispositive Motions (Joint) filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Holtzblatt, Ari) (Filed on 6/15/2023)
June 13, 2023 Filing 78 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/08/2023 before Judge Edward M Chen by Bright Data Ltd., for Court Reporter Cathy Jill Taylor. (Kass, Colin) (Filed on 6/13/2023)
June 13, 2023 Filing 77 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/08/2023 before Judge Edward M Chen by Meta Platforms, Inc., for Court Reporter Cathy Jill Taylor. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 6/13/2023)
June 12, 2023 Filing 75 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count One filed by Bright Data Ltd.. Responses due by 6/26/2023. Replies due by 7/3/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David A. Munkittrick and Exhibits 1-12, #2 Proposed Order)(Kass, Colin) (Filed on 6/12/2023)
June 8, 2023 Filing 76 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M Chen: Motion Hearing held on 6/8/2023 re #59 MOTION for Jurisdictional Discovery. Court GRANTS #59 Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery. The Court HEREBY temporarily VACATES #51 Motion to Dismiss hearing. Total Time in Court: 26 Minutes. Court Reporter: Cathy Taylor. (vla, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/8/2023)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER re #72 Early Dispositive Motions. The Court largely agrees with Meta's approach. The parties' disputes shall be raised through summary judgment briefing. There shall be a total of four briefs; Bright Data shall file its motion first. The opening brief and the opposition/cross-motion shall each be no longer than 30 pages; the reply and sur-reply shall each be no longer than 20 pages. The parties shall file a stipulation with the briefing schedule. The Court shall thereafter set the hearing date. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/8/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2023)
June 2, 2023 Filing 73 Statement - Bright Data's Statement of Recent Decision by Bright Data Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Opinion)(Kass, Colin) (Filed on 6/2/2023)
May 31, 2023 Filing 72 Statement (Disputed Joint) Regarding Form, Timing, and Length of Early Dispositive Motions by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Meta's Proposal as Set Forth in the Parties' Joint Statement Regarding Form, Timing, and Length of Early Dispositive Motions, #2 Proposed Order Granting Bright Data's Proposal Regarding Dispositive Motion Practice)(Holtzblatt, Ari) (Filed on 5/31/2023)
May 31, 2023 Filing 71 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motion Hearing as to #59 MOTION for Jurisdictional Discovery set for 6/8/2023, at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. ALL COUNSEL PARTICIPATING IN THE HEARING ARE REQUIRED TO LOG INTO ZOOM NO LATER THAN 1:20 PM.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2023)
May 31, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #51 MOTION to Dismiss - Bright Data's Motion to Dismiss Meta's Tortious Interference Claim. Motion Hearing set for 6/22/2023 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M Chen. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2023)
May 11, 2023 Filing 69 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/09/2023, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #67 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 6/1/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/12/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2023. (Related documents(s) #67 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 5/11/2023)
May 11, 2023 Filing 68 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/09/2023 before Judge Edward M Chen by Bright Data Ltd., for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Kass, Colin) (Filed on 5/11/2023)
May 10, 2023 Filing 67 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/09/2023 before Judge Edward M Chen by Meta Platforms, Inc., for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 5/10/2023)
May 9, 2023 Filing 66 REPLY (re #59 MOTION for Jurisdictional Discovery ) filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 5/9/2023)
May 8, 2023 Filing 65 CLERK'S NOTICE CHANGING TIME OF INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference reset from 5/9/2023, at 1:30 PM to 5/9/2023, at 2:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. ALL COUNSEL PARTICIPATING IN THE HEARING ARE REQUIRED TO LOG IN TO ZOOM NO LATER THAN 2:20 PM.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2023)
May 2, 2023 Filing 64 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 5/2/2023)
May 2, 2023 Filing 63 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #59 MOTION for Jurisdictional Discovery ) filed byBright Data Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Kass, Colin) (Filed on 5/2/2023)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Order by Judge Edward M Chen GRANTING AS MODIFIED #55 STIPULATION REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR META'S MOTION FOR JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY. Meta's Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery due by 4/18/2023. Bright Data's Opposition due by 5/2/2023. Meta's Reply due by 5/9/2023. Motion Hearing Set for 6/8/2023, at 1:30 PM via Zoom.(vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2023) Modified on 4/27/2023 (vla, COURT STAFF).
April 18, 2023 Filing 61 Declaration of Ari Holtzblatt in Support of #59 MOTION for Jurisdictional Discovery filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. (Related document(s) #59 ) (Holtzblatt, Ari) (Filed on 4/18/2023)
April 18, 2023 Filing 60 Declaration of Andrew Herter in Support of #59 MOTION for Jurisdictional Discovery filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. (Related document(s) #59 ) (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 4/18/2023)
April 18, 2023 Filing 59 MOTION for Jurisdictional Discovery and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Responses due by 5/2/2023. Replies due by 5/9/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 4/18/2023) Modified on 4/20/2023 (gba, COURT STAFF).
