VideoLabs Inc. et al v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: VideoLabs Inc. and VL Collective IP LLC
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv01307
Filed: March 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Araceli Martinez-Olguin
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2023 Filing 29 Case reassigned to District Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin. Judge Vince Chhabria no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2023)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE.IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to the Honorable Araceli Martinez-Olguin in the San Francisco division for all further proceedings.1. All future filings shall bear the initials AMO immediately after the case number.2. All case management conference dates are vacated and will be reset by the Court.3. All hearing dates presently scheduled are VACATED. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be RENOTICED for hearing before Judge Martinez-Olguin by the moving party for a date consistent with the Courts law and motion calendar, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. 4. Deadlines for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff remain unchanged. 5. All pretrial conference and trial dates currently set after August 18, 2023, and all other deadlines associated with the case, will remain in place unless otherwise ordered. 6. All pretrial conference and trial dates scheduled on or before August 18, 2023, are vacated. Other pretrial deadlines (e.g., motions in limine, pretrial statements, proposed joint trial exhibits, etc.) will remain in place. The Court will notify the parties when a status conference will be held to schedule a new pretrial conference and trial dates for affected cases. 7. Matters currently referred to a Magistrate Judge will remain before that Magistrate Judge absent further notice. 8. On or before May 31, 2023, the parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement (separate statements are appropriate if either party is proceeding without counsel). The statement should not exceed ten pages in length and should address all issues outlined in the #Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District. The approved form for such statements can be accessed # here. A Joint Case Management Statement is not required in prisoner cases in which the prisoner plaintiff/petitioner is not represented by counsel. IT IS SO ORDERED. Dated: 5/10/2023 FOR THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE Mark B. Busby, Clerk of Court (ecg-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2023)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #26 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Ankur Desai. (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2023)
May 8, 2023 Filing 26 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Ankur Desai ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18243473.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Desai, Ankur) (Filed on 5/8/2023)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Claire Schuster. (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2023)
May 8, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Claire Schuster ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18243181.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Schuster, Claire) (Filed on 5/8/2023)
April 18, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Buergi (Buergi, Robert) (Filed on 4/18/2023)
April 18, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Nandan Raghunath Padmanabhan (Padmanabhan, Nandan) (Filed on 4/18/2023)
April 18, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Chen Williams (Williams, Robert) (Filed on 4/18/2023)
April 18, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Lea Hannah (Hannah, Jessica) (Filed on 4/18/2023)
April 18, 2023 Filing 19 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Patent Infringement re #1 Complaint filed by Apple Inc. (Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 4/18/2023) Modified on 4/20/2023 (gba, COURT STAFF).
April 18, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Paige Gibson (Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 4/18/2023)
April 17, 2023 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE RE 7 , #8 : CORRECTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/16/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/23/2023 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Friday, June 16, 2023, by no later than 12:00PM.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2023)
April 5, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VL Collective IP LLC, VideoLabs Inc.. Apple Inc. served on 3/29/2023, answer due 4/19/2023. (Cardenas-Navia, Jaime) (Filed on 4/5/2023)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Christine Lehman. (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2023)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jaime Cardenas-Navia. (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2023)
March 29, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Christine E. Lehman ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18120189.) filed by VL Collective IP LLC, VideoLabs Inc.. (Lehman, Christine) (Filed on 3/29/2023)
March 29, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Jaime F. Cardenas-Navia ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18120071.) filed by VL Collective IP LLC, VideoLabs Inc.. (Cardenas-Navia, Jaime) (Filed on 3/29/2023)
March 29, 2023 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by VL Collective IP LLC, VideoLabs Inc. identifying Corporate Parent VL IP Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate VideoLabs Inc. for VL Collective IP LLC. (Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 3/29/2023)
March 28, 2023 Filing 10 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Patent Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2023)
March 28, 2023 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2023)
March 28, 2023 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2023)
March 27, 2023 Filing 7 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/23/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/30/2023 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Friday, June 23, by no later than 12:00 pm.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2023)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on March 24, 2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2023)
March 23, 2023 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2023)
March 22, 2023 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by VL Collective IP LLC, VideoLabs Inc... (Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 3/22/2023)
March 21, 2023 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 3/21/2023)
March 21, 2023 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/4/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2023)
March 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement; Jury Trial Demanded against Apple Inc. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18093276.). Filed by VL Collective IP LLC, VideoLabs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Civil Cover Sheet, #32 Summons Apple Inc.) (Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 3/21/2023) Modified on 3/28/2023 (gba, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VideoLabs Inc. et al v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VideoLabs Inc.
Represented By: Courtland Lewis Reichman
Represented By: Christine E. Lehman
Represented By: Jaime F. Cardenas-Navia
Represented By: Jennifer Prieb Estremera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VL Collective IP LLC
Represented By: Courtland Lewis Reichman
Represented By: Christine E. Lehman
Represented By: Jaime F. Cardenas-Navia
Represented By: Jennifer Prieb Estremera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Erin Paige Gibson
Represented By: Ankur Vijay Desai
Represented By: Claire E. Schuster
Represented By: Jessica Lea Hannah
Represented By: Nandan Raghunath Padmanabhan
Represented By: Robert Buergi
Represented By: Robert Chen Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?