Central Garden & Pet Company et al v. Leetronics Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Central Garden & Pet Company and Farnam Companies, Inc.
Defendant: Leetronics Corporation, Eliran Yadid and John Does 1-10, individually or as corporations/business entities
Case Number: 3:2023cv03157
Filed: June 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Araceli Martinez-Olguin
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2023 Filing 11 Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendants Leetronics Corporation and Eliran Yadid. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Related documents(s) #10 )(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2023)
August 1, 2023 Filing 10 Request for Entry of Default filed by Central Garden & Pet Company, Farnam Companies, Inc. (Micheil, Shane) (Filed on 8/1/2023) Modified on 8/2/2023 (gba, COURT STAFF).
August 1, 2023 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Central Garden & Pet Company, Farnam Companies, Inc. (as to Defendant Eliran Yadid) (Micheil, Shane) (Filed on 8/1/2023)
August 1, 2023 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Central Garden & Pet Company, Farnam Companies, Inc. (as to Defendant Leetronics Corporation) (Micheil, Shane) (Filed on 8/1/2023)
June 28, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Leetronics Corporation, Eliran Yadid. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2023)
June 28, 2023 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 9/28/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2023 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2023)
June 28, 2023 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Central Garden & Pet Company, Farnam Companies, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Central Garden & Pet Company, Other Affiliate Farnam Companies, Inc. for Central Garden & Pet Company. (Micheil, Shane) (Filed on 6/28/2023)
June 27, 2023 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/11/2023. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2023)
June 26, 2023 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Patent or Trademark Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (Micheil, Shane) (Filed on 6/26/2023)
June 26, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Micheil, Shane) (Filed on 6/26/2023)
June 26, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages, Injunctive, and Other Relief; Demand for Jury Trial against Leetronics Corporation, Eliran Yadid (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18394926.). Filed by Central Garden & Pet Company, Farnam Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Micheil, Shane) (Filed on 6/26/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Central Garden & Pet Company et al v. Leetronics Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Garden & Pet Company
Represented By: Shane Thomas Micheil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farnam Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Shane Thomas Micheil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leetronics Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eliran Yadid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10, individually or as corporations/business entities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?