April 18, 2023 Filing 58 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Holtzblatt, Ari) (Filed on 4/18/2023)
April 18, 2023 Filing 57 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options on behalf of Bright Data Ltd. (Kass, Colin) (Filed on 4/18/2023)
April 18, 2023 Filing 56 Declaration of Ryanne Perio in Support of #55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule for Meta's Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. (Related document(s) #55 ) (Perio, Ryanne) (Filed on 4/18/2023)
April 18, 2023 Filing 55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule for Meta's Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 4/18/2023) M
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Order by Judge Edward M Chen GRANTING #52 STIPULATION REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANT BRIGHT DATA LTD.'S RULE 12(B) MOTION.(vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2023)
April 7, 2023 Filing 53 Declaration of Ari Holtzblatt in Support of Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendant Bright Data LTD.'s Rule 12(B) Motion filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. (Holtzblatt, Ari) (Filed on 4/7/2023)
April 7, 2023 Filing 52 JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendant Bright Data LTD.'s Rule 12(B) Motion filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Holtzblatt, Ari) (Filed on 4/7/2023) Modified on 4/7/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
March 23, 2023 Filing 51 MOTION to Dismiss - Bright Data's Motion to Dismiss Meta's Tortious Interference Claim filed by Bright Data Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 6/22/2023 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M Chen. Responses due by 4/6/2023. Replies due by 4/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David A. Munkittrick, #2 Proposed Order)(Kass, Colin) (Filed on 3/23/2023)
March 23, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #51 MOTION to Dismiss - Bright Data's Motion to Dismiss Meta's Tortious Interference Claim. Responses due by 4/24/2023. Replies due by 5/15/2023. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2023)
March 10, 2023 Filing 50 RESPONSE re #49 Supplemental Brief, by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 3/10/2023)
March 8, 2023 Filing 49 Supplemental Brief Bright Data's Supplemental Brief Regarding Its Motion to Phase Initial Motion Practice re #35 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Complaint - filed by Bright Data Ltd.. (Related document(s) #35 ) (Kass, Colin) (Filed on 3/8/2023)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Re Supplemental Briefing. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/6/2023. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2023)
February 21, 2023 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Meta Platforms, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 2/21/2023)
February 20, 2023 Filing 46 REPLY (re #35 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Complaint ) - Bright Data's Reply to Its Motion to Phase Initial Motion Practice filed byBright Data Ltd.. (Kass, Colin) (Filed on 2/20/2023)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Order by Judge Edward M Chen GRANTING #43 STIPULATION REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANT BRIGHT DATA LTD.'S RULE 12(B)MOTION.(vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2023)
February 17, 2023 Filing 44 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #35 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Complaint ) filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ari Holtzblatt in Support, #2 Exhibit A)(Holtzblatt, Ari) (Filed on 2/17/2023)
February 17, 2023 Filing 43 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendant Bright Data Ltd.'s Rule 12(b) Motion filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Holtzblatt, Ari) (Filed on 2/17/2023)
February 15, 2023 Filing 42 CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff is ordered to respond to Defendant's Motion to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint (Docket No. 35) by the end of day on February 17, 2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2023)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Order by Judge Edward M Chen GRANTING #39 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document.(vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2023)
February 14, 2023 Filing 40 EXHIBITS re #35 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Complaint - Correction of Docket #35-3, Redacted filed by Bright Data Ltd.. (Related document(s) #35 ) (Ladak, Sehreen) (Filed on 2/14/2023)
February 14, 2023 Filing 39 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document and Proposed order filed by Bright Data Ltd.. (Ladak, Sehreen) (Filed on 2/14/2023)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order by Judge Edward M Chen GRANTING #33 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to David Munkittrick.(vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2023)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Order by Judge Edward M Chen granting #32 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Colin Kass.(vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2023)
February 13, 2023 Filing 36 CLERK'S NOTICE - REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE. You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Edward M. Chen upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chen's Standing Orders and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Joint Initial Case Management Statement due by 5/2/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/9/2023 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. ALL COUNSEL PARTICIPATING IN THE HEARING ARE REQUIRED TO LOG IN TO ZOOM NO LATER THAN 1:20 PM.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2023)
February 13, 2023 Filing 35 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Complaint filed by Bright Data Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David A. Munkittrick, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Proposed Order)(Ladak, Sehreen) (Filed on 2/13/2023) (Attachment 3 replaced on 2/16/2023) (wsn, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order by Judge Edward M Chen GRANTING #26 BRIGHT DATA LTD'S MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENT.(vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2023)
February 13, 2023 Filing 33 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17983698.) filed by Bright Data Ltd.. (Munkittrick, David) (Filed on 2/13/2023)
February 13, 2023 Filing 32 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17983639.) filed by Bright Data Ltd.. (Kass, Colin) (Filed on 2/13/2023)
February 13, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Sehreen Ladak (Ladak, Sehreen) (Filed on 2/13/2023)
