Andersen et al v. Stability AI Ltd. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Sarah Andersen, Kelly McKernan and Karla Ortiz
Defendant: Stability AI Ltd., Stability AI, Inc., Midjourney, Inc. and DeviantArt, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00201
Filed: January 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 504 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 172 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 168 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Amira Perryman. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2024)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 171 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 167 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Vishakha S. Joshi. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2024)
February 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 170 Request for Judicial Notice re 169 MOTION to Dismiss Correcting Bar Number of A. Dunning (212047) in ECF 160 and ECF 161 filed byMidjourney, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Angela L. Dunning in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 169 ) (Dunning, Angela) (Filed on 2/9/2024)
February 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MOTION to Dismiss Correcting Bar Number of A. Dunning (212047) in ECF 160 filed by Midjourney, Inc. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 5/8/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Responses due by 3/21/2024. Replies due by 4/18/2024. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Dunning, Angela) (Filed on 2/9/2024) Modified on 2/12/2024 (sfb, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19110449.) filed by Midjourney, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Perryman, Amira) (Filed on 2/9/2024)
February 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19110396.) filed by Midjourney, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Joshi, Vishakha) (Filed on 2/9/2024)
February 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE AND REQUESTS FOR FEES by Judge William H. Orrick re: 50 Motion to Strike and 136 MOTION to Strike. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2024)
February 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 165 Request for Judicial Notice re 164 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint filed byRunway AI, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 164 ) (Malhotra, Paven) (Filed on 2/8/2024)
February 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint filed by Runway AI, Inc.. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 5/8/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Responses due by 3/21/2024. Replies due by 4/18/2024. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Julia L. Greenberg, # 2 Exhibits A-G, # 3 Proposed Order)(Malhotra, Paven) (Filed on 2/8/2024)
February 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MOTION to Dismiss 129 First Amended Complaint filed by DeviantArt, Inc.. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 5/8/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Responses due by 3/21/2024. Replies due by 4/18/2024. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gass, Andrew) (Filed on 2/8/2024)
February 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Stability AI Ltd., Stability AI, Inc.. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 5/8/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Responses due by 3/21/2024. Replies due by 4/18/2024. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Stability LTD. and Stability AI, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint)(Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 2/8/2024)
February 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 161 Request for Judicial Notice re 160 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed byMidjourney, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Angela L. Dunning in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 160 ) (Dunning, Angela) (Filed on 2/8/2024)
February 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 160 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Midjourney, Inc.. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 5/8/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Responses due by 3/21/2024. Replies due by 4/18/2024. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Dunning, Angela) (Filed on 2/8/2024)
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 159 CLERK'S NOTICE - Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-1(b) it has been determined that the 136 Motion to Strike is appropriate for disposition without oral argument. As such, the hearing set for 2/7/2024 is VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2024)
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 158 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Jordan McMahon (McMahon, Kathleen) (Filed on 1/26/2024)
