Edwards v. California Supreme Court
Plaintiff: Myeisha M. Edwards
Defendant: California Supreme Court
Case Number: 3:2023cv02253
Filed: May 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Araceli Martinez-Olguin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2023 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against California Supreme Court. Filed byMyeisha M. Edwards. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2023)
May 10, 2023 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 8/3/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/10/2023 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 10, 2023 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2023)
May 9, 2023 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Myeisha M. Edwards.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2023)
May 9, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Myeisha M. Edwards. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2023)
May 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against California Supreme Court. Filed by Myeisha M. Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/10/2023 (cv, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. California Supreme Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myeisha M. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Supreme Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?