Liu v. Kaiser Permanente Employees Pension Plan for The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sherry Yali Liu
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente Employees Pension Plan for The Permanente Medical Group, Inc. and Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv03109
Filed: June 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Araceli Martinez-Olguin
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2023 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Sherry Yali Liu. Service waived by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. waiver sent on 11/1/2023, answer due 1/2/2024. (Rosati, Robert) (Filed on 11/7/2023)
October 17, 2023 Filing 27 First Amended Complaint Summons Issued as to Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2023)
October 17, 2023 Filing 26 Proposed Summons. (Rosati, Robert) (Filed on 10/17/2023)
October 17, 2023 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kaiser Permanente Employees Pension Plan for The Permanente Medical Group, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. Filed bySherry Yali Liu. (Rosati, Robert) (Filed on 10/17/2023)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order granting #23 Stipulation to Withdraw #15 Motion to Dismiss, Vacate Hearing on Motion to Dismiss, and Permit Plaintiff to File a First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff to file the First Amended Complaint by 10/19/2023. Defendant to answer or otherwise respond by 12/1/2023. Initial case management conference and case management statement due date are vacated. Parties to submit proposed dates for the initial case management conference within 3 days of a ruling on any motion to dismiss the First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin on October 16, 2023. (amolc1, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2023)
October 13, 2023 Filing 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with leave to file a First Amended Complaint and Withdraw Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Sherry Yali Liu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A First Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation)(Rosati, Robert) (Filed on 10/13/2023) Modified on 10/13/2023 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 29, 2023 Filing 22 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Kang, Clarissa) (Filed on 9/29/2023)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin granting #19 Stipulation Continuing Pending Dates and Deadlines. Motion to Dismiss #15 Hearing set for 2/8/2024 at 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin. Opposition due by 9/25/2023. Reply due by 10/16/2023. (ads, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2023)
September 11, 2023 Filing 20 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ) filed bySherry Yali Liu. (Rosati, Robert) (Filed on 9/11/2023)
September 8, 2023 Filing 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue Pending Dates and Deadlines filed by Kaiser Permanente Employees Pension Plan for The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Continue Pending Dates and Deadlines)(Kang, Clarissa) (Filed on 9/8/2023)
September 6, 2023 Filing 18 Clerk's Notice Continuing Motion Hearing. Due to the Court's impacted calendar, the motion to dismiss hearing #15 is re-set to 2/1/2024 at 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin. The parties may be able to obtain an earlier hearing date by consenting to a magistrate judge using the form available at: # http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ads, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2023)
August 30, 2023 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Entities by Kaiser Permanente Employees Pension Plan for The Permanente Medical Group, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate The Permanente Medical Group, Inc. for Kaiser Permanente Employees Pension Plan for The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. (Kang, Clarissa) (Filed on 8/30/2023)
August 30, 2023 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents. Re: #16 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Kaiser Permanente Employees Pension Plan for The Permanente Medical Group, Inc. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2023)
August 29, 2023 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by Kaiser Permanente Employees Pension Plan for The Permanente Medical Group, Inc. (Kang, Clarissa) (Filed on 8/29/2023)
August 28, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Kaiser Permanente Employees Pension Plan for The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/21/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin. Responses due by 9/11/2023. Replies due by 9/18/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Clarissa A. Kang in Support of Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Proposed Order)(Kang, Clarissa) (Filed on 8/28/2023)
August 17, 2023 Filing 14 Clerk's Notice Scheduling Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 11/9/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2023 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ads, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2023)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin for all further proceedings. Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 08/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2023)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/17/2023. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2023)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 08/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2023)
August 17, 2023 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2023)
August 16, 2023 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kaiser Permanente Employees Pension Plan for The Permanente Medical Group, Inc... (Murray, Brian) (Filed on 8/16/2023)
July 19, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Sherry Yali Liu. Service waived by Kaiser Permanente Employees Pension Plan for The Permanente Medical Group, Inc. waiver sent on 6/28/2023, answer due 8/28/2023. (Rosati, Robert) (Filed on 7/19/2023)
July 5, 2023 Filing 7 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Rosati, Robert) (Filed on 7/5/2023)
June 28, 2023 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sherry Yali Liu.. (Rosati, Robert) (Filed on 6/28/2023)
June 27, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Kaiser Permanente Employees Pension Plan for The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2023)
June 26, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/10/2023. (sec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2023)
June 23, 2023 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/29/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/6/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2023)
June 23, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Rosati, Robert) (Filed on 6/23/2023)
June 23, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kaiser Permanente Employees Pension Plan for The Permanente Medical Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BCANDC-18388108.). Filed by Sherry Yali Liu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rosati, Robert) (Filed on 6/23/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liu v. Kaiser Permanente Employees Pension Plan for The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Yali Liu
Represented By: Robert J. Rosati
Represented By: Raquel Monique Busani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente Employees Pension Plan for The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By: Clarissa A. Kang
Represented By: Brian Douglas Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?