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 157 NOTICE of Appearance by David William Lerch (Lerch, David) (Filed on 1/26/2024)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 156 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byDeviantArt, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gass, Andrew) (Filed on 1/22/2024)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 155 NOTICE of Appearance by Celina Malave (Malave, Celina) (Filed on 1/18/2024)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 154 REPLY (re 136 MOTION to Strike (Defendant DeviantArt, Inc.'s Motion to Renew its Special Motion to Strike Under California Code of Civil Procedure § 425.16) ) filed byDeviantArt, Inc.. (Gass, Andrew) (Filed on 1/17/2024)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 152 Stipulation. Hearing on any Motion to Dsimiss set for 5/8/2024 02:00 PM via Videoconference before Judge William H. Orrick. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2024)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 152 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CHANGING TIME (CIV. L.R. 6-2) filed by Runway AI, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Bailey W. Heaps ISO Stipulated Request for Order Changing Time)(Heaps, Bailey) (Filed on 1/11/2024)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Runway AI, Inc. (Heaps, Bailey) (Filed on 1/10/2024)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Certificate of Interested Entities by Runway AI, Inc. (Heaps, Bailey) (Filed on 1/10/2024)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 149 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 136 MOTION to Strike (Defendant DeviantArt, Inc.'s Motion to Renew its Special Motion to Strike Under California Code of Civil Procedure § 425.16) ) filed bySarah Andersen, Gerald Brom, Adam Ellis, Julia Kaye, Gregory Manchess, Kelly McKernan, Karla Ortiz, Grzegorz Rutkowski, H Southworth, Jingna Zhang. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/10/2024)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 148 NOTICE of Appearance by Paven Malhotra for Defendant Runway AI, Inc. (Malhotra, Paven) (Filed on 1/10/2024)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 147 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Leigh Greenberg for Defendant Runway AI, Inc. (Greenberg, Julia) (Filed on 1/10/2024)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 146 NOTICE of Appearance by Bailey Wilson Heaps for Defendant Runway AI, Inc. (Heaps, Bailey) (Filed on 1/10/2024)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 145 NOTICE of Appearance by David Jason Silbert for Defendant Runway AI, Inc. (Silbert, David) (Filed on 1/10/2024)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 144 NOTICE of Appearance by Aditya Vijay Kamdar (Kamdar, Aditya) (Filed on 1/8/2024)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 143 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany Cheung (Cheung, Tiffany) (Filed on 1/8/2024)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 142 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Chen Saulsbury (Saulsbury, Timothy) (Filed on 1/8/2024)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 141 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Charles Gratz (Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 1/8/2024)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 140 NOTICE of Appearance by Allyson Roz Bennett (Bennett, Allyson) (Filed on 1/8/2024)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 139 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julia Kaye, Gerald Brom, Adam Ellis, Grzegorz Rutkowski, Kelly McKernan, Sarah Andersen, Gregory Manchess, Karla Ortiz, Jingna Zhang, H Southworth. Runway AI, Inc. served on 1/4/2024, answer due 1/25/2024. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/5/2024)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER CHANGING TIME FOR DEVIANTART'S 136 MOTION TO RENEW ITS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE granting 137 STIPULATION. Response due by 1/10/2024. Reply due by 1/17/2024. Motion Hearing reset for 2/7/2024 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 1/2/2024. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2024)
December 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 137 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 136 MOTION to Strike (Defendant DeviantArt, Inc.'s Motion to Renew its Special Motion to Strike Under California Code of Civil Procedure § 425.16) CHANGING TIME TO RENEW filed by Sarah Andersen, Gerald Brom, Adam Ellis, Julia Kaye, Gregory Manchess, Kelly McKernan, Karla Ortiz, Grzegorz Rutkowski, H Southworth, Jingna Zhang. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Christopher K.L. Young)(Young, Christopher) (Filed on 12/26/2023)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MOTION to Strike (Defendant DeviantArt, Inc.'s Motion to Renew its Special Motion to Strike Under California Code of Civil Procedure § 425.16) filed by DeviantArt, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 1/3/2024. Replies due by 1/10/2024. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gass, Andrew) (Filed on 12/20/2023)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Summons Issued as to Runway AI, Inc. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2023)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Proposed Summons. (Young, Christopher) (Filed on 12/11/2023)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Electronic filing error. *Incorrect event used. [err101]The summons should be uploaded separately and not as part of, or as an attachment to, the complaint or other initiating documents*This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety as Proposed Summons. Re:[129-15] Summons filed by Karla Ortiz, Gerald Brom, Kelly McKernan, Sarah Andersen, Julia Kaye, H Southworth, Adam Ellis, Jingna Zhang, Grzegorz Rutkowski, Gregory Manchess (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2023)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 133 NOTICE of Appearance by Holden J. Benon (Benon, Holden) (Filed on 12/8/2023)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 132 NOTICE of Change of Address by Angela Dunning (Dunning, Angela) (Filed on 12/5/2023)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER GRANTING 130 COOLEY LLP'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT MIDJOURNEY, INC. by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2023)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Cooley LLP's Withdraw as Counsel filed by Midjourney, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/10/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 12/14/2023. Replies due by 12/21/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lauter, Judd) (Filed on 11/30/2023)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 129 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST against DeviantArt, Inc., Midjourney, Inc., Stability AI Ltd., Stability AI, Inc., Runway AI, Inc.. Filed by Karla Ortiz, Kelly McKernan, Sarah Andersen, Gregory Manchess, Adam Ellis, Gerald Brom, Grzegorz Rutkowski, Julia Kaye, H Southworth, Jingna Zhang. