Heagney et al v. John Paul Mitchell Systems
Plaintiff: Randall Heagney, Rica Guerrero, Kerrie Gonnella, John Rohloff and Jewel Rule
Defendant: John Paul Mitchell Systems
Case Number: 3:2023cv00687
Filed: February 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Referring Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2023 Filing 15 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 5/12/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/19/2023, 10:00 AM, via Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Friday, May 12, 2023, by 10 a.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2023)
February 17, 2023 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by John Rohloff, Randall Heagney, Kerrie Gonnella, Rica Guerrero, Jewel Rule. Service waived by John Paul Mitchell Systems waiver sent on 2/16/2023, answer due 4/17/2023. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 2/17/2023)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 02/16/2023 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2023)
February 16, 2023 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2023)
February 16, 2023 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kerrie Gonnella, Rica Guerrero, Randall Heagney, John Rohloff, Jewel Rule.. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 2/16/2023)
February 16, 2023 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to John Paul Mitchell Systems. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2023)
February 15, 2023 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/11/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/18/2023 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2023)
February 15, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17993652.) filed by Kerrie Gonnella, Rica Guerrero, Randall Heagney, John Rohloff, Jewel Rule. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kras, Michella) (Filed on 2/15/2023)
February 15, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17993623.) filed by Kerrie Gonnella, Rica Guerrero, Randall Heagney, John Rohloff, Jewel Rule. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Aragon, Leonard) (Filed on 2/15/2023)
February 15, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17993520.) filed by Kerrie Gonnella, Rica Guerrero, Randall Heagney, John Rohloff, Jewel Rule. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Carey, Robert) (Filed on 2/15/2023)
February 15, 2023 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 2/15/2023)
February 15, 2023 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Kerrie Gonnella, Rica Guerrero, Randall Heagney, John Rohloff, Jewel Rule (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 2/15/2023)
February 15, 2023 Filing 3 Declaration of Randall Heagney in Support of #1 Complaint, Declaration of Randall Heagney in Support of Complaint against John Paul Mitchell Systems filed byRandall Heagney. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 2/15/2023)
February 15, 2023 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/1/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2023)
February 15, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against John Paul Mitchell Systems ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17993084.). Filed byJohn Rohloff, Randall Heagney, Kerrie Gonnella, Rica Guerrero, Jewel Rule. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 2/15/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heagney et al v. John Paul Mitchell Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Heagney
Represented By: Leonard Aragon
Represented By: Michella A Kras
Represented By: Robert B. Carey
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rica Guerrero
Represented By: Leonard Aragon
Represented By: Michella A Kras
Represented By: Robert B. Carey
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerrie Gonnella
Represented By: Leonard Aragon
Represented By: Michella A Kras
Represented By: Robert B. Carey
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Rohloff
Represented By: Leonard Aragon
Represented By: Michella A Kras
Represented By: Robert B. Carey
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jewel Rule
Represented By: Leonard Aragon
Represented By: Michella A Kras
Represented By: Robert B. Carey
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Paul Mitchell Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?