Bowden et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Glenn Bowden and Laura Bowden
Defendant: Ford Motor Company and Susanville Ford, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00590
Filed: February 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Araceli Martinez-Olguin
2 Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher James Campbell Appearance of Counsel (Campbell, Christopher) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
July 20, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann LaRocque (LaRocque, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/20/2023)
May 31, 2023 Filing 17 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Glenn Bowden, Laura Bowden. (Tracy, Michael) (Filed on 5/31/2023)
May 11, 2023 Filing 16 Case Reassigned to District Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin. Judge Richard Seeborg no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2023)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE.IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to the Honorable Araceli Martinez-Olguin in the San Francisco division for all further proceedings.1. All future filings shall bear the initials AMO immediately after the case number.2. All case management conference dates are vacated and will be reset by the Court.3. All hearing dates presently scheduled are VACATED. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be RENOTICED for hearing before Judge Martinez-Olguin by the moving party for a date consistent with the Courts law and motion calendar, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. 4. Deadlines for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff remain unchanged. 5. All pretrial conference and trial dates currently set after August 18, 2023, and all other deadlines associated with the case, will remain in place unless otherwise ordered. 6. All pretrial conference and trial dates scheduled on or before August 18, 2023, are vacated. Other pretrial deadlines (e.g., motions in limine, pretrial statements, proposed joint trial exhibits, etc.) will remain in place. The Court will notify the parties when a status conference will be held to schedule a new pretrial conference and trial dates for affected cases. 7. Matters currently referred to a Magistrate Judge will remain before that Magistrate Judge absent further notice. 8. On or before May 31, 2023, the parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement (separate statements are appropriate if either party is proceeding without counsel). The statement should not exceed ten pages in length and should address all issues outlined in the #Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District. The approved form for such statements can be accessed # here. A Joint Case Management Statement is not required in prisoner cases in which the prisoner plaintiff/petitioner is not represented by counsel. IT IS SO ORDERED. Dated: 5/10/2023 FOR THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE Mark B. Busby, Clerk of Court (ecg-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2023)
April 14, 2023 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 5/11/2023 is continued to 6/22/2023 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 6/15/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2023)
March 1, 2023 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/11/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 5/4/2023. All parties shall appear by videoconference using log-in instructions the Court will provide in advance. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2023)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2023)
March 1, 2023 Filing 11 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #https://cand.uscourts.gov/notices/northern-district-extends-caseload-rebalancing-pilot-program/. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2023)
March 1, 2023 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND WILL BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2023)
February 28, 2023 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ford Motor Company.. (Efstratis, Harry) (Filed on 2/28/2023)
February 13, 2023 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company re 6 Case Assigned by Intake,, (Efstratis, Harry) (Filed on 2/13/2023)
February 10, 2023 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/3/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/10/2023 at 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2023)
February 9, 2023 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/23/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2023)
February 9, 2023 Filing 5 Declaration of H. Paul Efstratis in Support of #1 Notice of Removal filed by Ford Motor Company. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Efstratis, Harry) (Filed on 2/9/2023)
February 9, 2023 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS by Ford Motor Company identifying Other Affiliate State Street Corporation, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for Ford Motor Company re #1 Notice of Removal (Efstratis, Harry) (Filed on 2/9/2023)
February 9, 2023 Filing 3 Notice to Adverse Parties of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal by Ford Motor Company (Efstratis, Harry) (Filed on 2/9/2023)
February 9, 2023 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Ford Motor Company . (Efstratis, Harry) (Filed on 2/9/2023)
February 9, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL To Federal Court from Santa Clara Superior Court. Their case number is 22CV399534. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-17975492). Filed byFord Motor Company. (Efstratis, Harry) (Filed on 2/9/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowden et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Bowden
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Mark Gibson
Represented By: Michael Lion Tracy
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann LaRocque
Represented By: Christopher James Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Bowden
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Mark Gibson
Represented By: Michael Lion Tracy
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann LaRocque
Represented By: Christopher James Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Harry Paul Efstratis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susanville Ford, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?