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Summons Runway AI, Inc.)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 11/29/2023)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/7/23, before Judge Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jennifer Coulthard, telephone number (530)537-9312. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 122 Transcript Order, 123 Transcript Order, 126 Transcript Order, 124 Transcript Order, 127 Transcript Order, 125 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 12/6/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/18/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/13/2024. (Related documents(s) 122 , 123 , 126 , 124 , 127 , 125 ) (Coulthard, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/15/2023)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 127 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/07/2023 before Judge William H. Orrick by Getty Images (US), Inc., for Court Reporter Jennifer Coulthard. (Marks, Benjamin) (Filed on 11/14/2023)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 126 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on November 7, 2023 before Judge William H. Orrick by Stability AI Ltd., Stability AI, Inc., for Court Reporter Jennifer Coulthard. (Schoenhard, Paul) (Filed on 11/14/2023)
November 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 125 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/7/2023 before Judge William H. Orrick by Sarah Andersen, Kelly McKernan, Karla Ortiz, for Court Reporter Jennifer Coulthard. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 11/10/2023)
November 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 124 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/7/2023 before Judge William H. Orrick by Midjourney, Inc., for Court Reporter Jennifer Coulthard. (Bepko, Arminda) (Filed on 11/10/2023)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 123 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/7/2023 before Judge William H. Orrick for Court Reporter Jennifer Coulthard (Coulthard, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/9/2023)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 122 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/7/2023 before Judge William H. Orrick by DeviantArt, Inc., for Court Reporter Jennifer Coulthard. (Gass, Andrew) (Filed on 11/9/2023)
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference held on 11/7/2023. Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2024 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Total Time in Court: 11 minutes. Court Reporter: Jennifer Coulthard. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/7/2023)
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 120 CLERKS NOTICE RE ZOOM HEARING. The Case Management Conference set for 11/7/2023 at 2:00 p.m. will be held via Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2023)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 119 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Sarah Andersen, Kelly McKernan, Karla Ortiz, Stability AI, Inc. and Stability AI Ltd., DeviantArt, Inc., and Midjourney, Inc.(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 10/31/2023) Modified on 11/1/2023 (bar, COURT STAFF).
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 116 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Arminda B. Bepko. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2023)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER ON 49 , 51 , 52 , 58 MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND STRIKE by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2023)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18785817.) filed by Midjourney, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Bepko, Arminda) (Filed on 10/30/2023)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 115 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY RELEVANT TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Sarah Andersen, Kelly McKernan, Karla Ortiz (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Young, Christopher) (Filed on 10/16/2023) Modified on 10/17/2023 (bar, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 114 CLERK'S NOTICE continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 10/31/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/7/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) - Videoconference Only. (wholc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2023)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 113 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Sarah Andersen, Kelly McKernan, Karla Ortiz, Stability AI, Inc., DeviantArt, Inc., Stability AI Ltd., and Midjourney, Inc.. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 10/3/2023) Modified on 10/4/2023 (bar, COURT STAFF).