February 10, 2023 Filing 30 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion re Dkt No. #16 (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 2/10/2023)
February 7, 2023 Filing 29 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bright Data Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent IPPN Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate EMK Capital Partners LP, Other Affiliate EMK Capital Partner GP Coinvestment LP, Other Affiliate IPPN Holdco 2 Limited, Other Affiliate IPPN Holdings Ltd. (Jersey), Other Affiliate IPPN Group Ltd., Other Affiliate Ofer Vilenski for Bright Data Ltd.. re #22 Certificate of Interested Entities CORRECTION OF DOCKET #22 (Kramer Sujeeth, Lauren) (Filed on 2/7/2023)
February 7, 2023 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents . Re: #22 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Bright Data Ltd. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2023)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 2/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2023)
February 6, 2023 Filing 27 EXHIBITS re #24 Opposition/Response to Motion, Correction of Docket #24-3 filed by Bright Data Ltd.. (Related document(s) #24 ) (Kramer, Lauren) (Filed on 2/6/2023)
February 6, 2023 Filing 26 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by Bright Data Ltd.. (Kramer, Lauren) (Filed on 2/6/2023)
February 3, 2023 Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2023)
February 3, 2023 Filing 24 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #16 Ex Parte MOTION to Serve Defendant Bright Data Ltd. under FED. R. CIV. P. 4(f)(2)(C)(ii) and (f)(3) ) filed by Bright Data Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Munkittrick, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Proposed Order) (Kramer, Lauren) (Filed on 2/3/2023)
February 3, 2023 Filing 23 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bright Data Ltd... (Kramer, Lauren) (Filed on 2/3/2023)
February 3, 2023 Filing 22 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bright Data Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent IPPN Holdings Ltd. for Bright Data Ltd.. (Kramer, Lauren) (Filed on 2/3/2023)
February 3, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Beth Kramer Sujeeth, Robert Goodman and Sehreen Ladak - Special Appearance Only (Kramer, Lauren) (Filed on 2/3/2023)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse denying #17 Motion to Shorten Time. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2023)
January 25, 2023 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Holtzblatt, Ari) (Filed on 1/25/2023)
January 23, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ari Holtzblatt (Holtzblatt, Ari) (Filed on 1/23/2023)
January 20, 2023 Filing 17 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time to Consider its Ex Parte Motion to Serve Defendant Bright Data Ltd. filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ari Holtzblatt in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 1/20/2023) Modified on 1/23/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2023 Filing 16 Ex Parte MOTION to Serve Defendant Bright Data Ltd. under FED. R. CIV. P. 4(f)(2)(C)(ii) and (f)(3) filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Responses due by 2/3/2023. Replies due by 2/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ari Holtzblatt in Support,#2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2,#4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Affidavit of Mr. Nathan Rothstein in Support, #12 Exhibit 1, #13 Proposed Order) (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 1/20/2023) Modified on 1/23/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2023 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 1/20/2023)
January 18, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie M. Teuber (Teuber, Stephanie) (Filed on 1/18/2023)
January 12, 2023 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Bright Data Ltd. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2023)
January 12, 2023 Filing 12 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/31/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/7/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2023)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting #8 Application. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2023)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting #6 Application. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2023)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting #5 Application. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2023)
January 9, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17880653.) filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Perio, Ryanne) (Filed on 1/9/2023)
January 6, 2023 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/20/2023. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2023)
January 6, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17878752.) filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Burrell, Robin) (Filed on 1/6/2023)
January 6, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17878733.) filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Holtzblatt, Ari) (Filed on 1/6/2023)
January 6, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Bingxue Que (Que, Bingxue) (Filed on 1/6/2023)
January 6, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Meta Platforms, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent No Corporate Parent and No Publicly Held Corporation Owns 10% or More of Its Stock for Meta Platforms, Inc.. (and Certification of Interested Entities) (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 1/6/2023)
January 6, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 1/6/2023)
January 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bright Data Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17878249.). Filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 1/6/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meta Platforms, Inc. v. Bright Data Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meta Platforms, Inc.
Represented By: Ari Holtzblatt
Represented By: Bingxue Que
Represented By: Robin C. Burrell
Represented By: Sonal N. Mehta
Represented By: Ryanne E. Perio
Represented By: Stephanie M. Teuber
Represented By: Juan M. Ruiz Toro
Represented By: Natalie Bilbrough
Represented By: Nathaniel W. Reisinger
Represented By: Ryan Daily
Represented By: Ryan A. Daily
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bright Data Ltd.
Represented By: Lauren Beth Kramer Sujeeth
Represented By: Robert C. Goodman
Represented By: Sehreen Ladak
Represented By: Colin Kass
Represented By: David Alexander Munkittrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?