July 24, 2023 |
Filing 21
REPLY (re #8 MOTION to Vacate ) REPLY TO PLTF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT RESPONSE TO DOCUMENT 12 OSC filed byKenton Keading. (Ferrigno, Anthony) (Filed on 7/24/2023)
|
July 19, 2023 |
Filing 20
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Hilja Keading . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(O'Brien, Kevin) (Filed on 7/19/2023)
|
July 12, 2023 |
Filing 19
Response to Order to Show Cause #12 Order to Show Cause, DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO OSC byKenton Keading. (Ferrigno, Anthony) (Filed on 7/12/2023)
|
July 12, 2023 |
Filing 18
NOTICE by Kenton Keading SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF INADVERTENTLY OMITTED EXHIBITS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EARTH ISLAND INSTITUTES NOTICE OF JOINDER & JOINDER IN DEF KEADING'S MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT & PROOF OF SERVICE THEREON)(Ferrigno, Anthony) (Filed on 7/12/2023)
|
July 12, 2023 |
Filing 17
ERRATA re #1 Notice of Removal,, SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF ERRATA TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kenton Keading. (Ferrigno, Anthony) (Filed on 7/12/2023)
|
July 11, 2023 |
Filing 16
CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING PENDING OSC DEADLINES. Please take notice that the briefing schedule on the OSC re: subject-matter jurisdiction issued by Magistrate Judge Beeler remains in full force and effect. (Dkt. No. #12 ) Upon the submission of the briefs, the Court will take the matter under submission. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2023)
|
July 10, 2023 |
Filing 15
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 07/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2023)
|
July 10, 2023 |
Filing 14
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2023)
|
July 7, 2023 |
Filing 13
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kenton Keading.. (Ferrigno, Anthony) (Filed on 7/7/2023)
|
July 6, 2023 |
Filing 12
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. In the attached order, the court orders Kenton Keading to show cause why the case should not be remanded for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/10/2023 09:30 AM. Show Cause Response due by 7/12/2023. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on July 6, 2023. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2023)
|
July 6, 2023 |
Filing 11
Order. Signed 7/6/2023 by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2023)
|
July 5, 2023 |
Filing 10
CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motion Hearing as to #8 MOTION to Vacate Judgment After Trial set for 8/10/2023 09:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2023)
|
July 5, 2023 |
Filing 9
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Kenton Keading has filed a Motion to Vacate Judgement. Therefore Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:
|
June 28, 2023 |
Filing 7
REPLY re #8 MOTION to Vacate Judgment After Trial. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A to REPLY to PLAINTIFFS OPPO to MOT VACATE)(Ferrigno, Anthony) (Filed on 6/28/2023) Modified on 7/5/2023 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
|
June 27, 2023 |
Filing 6
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/14/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2023 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2023)
|
June 27, 2023 |
Filing 5
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/11/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2023)
|
June 23, 2023 |
Filing 4
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as a Moving Party Seeking Relief this Case filed by Kenton Keading. (Ferrigno, Anthony) (Filed on 6/23/2023)
|
June 23, 2023 |
Filing 3
NOTICE by Kenton Keading re #1 Notice of Removal,, Notice of Inadvertently Omitted Exhibits to Notice of Removal and Notice of Errata to Notice of Removal (Ferrigno, Anthony) (Filed on 6/23/2023)
|
June 23, 2023 |
Filing 2
NOTICE by Kenton Keading re #1 Notice of Removal,, Notice of Inadvertently Omitted Exhibits to Notice of Removal and Notice of Errata to Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Errata Notice of Errata to Def Keading's Notice of Removal)(Ferrigno, Anthony) (Filed on 6/23/2023)
|
June 21, 2023 |
Filing 8
MOTION to Vacate Judgment After Trial; for Joinder, filed by Kenton Keading.This motion was attached to the #1 Notice of Removal. The Court will determine whether further briefing or a hearing is required. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2023)
|
June 21, 2023 |
Filing 1
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Contra Costa County Superior Court. Their case number is P16-00402. (). Filed byKenton Keading. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Sumona Majumdar's Decl. ISO K.Keading's Notice of Removal and Consent, #2 Declaration Earth Island Institute's F.R.C.P. 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Local Rule 3-15 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Disclosure, #3 Civil Cover Sheet U.S.D.C. Northern District Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Declaration Keading Fee Waiver Application)(Ferrigno, Anthony) (Filed on 6/21/2023)
|
June 21, 2023 |
#Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used for fee waiver. Please use "Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauparis" found in Civil Events Motions and Related Filings Motions - General. [err101]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office and no Judge assignment will be made until document is re-filed. Re: #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Kenton Keading (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2023)
|