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 112 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY RELEVANT TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Sarah Andersen, Kelly McKernan, Karla Ortiz (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Manfredi, Travis) (Filed on 9/27/2023) Modified on 9/27/2023 (bar, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 111 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING ZOOM HEARING - Case Management Conference reset for 10/10/2023 02:00 via Videoconference (Case Management Statement due by 10/3/2023). This proceeding will be held via Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2023)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 110 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Sarah Andersen, Kelly McKernan, Karla Ortiz, DeviantArt, Inc., Midjourney, Inc., Stability AI Ltd., Stability AI, Inc. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 9/12/2023) Modified on 9/13/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Adam Chen (Schoenhard, Paul) (Filed on 9/12/2023)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 108 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 7/19/2023, before Judge William H. Orrick, for Court Reporter Jennifer Coulthard, ordered by Ian Bensberg. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2023)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 107 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 7/19/23 before Judge William H. Orrick for Court Reporter Jennifer Coulthard filed by Matthew Grillo, Pillsbury Winthrop. (notewarel, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2023)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Gass, Andrew) (Filed on 8/29/2023)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 105 NOTICE by Stability AI Ltd., Stability AI, Inc. re: Joint Case Management Statement (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Paul M. Schoenhard In Support of Notice, # 2 Ex. A)(Schoenhard, Paul) (Filed on 8/23/2023)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 104 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 8/22/2023)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ERRATA re 100 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of ADR options by Karla Ortiz. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 8/17/2023)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ERRATA re 99 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of ADR options by Kelly McKernan. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 8/17/2023)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ERRATA re 98 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of ADR options by Sarah Andersen. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 8/17/2023)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Karla Ortiz (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 8/16/2023)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Kelly McKernan (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 8/16/2023)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Sarah Andersen (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 8/16/2023)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7/19/23, before Judge Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jennifer Coulthard, telephone number 5305379312. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 9/5/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/15/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2023. (Coulthard, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/15/2023)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 96 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 7/19/2023 before Judge William H. Orrick by Getty Images (US), Inc., for Court Reporter Jennifer Coulthard. (Marks, Benjamin) (Filed on 8/9/2023)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting in part and denying in part 92 Administrative Motion continue Case Management Conference and continue attendant Rule 26 deadlines. Initial Case Management Conference is continued to 9/19/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 9/12/2023. Attendant rule 26 deadlines are continued for defendants Midjourney and DeviantArt. Plaintiffs and Stability AI shall proceed with their Rule 26 obligations. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wholc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2023)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Response re 92 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference on Behalf of All defendants bySarah Andersen, Kelly McKernan, Karla Ortiz. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 8/7/2023)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 93 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 7/19/2023 before Judge William H. Orrick for Court Reporter Jennifer Coulthard. (bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2023)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference on Behalf of All defendants filed by DeviantArt, Inc.. Responses due by 8/7/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brittany Lovejoy in Support of Admin Motion, # 2 Exhibit A to Lovejoy Declaration, # 3 Proposed Order)(Lovejoy, Brittany) (Filed on 8/3/2023)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 91 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 7/19/2023, before Judge William H. Orrick, for Court Reporter Jennifer Coulthard, ordered by Robert Fernandez. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2023)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 90 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 7/19/2023, before Judge William H. Orrick, for Court Reporter Jennifer Coulthard, ordered by Jacob Tracer. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2023)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 89 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 7/19/2023, before Judge William H. Orrick, for Court Reporter Jennifer Coulthard, ordered by Cari Laufenberg. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2023)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 88 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on July 19, 2023 before Judge William H. Orrick by Midjourney, Inc., for Court Reporter not listed - San Francisco. (Dunning, Angela) (Filed on 7/20/2023)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 87 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on July 19, 2023 before Judge William H. Orrick by Stability AI Ltd., Stability AI, Inc., for Court Reporter not listed - San Francisco. (Schoenhard, Paul) (Filed on 7/20/2023)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 86 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 7/19/2023 before Judge William H. Orrick by DeviantArt, Inc., for Court Reporter not listed - San Francisco. (Gass, Andrew) (Filed on 7/20/2023)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 85 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 7/19/2023 before Judge William H. Orrick by Sarah Andersen, Kelly McKernan, Karla Ortiz, for Court Reporter not listed - San Francisco. (Young, Christopher) (Filed on 7/20/2023)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Hearing on motions to dismiss held on 7/19/2023. Total Time in Court: 53 minutes. Court Reporter: Jennifer Coulthard. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/19/2023)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 83 CLERK'S NOTICE - Pursuant to 81 Joint Motion, counsel planning to address the Court shall appear in person (with the exception of any person experiencing COVID-19 symptoms or recently exposed to COVID-19) on 07/19/2023 at 2:00 p.m.Webinar Access: All observing counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2023) .
