Fukaya v. Daiso California LLC et al
Plaintiff: Makiko Fukaya
Defendant: Daiso California LLC and Daiso Holding USA Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00099
Filed: January 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #11 Stipulation extend time for defendant to respond to complaint. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2023)
March 1, 2023 Filing 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Daiso California LLC, Daiso Holding USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Flynn, Sean) (Filed on 3/1/2023)
February 14, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean P. Flynn for Defendants (Flynn, Sean) (Filed on 2/14/2023)
January 26, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED filed by Makiko Fukaya. Daiso California LLC served on January 25, 2023, answer due 2/15/23. (Jabagchourian, Ara) (Filed on 1/26/2023) Modified on 1/26/2023 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
January 26, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED filed by Makiko Fukaya. Daiso Holding USA Inc. served on January 25, 2023, answer due 2/15/23. (Jabagchourian, Ara) (Filed on 1/26/2023) Modified on 1/26/2023 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
January 26, 2023 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. The correct event is SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re : #8 Affidavit of Service filed by Makiko Fukaya, #9 Affidavit of Service filed by Makiko Fukaya. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2023)
January 12, 2023 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Makiko Fukaya.. (Jabagchourian, Ara) (Filed on 1/12/2023)
January 11, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Daiso California LLC, Daiso Holding USA Inc. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2023)
January 11, 2023 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/6/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/13/2023 10:00 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2023)
January 11, 2023 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/25/2023. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2023)
January 11, 2023 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Jabagchourian, Ara) (Filed on 1/11/2023)
January 11, 2023 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Makiko Fukaya . (Jabagchourian, Ara) (Filed on 1/11/2023)
January 11, 2023 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #1 Summons, filed by Makiko FukayaFile summons using event Proposed Summons. Submit one summons listing all defendants, not multiple summons. Attach an additional sheet to summons if needed. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2023)
January 10, 2023 #Electronic filing error. Use Current Civil Cover Sheet. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover SheetThis filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Makiko Fukaya (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2023)
January 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17882507.). Filed byMakiko Fukaya. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Daiso California LLC, #3 Summons Daiso Holding USA Inc.)(Jabagchourian, Ara) (Filed on 1/9/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fukaya v. Daiso California LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Makiko Fukaya
Represented By: Ara R. Jabagchourian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daiso California LLC
Represented By: Sean P. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daiso Holding USA Inc.
Represented By: Sean P. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?