Jones v. County of Sonoma et al
Plaintiff: Christine Jones
Defendant: County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Public Defenders Office, City of Santa Rosa, Santa Rosa Police Department, Fabiola Mania and Sergeant Matthew Noah
Case Number: 3:2023cv02730
Filed: May 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2023 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION TO DISMISS hearing set for August 18, 2023 before the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. Motion Hearing set for 8/18/2023 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/crb Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at crbcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than August 15, 2023 at 3:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion Hearing set for 8/18/2023 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 17, 2023 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by City of Santa Rosa, Matthew Noah, Santa Rosa Police Department.. (Hammond, Robin) (Filed on 7/17/2023)
July 17, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Santa Rosa, Matthew Noah, Santa Rosa Police Department. Motion Hearing set for 8/28/2023 09:30 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 7/31/2023. Replies due by 8/7/2023. (Hammond, Robin) (Filed on 7/17/2023)
July 10, 2023 Filing 15 Declaration of Petra Bruggisser in Support of #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by County of Sonoma, Fabiola Mania, Sonoma County Public Defenders Office. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service - Amended)(Related document(s) #13 ) (Bruggisser, Petra) (Filed on 7/10/2023)
July 10, 2023 Filing 14 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by County of Sonoma, Fabiola Mania, Sonoma County Public Defenders Office. (Related document(s) #13 ) (Bruggisser, Petra) (Filed on 7/10/2023)
July 10, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES - RULE 12 filed by County of Sonoma, Fabiola Mania, Sonoma County Public Defenders Office. Motion Hearing set for 8/18/2023 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 7/24/2023. Replies due by 7/31/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Petra Bruggisser in Support of County of Sonoma Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Bruggisser, Petra) (Filed on 7/10/2023)
June 27, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christine Jones. City of Santa Rosa served on 6/26/2023, answer due 7/17/2023; County of Sonoma served on 6/26/2023, answer due 7/17/2023; Fabiola Mania served on 6/26/2023, answer due 7/17/2023; Matthew Noah served on 6/26/2023, answer due 7/17/2023; Santa Rosa Police Department served on 6/26/2023, answer due 7/17/2023; Sonoma County Public Defenders Office served on 6/26/2023, answer due 7/17/2023. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2023)
June 26, 2023 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/29/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/6/2023 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 06/26/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 26, 2023 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 22, 2023 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Christine Jones. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2023)
June 16, 2023 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 6/30/2023. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 6/30/2023. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 12, 2023 Filing 6 Mail sent to Christine Jones returned as undeliverable re #2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2023)
June 9, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to City of Santa Rosa, County of Sonoma, Fabiola Mania, Matthew Noah, Santa Rosa Police Department, Sonoma County Public Defenders Office. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 forms)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2023)
June 9, 2023 Service packet delivered to the U.S. Marshals Post Box in the Clerks Office mailroom. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2023)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (sklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 6, 2023 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/21/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/28/2023 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (sec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 30, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Christine Jones. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2023) Modified on 6/6/2023 (sec, COURT STAFF).
May 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Public Defenders Office, Fabiola Mania, City of Santa Rosa, Santa Rosa Police Department, Sergeant Matthew Noah . Filed by Christine Jones. Consent/Declination due by 6/13/2023. (sec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2023) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/6/2023: #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service) (sec, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/6/2023 (sec, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. County of Sonoma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sonoma
Represented By: Petra Bruggisser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonoma County Public Defenders Office
Represented By: Petra Bruggisser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Santa Rosa
Represented By: Robin Bows Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Rosa Police Department
Represented By: Robin Bows Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fabiola Mania
Represented By: Petra Bruggisser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Matthew Noah
Represented By: Robin Bows Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?