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany Nichole Lovejoy (Corrected) (Lovejoy, Brittany) (Filed on 7/7/2023)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Joint MOTION for Leave to Appear in Person filed by Stability AI Ltd., Stability AI, Inc., Sarah Andersen, DeviantArt, Inc., Kelly McKernan, Midjourney, Inc., Karla Ortiz. (Schoenhard, Paul) (Filed on 7/7/2023) Modified on 7/10/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Electronic filing error. The email address listed on the Pleading is inconsistent with the email address shown in ECF. Please clarify. Re: 75 Notice of Appearance filed by DeviantArt, Inc. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2023)
July 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Joinder re 78 Reply to Opposition/Response in Support of DeviantArt, Inc.s Special Motion to Strike Under California Code of Civil Procedure § 425.16 by Stability AI Ltd., Stability AI, Inc.. (Schoenhard, Paul) (Filed on 7/3/2023)
July 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Joinder re 78 Reply to Opposition/Response in Support of DeviantArt, Inc.'s Special Motion to Strike Under California Code of Civil Procedure § 425.16 by Midjourney, Inc.. (Dunning, Angela) (Filed on 7/3/2023)
July 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 78 REPLY (re 50 MOTION to Strike Under California Code of Civil Procedure § 425.16 ) filed byDeviantArt, Inc.. (Gass, Andrew) (Filed on 7/3/2023)
July 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 REPLY (re 49 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byDeviantArt, Inc.. (Gass, Andrew) (Filed on 7/3/2023)
July 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Request for Judicial Notice re 74 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byMidjourney, Inc.. (Related document(s) 74 ) (Dunning, Angela) (Filed on 7/3/2023)
July 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany Nichole Lovejoy (Lovejoy, Brittany) (Filed on 7/3/2023)
July 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 REPLY (re 52 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byMidjourney, Inc.. (Dunning, Angela) (Filed on 7/3/2023)
July 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 REPLY (re 58 Amended MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byStability AI Ltd., Stability AI, Inc.. (Schoenhard, Paul) (Filed on 7/3/2023)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 71 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Arielle S. Wagner. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2023)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18334600.) filed by Sarah Andersen, Kelly McKernan, Karla Ortiz. (Wagner, Arielle) (Filed on 6/6/2023)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis Andrew Kessler (Kessler, Louis) (Filed on 6/6/2023)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Electronic filing error. Counsel must file their own notice of appearance instead of updating their personal profile in ECF. Re: 64 Notice of Appearance filed by Karla Ortiz, Kelly McKernan, Sarah Andersen (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2023)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order ***Filed in Error*** Electronic filing error. REMINDER: Counsel must update personal profile in ECF for change of contact information to be in effect. Re: 64 Notice of Appearance filed by Karla Ortiz, Kelly McKernan, Sarah Andersen (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2023) Modified on 6/6/2023 (jrs, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 50 MOTION to Strike Under California Code of Civil Procedure § 425.16 ) DeviantArt, Inc. filed by Sarah Andersen, Kelly McKernan, Karla Ortiz. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 6/2/2023) Modified on 6/5/2023 (jrs, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 RESPONSE re 53 Request for Judicial Notice, Midjourney, Inc. by Sarah Andersen, Kelly McKernan, Karla Ortiz. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Joseph R. Saveri, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 6/2/2023)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 52 MOTION to Dismiss ) Midjourney, Inc. filed by Sarah Andersen, Kelly McKernan, Karla Ortiz. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 6/2/2023) Modified on 6/5/2023 (jrs, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 58 Amended MOTION to Dismiss ) Stability AI Ltd., Stability AI, Inc. filed by Sarah Andersen, Kelly McKernan, Karla Ortiz. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 6/2/2023) Modified on 6/5/2023 (jrs, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 49 MOTION to Dismiss ) DeviantArt, Inc. filed by Sarah Andersen, Kelly McKernan, Karla Ortiz. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 6/2/2023) Modified on 6/5/2023 (jrs, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Saveri [NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF LOUIS A. KESSLER] (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 6/2/2023)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER REGARDING REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY STAY re 62 Brief and 60 Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Continue Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/26/2023. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2023)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Brief re 61 Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing, PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 60 filed by Sarah Andersen, Kelly McKernan, Karla Ortiz. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Joseph R. Saveri, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 61 ) (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 4/24/2023) Modified on 4/25/2023 (jrs, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING ZOOM HEARING - Case Management Conference reset for 8/29/2023 02:00 PM (Case Management Statement due by 8/22/2023). This proceeding will be held via Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2023)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference re 31 Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing filed by Midjourney, Inc., DevianArt, Inc., Stability AI Ltd. and Stability AI, Inc. Responses due by 4/24/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Angela Dunning, # 2 Proposed Order)(Dunning, Angela) (Filed on 4/18/2023) Modified on 4/19/2023 (jrs, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/19/2023 (jrs, COURT STAFF).
