ALD Social, LLC v. Apple, Inc.
Plaintiff: ALD Social, LLC
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv02695
Filed: May 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2023 Filing 54 Declaration of Jennifer M. Przybylski in Support of #53 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #53 ) (Magic, Peter) (Filed on 8/28/2023)
August 28, 2023 Filing 53 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Apple, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2023 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 08, 19th Floor before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 9/11/2023. Replies due by 9/18/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Magic, Peter) (Filed on 8/28/2023)
August 21, 2023 Filing 52 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 13, 2023, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber SA ZIELIE, telephone number 9035901065. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 9/11/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/21/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2023. (Zielie, Susan) (Filed on 8/21/2023)
August 14, 2023 Filing 51 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apple, Inc.. Filed byALD Social, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kalra, Susan) (Filed on 8/14/2023)
July 24, 2023 Filing 50 CLERK'S NOTICE PROVIDING ZOOM ACCESS INFORMATION. The Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/9/2023 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley will be held via a Zoom webinar. Case Management Statement due by 11/2/2023. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than noon on 11/8/2023.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2023)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #21 Motion to Dismiss. FAC is due by August 14, 2023. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2023)
July 13, 2023 Filing 48 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Motion Hearing held on 7/13/2023 re #21 Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The motion was argued, submitted, and taken under submission. (Court Reporter: Susan Zielie by videoconference)Attorney for Plaintiff: Susan KalraAttorneys for Defendant: Jennifer Przybylski/Peter Magic (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/13/2023)
July 13, 2023 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan S.Q. Kalra (Kalra, Susan) (Filed on 7/13/2023)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #44 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jennifer Przybylski. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2023)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #43 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Asim Zaidi. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2023)
June 13, 2023 Filing 44 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Jennifer Przybylski ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18347927.) Filing fee previously paid on 6/9/2023 filed by Apple, Inc.. (Przybylski, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/13/2023)
June 13, 2023 Filing 43 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Asim Zaidi ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18354867.) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Zaidi, Asim) (Filed on 6/13/2023)
June 12, 2023 Filing 42 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING MOTION HEARING. Please take notice the hearing on Defendant Apple, Inc.'s #21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is set for 7/13/2023 at 10:00 a.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom 08, 19th Floor before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2023)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for all further proceedings. Judge Jon S. Tigar no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 6/12/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2023)
June 9, 2023 Filing 40 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Jennifer M. Przybylski ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18347927.) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Przybylski, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/9/2023) Modified on 6/14/2023 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
June 9, 2023 Filing 39 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by Apple, Inc. (Magic, Peter) (Filed on 6/9/2023)
June 9, 2023 Filing 38 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple, Inc. (Magic, Peter) (Filed on 6/9/2023)
June 9, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Curtis Magic on behalf of Apple Inc. (Magic, Peter) (Filed on 6/9/2023)
June 9, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Desmarais on behalf of Apple Inc. (Desmarais, John) (Filed on 6/9/2023)
June 9, 2023 Filing 35 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Jon S. Tigar. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than September 6, 2023 by 2:00 p.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/., Set/Reset Deadlines as to #21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2023)
May 31, 2023 Filing 34 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/22/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/29/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2023)
May 31, 2023 Filing 33 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 6:22-cv-00969. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING #27 Motion to Transfer Case TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1406(A) OR 28 U.S.C. 1404(A). Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (zv)
May 31, 2023 Filing 31 Sealed Document filed: Affidavit Declaration of Duy Phan re #27 MOTION to Transfer Case TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1406(A) OR 28 U.S.C. 1404(A). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Sandy Parakilas, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Kevin Kramer) (zv)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Sealed Order Granting #28 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (zv)
April 14, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE (DKT. 27) by Apple, Inc. re #27 MOTION to Transfer Case TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1406(A) OR 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) (additional declarations are being filed under seal) (Wingard, Steven)
March 30, 2023 Filing 28 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Duy Phan, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Sandy Parakilas, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Kevin Kramer) (Burbank, Stephen)
March 30, 2023 Filing 27 MOTION to Transfer Case TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1406(A) OR 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) (additional declarations are being filed under seal) by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of JENNIFER M. PRZYBYLSKI, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M-1, #15 Exhibit M-2, #16 Exhibit M-3, #17 Exhibit N-1, #18 Exhibit N-2, #19 Exhibit N-3, #20 Exhibit O, #21 Exhibit P-1, #22 Exhibit P-2)(Burbank, Stephen)
March 16, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven J. Wingard on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Wingard, Steven)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John M. Desmarais for Apple, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (zv)
December 14, 2022 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Apple, Inc., re #21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Apple, Inc. (APPLES REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT) (Wingard, Steven)
December 7, 2022 Filing 23 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by ALD Social, LLC, re #21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Apple, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Ex. A)(Ramey, William)
December 1, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen Burbank for John M. Desmarais ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-16806743) by on behalf of Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burbank, Stephen)
November 23, 2022 Filing 21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jennifer Przybylski, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Burbank, Stephen)
October 20, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven J. Wingard on behalf of Apple, Inc.. Attorney Steven J. Wingard added to party Apple, Inc.(pty:dft) (Wingard, Steven)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Peter C. Magic for Apple, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (zv)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jennifer M. Przybylski for Apple, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (zv)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WITHDRAW DEFENDANT APPLES MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT re #16 Notice (Other) filed by Apple, Inc. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (zv)
October 13, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE TO WITHDRAWAL MOTION TO DISMISS by Apple, Inc. re 13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Burbank, Stephen)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint ; Apple, Inc. answer due 11/25/2022. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (zv)
October 11, 2022 Filing 14 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple, Inc.. (Burbank, Stephen)
October 11, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen Burbank for Peter C. Magic ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-16624227) by on behalf of Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burbank, Stephen)
October 11, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen Burbank for Jennifer M. Przybylski ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-16624159) by on behalf of Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burbank, Stephen)
October 7, 2022 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burbank, Stephen)
October 7, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen Burbank on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Burbank, Stephen)
October 5, 2022 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #8 Notice (Other). Please be advise that this document should be filed as a Motion. Please refile as a Motion with a Proposed Order attached. Thank you. (zv)
October 5, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE Unopposed Notice for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by ALD Social, LLC (Ramey, William)
September 21, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALD Social, LLC. Apple, Inc. served on 9/20/2022, answer due 10/11/2022. (Ramey, William)
September 16, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc. (zv)
September 16, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc.. (lad)
September 16, 2022 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Parties by ALD Social, LLC. (Ramey, William)
September 16, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by ALD Social, LLC. (Ramey, William)
September 16, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William)
September 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16534335), filed by ALD Social, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramey, William)
September 16, 2022 Case directly assigned to Judge Fred Biery due to previous filed case as having same Plaintiff and patent case numbers. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (zv)
September 16, 2022 All parties shall flatten all documents before e-filing. (zv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALD Social, LLC v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALD Social, LLC
Represented By: William P. Ramey, III
Represented By: Susan S.Q. Kalra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Burbank
Represented By: Steven J. Wingard
Represented By: Jennifer M Przybylski
Represented By: John M Desmarais
Represented By: Peter C. Magic
Represented By: Asim Zaidi
Represented By: John M. Desmarais
Represented By: Peter Curtis Magic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?