Cortez et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Charles Cortez and Hilma Cortez
Defendant: United States of America and DOES 1-50
Case Number: 3:2023cv01222
Filed: March 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2023 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States of America.. (Mainardi, Andrew) (Filed on 5/12/2023)
April 5, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hilma Cortez, Charles Cortez. United States of America served on 3/30/2023, answer due 5/30/2023. (Burris, John) (Filed on 4/5/2023)
March 23, 2023 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2023)
March 23, 2023 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Charles Cortez, Hilma Cortez.. (Burris, John) (Filed on 3/23/2023)
March 23, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Hilma Cortez, Charles Cortez as to DOES 1-50, United States of America. (Burris, John) (Filed on 3/23/2023)
March 21, 2023 #Electronic filing error.Previously Issued Summons Must be Returned as Executed or Unexecuted before a new summons may be issued. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: #7 Proposed Summons filed by Hilma Cortez, Charles Cortez (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2023)
March 20, 2023 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Burris, John) (Filed on 3/20/2023)
March 20, 2023 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT For Damages with Jury Demand against DOES 1-50, United States of America. Filed by Hilma Cortez, Charles Cortez. (Burris, John) (Filed on 3/20/2023) Modified on 3/21/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2023 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/8/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/15/2023 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2023)
March 17, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2023)
March 17, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/31/2023. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2023)
March 16, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Burris, John) (Filed on 3/16/2023)
March 16, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand for Damages against DOES 1-50, United States of America ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18081951.). Filed by Hilma Cortez, Charles Cortez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burris, John) (Filed on 3/16/2023) Modified on 3/17/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cortez et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Cortez
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Benjamin Nisenbaum
Represented By: Christopher A. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilma Cortez
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Benjamin Nisenbaum
Represented By: Christopher A. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Andrew Mainardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?