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Joinder re 50 MOTION to Strike Under California Code of Civil Procedure § 425.16 by Stability AI Ltd., Stability AI, Inc.. (Schoenhard, Paul) (Filed on 4/18/2023)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Amended MOTION to Dismiss filed by Stability AI Ltd., Stability AI, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 5/2/2023. Replies due by 5/9/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Paul M. Schoenhard, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Proposed Order)(Schoenhard, Paul) (Filed on 4/18/2023)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Certificate of Interested Entities by Stability AI Ltd. (Schoenhard, Paul) (Filed on 4/18/2023)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Certificate of Interested Entities by Stability AI, Inc. (Schoenhard, Paul) (Filed on 4/18/2023)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stability AI Ltd. (Schoenhard, Paul) (Filed on 4/18/2023)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Joinder re 50 MOTION to Strike Under California Code of Civil Procedure § 425.16 by Midjourney, Inc.. (Dunning, Angela) (Filed on 4/18/2023)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Request for Judicial Notice re 52 MOTION to Dismiss and Consideration of Documents Incorporated by Reference in Support of filed byMidjourney, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 52 ) (Dunning, Angela) (Filed on 4/18/2023)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Midjourney, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 6/2/2023. Replies due by 7/3/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Judd Lauter, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration, # 6 Proposed Order)(Dunning, Angela) (Filed on 4/18/2023)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Stability AI Ltd., Stability AI, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 5/2/2023. Replies due by 5/9/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Paul M. Schoenhard, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Proposed Order)(Schoenhard, Paul) (Filed on 4/18/2023)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION to Strike Under California Code of Civil Procedure § 425.16 filed by DeviantArt, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 5/2/2023. Replies due by 5/9/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gass, Andrew) (Filed on 4/18/2023)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DeviantArt, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 5/2/2023. Replies due by 5/9/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gass, Andrew) (Filed on 4/18/2023)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Certificate of Interested Entities by Midjourney, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate David Holz for Midjourney, Inc.. (Lauter, Judd) (Filed on 2/23/2023)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Midjourney, Inc. (Lauter, Judd) (Filed on 2/16/2023)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Paul M. Schoenbard. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2023)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Laura M. Matson. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2023)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Michael C. Keats. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2023)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Nicole M. Jantzi. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2023)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Amir R. Ghavi. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2023)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 38 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Kayla Blaker. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2023)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER REGARDING DEVIANTART, INC.'S DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND RELATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge William H. Orrick granting 39 Stipulation. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2023)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding DeviantArt Inc.'s Deadline to Respond to Complaint and Related Briefing Schedule filed by Sarah Andersen, Kelly McKernan, Karla Ortiz, DeviantArt, Inc. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/8/2023) Modified on 2/8/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17970376.) filed by Midjourney, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Blaker, Kayla) (Filed on 2/8/2023)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stability AI, Inc. (Lemley, Mark) (Filed on 2/8/2023)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Amended Notice of Appearance by Mark Alan Lemley. (Lemley, Mark) (Filed on 2/8/2023) Modified on 2/8/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DeviantArt, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Wix.com, Inc. for DeviantArt, Inc.. (Gass, Andrew) (Filed on 2/6/2023)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Certificate of Interested Entities by DeviantArt, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Wix.com, Inc., Corporate Parent Wix.com, Ltd. for DeviantArt, Inc.. (Gass, Andrew) (Filed on 2/6/2023)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Michael Gass (Gass, Andrew) (Filed on 2/6/2023)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael H. Rubin (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 2/6/2023)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING - Case Management Conference set for 5/2/2023 02:00 PM. This proceeding will be held via Zoom webinar. Case Management Statement due by 4/25/2023. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or vi deoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2023)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Laura M. Matson ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17962573.) filed by Sarah Andersen, Kelly McKernan, Karla Ortiz. (Matson, Laura) (Filed on 2/6/2023)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 28 Stipulation.Response to Complaint due by April 18, 2023. Opposition to any motion(s) due by June 2, 2023. Any reply due by July 3, 2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wholc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2023)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Stability AI and Midjourney's Deadline to Respond to Complaint and Related Briefing Schedule filed by Sarah Andersen, Kelly McKernan, Karla Ortiz, Midjourney, Inc., Stability AI Ltd., Stability AI, Inc. