WirelessWerx IP, LLC v. Uber Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff: WirelessWerx IP, LLC
Defendant: Uber Technologies Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00990
Filed: March 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Referring Judge: Trina L Thompson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2023 Filing 37 CLERKS NOTICE - REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Trina L. Thompson upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Thompson's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/8/2023 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/1/2023. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/trina-l-thompson/General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rfm, COURT USER) (Filed on 3/21/2023)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to District Judge Trina L Thompson for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Signed by The Clerk on March 21, 2023. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2023)
March 20, 2023 Filing 35 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2023)
March 20, 2023 Filing 34 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Uber Technologies Inc... (Leeper, Alexandra) (Filed on 3/20/2023)
March 20, 2023 Filing 33 Certificate of Interested Entities by Uber Technologies Inc. (Leeper, Alexandra) (Filed on 3/20/2023)
March 6, 2023 Filing 32 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff and Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/20/2023. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2023)
March 6, 2023 Filing 31 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/31/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/7/2023 at 1:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2023)
March 6, 2023 Filing 30 Case Transferred in from United States District Court for the Western District of Texas; Case Number 6:22-cv-01060-DC-DTG. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER TRANSFERRING VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA re #27 Stipulation filed by Uber Technologies, Inc. The Court finds that the Stipulation should be and is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (zv)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER CANCELLING MOTIONS HEARING VIA ZOOM. MOTIONS HEARING VIA ZOOM, on March 02, 2023 at 10:00 AM is hereby CANCELLED until further order of the court. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (zv)
March 1, 2023 Filing 27 STIPULATION OF TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Keefe, Heidi)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER RESETTING Zoom Motion Hearing for 3/2/2023 10:00 AM before Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (bot2)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Setting Zoom Motion Hearing for 2/27/2023 02:00 PM before Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (bot4)
February 7, 2023 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., re #20 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Improper Venue filed by Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Alexandra Leeper)(Keefe, Heidi)
January 31, 2023 Filing 23 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by WirelessWerx IP, LLC, re #20 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Improper Venue filed by Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Declaration of WPR3, #3 Exhibit Ex. A, #4 Exhibit Ex. B, #5 Exhibit Ex. C, #6 Exhibit Ex. D, #7 Exhibit Ex. E, #8 Exhibit Ex. F, #9 Exhibit Ex. G)(Ramey, William)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #22 Motion for Venue Discovery entered by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mslc)
January 30, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION for Discovery Motion for Venue Discovery by WirelessWerx IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Ramey, William)
January 17, 2023 Filing 21 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Keefe, Heidi)
January 17, 2023 Filing 20 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Improper Venue by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Andrew Greulich, #2 Affidavit Libby Dearing, #3 Affidavit Paul Williams, #4 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Keefe, Heidi)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alexandra Leeper for Uber Technologies, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge David Counts. (zv)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Reuben H. Chen for Uber Technologies, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge David Counts. (zv)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Alexandra Leeper. This is a duplicate motion. Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
December 6, 2022 Reset Deadlines: Uber Technologies, Inc. answer due 1/17/2023. (zv)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. No additional extensions of time to answer will be permitted absent good cause, entered by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mslc)
December 5, 2022 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Smith, Melissa)
November 18, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alexandra Leeper appearing for Uber Technologies, Inc. No payment made at this time. Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (lad)
November 11, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Reuben H. Chen ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-16745185) by on behalf of Uber Technologies, Inc... Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Chen, Reuben)
November 10, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alexandra Leeper ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-16744529) by on behalf of Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Leeper, Alexandra)
November 9, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Heidi L. Keefe on behalf of Uber Technologies, Inc.. Attorney Heidi L. Keefe added to party Uber Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft) (Keefe, Heidi)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, entered by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mslc)
November 3, 2022 Reset Deadlines: Uber Technologies, Inc. answer due 12/18/2022. (zv)
November 2, 2022 Filing 12 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Uber Technologies, Inc. for attorney Alexandra Leeper. (zv)
November 2, 2022 Filing 11 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Uber Technologies, Inc. for attorney Reuben Chen. (zv)
November 2, 2022 Filing 10 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Uber Technologies, Inc. for attorney Heidi Keefer. (zv)
November 2, 2022 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Smith, Melissa)
November 2, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Uber Technologies, Inc.. Attorney Melissa Richards Smith added to party Uber Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft) (Smith, Melissa)
October 14, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WirelessWerx IP, LLC. Uber Technologies, Inc. served on 10/13/2022, answer due 11/3/2022. (Ramey, William)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Signed by Judge David Counts. (zv)
October 11, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Uber Technologies, Inc.. (sm3)
October 7, 2022 Case assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (sm3)
October 7, 2022 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Parties by WirelessWerx IP, LLC. (Ramey, William)
October 7, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by WirelessWerx IP, LLC. (Ramey, William)
October 7, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William)
October 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number ATXWDC-16614785), filed by WirelessWerx IP, LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A US7317927, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramey, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WirelessWerx IP, LLC v. Uber Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WirelessWerx IP, LLC
Represented By: William P. Ramey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Reuben H. Chen
Represented By: Heidi L. Keefe
Represented By: Alexandra Leeper
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Stenstedt Leeper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?