Orendain v. Tesla, Inc.
Plaintiff: Robert Orendain
Defendant: Tesla, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv01157
Filed: March 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Referring Judge: Trina L Thompson
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order GRANTING #29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Noah Joshua Phillips. Signed by District Judge Trina L Thompson on 5/12/2023. (rfm, COURT USER) (Filed on 5/12/2023)
May 12, 2023 Filing 29 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18259430.) filed by Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Phillips, Noah) (Filed on 5/12/2023)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order GRANTING #27 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Dana R. Vobel. Signed by District Judge Trina L Thompson on 5/9/2023. (rfm, COURT USER) (Filed on 5/9/2023)
May 9, 2023 Filing 27 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18246120.) filed by Robert Orendain. (Vogel, Dana) (Filed on 5/9/2023)
May 5, 2023 Filing 26 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases: The court sua sponte refers this case 4:23-cv-02035-DMR Nana-Anyangwe v. Tesla, Inc. to Judge Trina L. Thompson to determine whether it is related to 3:23-cv-01145-TLT Lambrix v. Tesla, Inc.; 3:23-cv-01543-TLT Doyle v. Tesla, Inc.; 3:23-cv-01157-TLT Orendain v. Tesla, Inc.; and 3:23-cv-01496-TLT Bose v. Tesla, Inc. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/5/2023. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/5/2023. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2023)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order GRANTING #24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Vanessa Lavely. Signed by District Judge Trina L Thompson on 5/5/2023. (rfm, COURT USER) (Filed on 5/5/2023)
May 5, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18238638.) filed by Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lavely, Vanessa) (Filed on 5/5/2023)
May 4, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher C. Wheeler, Esq (Wheeler, Christopher) (Filed on 5/4/2023)
April 28, 2023 Filing 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE: INITIAL SCHEDULING AND PAGE LENGTHS filed by Tesla, Inc.. (Marriott, David) (Filed on 4/28/2023)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #20 STIPULATION RE: INITIAL SCHEDULING. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 4/10/2023. (rfm, COURT USER) (Filed on 4/10/2023)
April 6, 2023 Filing 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: Initial Scheduling filed by Tesla, Inc.. (Marriott, David) (Filed on 4/6/2023)
April 6, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by David R. Marriott as counsel for Tesla, Inc. (Marriott, David) (Filed on 4/6/2023)
April 4, 2023 Filing 18 CLERKS NOTICE - REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Trina L. Thompson upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Thompson's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/15/2023 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/8/2023. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/trina-l-thompson/General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rfm, COURT USER) (Filed on 4/4/2023)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 3/31/2023. Related cases: Create association to 3:23-cv-01145-TLT. (rfm, COURT USER) (Filed on 4/3/2023)
April 3, 2023 Case Reassigned to Judge Trina L Thompson. Judge Beth Labson Freeman no longer assigned to the case. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2023)
March 30, 2023 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 7/13/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/20/2023 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 1, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2023)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 3/29/23. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2023)
March 29, 2023 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2023)
March 29, 2023 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Robert Orendain.. (Brandt, Derek) (Filed on 3/29/2023)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. Signed 3/22/2023 by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Connor Lemire. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2023)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. Signed 3/22/2023 by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Derek Brandt. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2023)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order. Signed 3/22/2023 by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Leigh Perica.(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2023)
March 22, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18097223.) filed by Robert Orendain. (Lemire, Connor) (Filed on 3/22/2023)
March 22, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18096990.) filed by Robert Orendain. (Brandt, Derek) (Filed on 3/22/2023)
March 22, 2023 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Nadia Bellamy on 03/17/2023, filed by Robert Orendain. (Wright, David) (Filed on 3/22/2023)
March 22, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18096324.) filed by Robert Orendain. (Perica, Leigh) (Filed on 3/22/2023)
March 15, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Tesla, Inc. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2023)
March 15, 2023 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/9/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/16/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2023)
March 15, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/29/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2023)
March 15, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Wright, David) (Filed on 3/15/2023)
March 15, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tesla, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18073820.). Filed by Robert Orendain. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wright, David) (Filed on 3/15/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orendain v. Tesla, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Orendain
Represented By: Richard D. McCune, Jr.
Represented By: David Christopher Wright
Represented By: Connor Lemire
Represented By: Dana Vogel
Represented By: Derek Yeats Brandt
Represented By: Leigh Perica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesla, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher C. Wheeler, Esq.
Represented By: David R. Marriott
Represented By: Noah J Phillips
Represented By: Vanessa A. Lavely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?