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/3/2023) Modified on 2/6/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by James Asheton Lemay. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2023)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Eura Chang. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2023)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Brian D. Clark. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2023)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Eura Chang ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17958133.) filed by Sarah Andersen, Kelly McKernan, Karla Ortiz. (Chang, Eura) (Filed on 2/3/2023)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17957899.) filed by Midjourney, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lemay, James) (Filed on 2/3/2023)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Judd D. Lauter (Lauter, Judd) (Filed on 2/2/2023)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela Lucille Dunning (Dunning, Angela) (Filed on 2/2/2023)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Brian D. Clark ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17952939.) filed by Sarah Andersen, Kelly McKernan, Karla Ortiz. (Clark, Brian) (Filed on 2/2/2023)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Butterick (Butterick, Matthew) (Filed on 2/1/2023)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 01/31/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2023)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Amir Ghavi ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17945532.) filed by Stability AI, Inc.. (Ghavi, Amir) (Filed on 1/31/2023)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2023)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Michael Keats ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17944633.) filed by Stability AI, Inc.. (Keats, Michael) (Filed on 1/31/2023)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Stability AI, Inc... (Lemley, Mark) (Filed on 1/31/2023)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Nicole Jantzi ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17943605.) filed by Stability AI, Inc.. (Jantzi, Nicole) (Filed on 1/31/2023)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Paul Schoenhard ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17943582.) filed by Stability AI, Inc.. (Schoenhard, Paul) (Filed on 1/31/2023)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Alan Lemley (Lemley, Mark) (Filed on 1/31/2023)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sarah Andersen.. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/27/2023)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sarah Andersen, Kelly McKernan, Karla Ortiz (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/20/2023)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sarah Andersen, Karla Ortiz, Kelly McKernan. Midjourney, Inc. served on 1/18/2023, answer due 2/8/2023. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/20/2023)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sarah Andersen, Karla Ortiz, Kelly McKernan. DeviantArt, Inc. served on 1/18/2023, answer due 2/8/2023. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/19/2023)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sarah Andersen, Karla Ortiz, Kelly McKernan. Stability AI, Inc. served on 1/18/2023, answer due 2/8/2023. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/19/2023)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/7/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/14/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2023)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to DeviantArt, Inc., Midjourney, Inc., Stability AI Ltd., Stability AI, Inc.. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2023)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/31/2023. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2023)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/13/2023)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with jury demand ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17900289.). Filed by Sarah Andersen, Karla Ortiz, Kelly McKernan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Civil Cover Sheet)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/13/2023) Modified on 1/17/2023 (jml, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andersen et al v. Stability AI Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Andersen
Represented By: Joseph R. Saveri
Represented By: Brian D Clark
Represented By: Cadio R. Zirpoli
Represented By: Christopher Kar-Lun Young
Represented By: Elissa Amlin Buchanan
Represented By: Eura Chang
Represented By: Laura Matson
Represented By: Matthew Butterick
Represented By: Travis Luke Manfredi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly McKernan
Represented By: Joseph R. Saveri
Represented By: Brian D Clark
Represented By: Cadio R. Zirpoli
Represented By: Christopher Kar-Lun Young
Represented By: Eura Chang
Represented By: Elissa Amlin Buchanan
Represented By: Laura Matson
Represented By: Matthew Butterick
Represented By: Travis Luke Manfredi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karla Ortiz
Represented By: Joseph R. Saveri
Represented By: Brian D Clark
Represented By: Cadio R. Zirpoli
Represented By: Christopher Kar-Lun Young
Represented By: Elissa Amlin Buchanan
Represented By: Eura Chang
Represented By: Laura Matson
Represented By: Matthew Butterick
Represented By: Travis Luke Manfredi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stability AI Ltd.
Represented By: Mark Alan Lemley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stability AI, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Alan Lemley
Represented By: Nicole Marie Jantzi
Represented By: Paul M. Schoenhard
Represented By: Amir Ghavi
Represented By: Michael Courtney Keats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midjourney, Inc.
Represented By: Angela Lucille Dunning
Represented By: James Asheton Lemay
Represented By: Judd D. Lauter
Represented By: Kayla Elizabeth Blaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeviantArt, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Michael Gass
Represented By: Michael H. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?