Gregg et al v. Bohemian Club et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Gregg, Shawn Granger, Wallid Saad and Shawn Claiborne
Defendant: Bohemian Club, Monastery Camp and Pomella LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv02760
Filed: June 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Araceli Martinez-Olguin
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2023 Filing 31 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Nunes, Anthony) (Filed on 8/31/2023)
August 31, 2023 Filing 30 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Preonas, Stephen) (Filed on 8/31/2023)
August 30, 2023 Filing 29 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Bell, Melissa) (Filed on 8/30/2023)
August 25, 2023 Filing 28 Clerk's Notice Modifying Case Management Conference Date and Location. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/20/2023 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ads, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2023)
August 21, 2023 Filing 27 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Bohemian Club. (Nabity, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/21/2023)
August 7, 2023 Filing 26 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Bohemian Club. (Nabity, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/7/2023)
August 7, 2023 Filing 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT filed by Pomella LLC. (Preonas, Stephen) (Filed on 8/7/2023)
August 7, 2023 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pomella LLC identifying Corporate Parent Michal Talmor for Pomella LLC. (Preonas, Stephen) (Filed on 8/7/2023)
August 7, 2023 Filing 23 Certificate of Interested Entities by Pomella LLC identifying Corporate Parent Michal Talmor, Corporate Parent Michal Talmor for Pomella LLC. (Preonas, Stephen) (Filed on 8/7/2023)
August 4, 2023 Filing 22 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Monastery Camp (Bell, Melissa) (Filed on 8/4/2023)
August 4, 2023 Filing 21 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY 30 DAYS filed by Monastery Camp. (Bell, Melissa) (Filed on 8/4/2023)
July 28, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Fred W. Alvarez (Alvarez, Fred) (Filed on 7/28/2023)
July 28, 2023 Filing 19 Clerk's Notice Setting Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 9/14/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2023 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ads, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2023)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin for all further proceedings. Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 7/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2023)
July 27, 2023 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2023)
July 27, 2023 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Shawn Claiborne, Shawn Granger, Anthony Gregg.. (Nunes, Anthony) (Filed on 7/27/2023)
July 26, 2023 Filing 15 THIRD CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs and Defendant Bohemian Club shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/9/2023. (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2023)
July 17, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Paul Nabity (Nabity, Kenneth) (Filed on 7/17/2023)
July 11, 2023 Filing 13 SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/25/2023. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2023)
July 7, 2023 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Shawn Granger, Anthony Gregg, Shawn Claiborne. Service waived by Bohemian Club waiver sent on 6/7/2023, answer due 8/7/2023. (Nunes, Anthony) (Filed on 7/7/2023)
June 26, 2023 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/10/2023. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2023)
June 20, 2023 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Shawn Granger, Anthony Gregg, Wallid Saad. Service waived by Pomella LLC waiver sent on 6/12/2023, answer due 8/11/2023. (Nunes, Anthony) (Filed on 6/20/2023)
June 7, 2023 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Bohemian Club, Monastery Camp, Pomella LLC. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2023)
June 7, 2023 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Nunes, Anthony) (Filed on 6/7/2023)
June 7, 2023 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Nunes, Anthony) (Filed on 6/7/2023)
June 7, 2023 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Nunes, Anthony) (Filed on 6/7/2023)
June 6, 2023 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT With Demand for Jury Trial against Bohemian Club, Monastery Camp, Pomella LLC. Filed by Anthony Gregg, Wallid Saad, Shawn Granger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Nunes, Anthony) (Filed on 6/6/2023) Modified on 6/7/2023 (slh, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2023 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/30/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/6/2023 at 1:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2023)
June 6, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/20/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2023)
June 5, 2023 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Shawn Claiborne, Anthony Gregg, Wallid Saad . (Nunes, Anthony) (Filed on 6/5/2023)
June 5, 2023 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR: 1. Failure to Pay Minimum Wage; 2. Collective Action - Violation of the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA, 29 U.S.C. 201, et seq.); 3. Failure to Provide Meal Periods; 4. Failure to Provide Paid Rest Breaks; 5. Failure to Pay All Wages at Termination (Labor Code Section 201-203) 6. Failure to Provide Accurate Wage Statements; 7. Unfair Business Practices; 8. Violation of Labor Code Section 2699 (PAGA); DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number ACANDC-18331971). Filed by Anthony Gregg, Wallid Saad, Shawn Claiborne . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Nunes, Anthony) (Filed on 6/5/2023) Modified on 6/6/2023 (tn, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregg et al v. Bohemian Club et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Gregg
Represented By: Anthony James Nunes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Granger
Represented By: Anthony James Nunes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wallid Saad
Represented By: Anthony James Nunes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Claiborne
Represented By: Anthony James Nunes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bohemian Club
Represented By: Kenneth Paul Nabity
Represented By: Fred W. Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monastery Camp
Represented By: Melissa K. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pomella LLC
Represented By: Stephen George Preonas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?