Tremblay et al v. OPENAI, INC. et al
Plaintiff: Paul Tremblay and Mona Awad
Defendant: OPENAI, INC., OPENAI, L.P., OpenAI OpCo, L.L.C., OPENAI GP, L.L.C., OPENAI STARTUP FUND GP I, L.L.C., OPENAI STARTUP FUND I, L.P. and OPENAI STARTUP FUND MANAGEMENT, LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv03223
Filed: June 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Araceli Martinez-Olguin
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 504 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2023 Filing 30 Clerk's Notice Modifying Case Management Conference Location. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2023 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ads, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2023)
August 11, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal OF PLAINTIFF MONA AWAD PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) by Mona Awad, Paul Tremblay (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 8/11/2023)
August 10, 2023 Filing 28 Certificate of Interested Entities by Mona Awad, Paul Tremblay (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 8/10/2023)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re #23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline to Respond to Complaints. Signed by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin on 7/28/2023. Plaintiffs' oppositions due by 9/27/2023. Defendants' Replies due by 10/11/2023. Anticipated Motion(s) Hearing set for 12/7/2023 at 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin. (ads, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2023)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin granting #23 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related and Relating Cases. The Court has reviewed the motion and determined that Case No. 23-cv-3223 AMO is related to Case No. 23-cv-3416 TLT. (ads, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2023) Modified on 7/28/2023 (ads, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2023 Filing 25 Statement of Non-Opposition re #16 MOTION to Relate Case filed byOPENAI GP, L.L.C., OPENAI STARTUP FUND GP I, L.L.C., OPENAI STARTUP FUND I, L.P., OPENAI STARTUP FUND MANAGEMENT, LLC, OPENAI, INC., OPENAI, L.P., OpenAI OpCo, L.L.C.. (Related document(s) #16 ) (Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 7/28/2023)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order re #16 Motion to Relate: The Court hereby ORDERS Defendants to file a response to Plaintiffs' motion to relate this case with Silverman et al. v. OpenAI, Inc. et al., 23-3416-TLT. Defendants may file an opposition, a statement of support, or a statement of non-opposition, but the response must be filed no later than 3:00 pm PST on July 28, 2023. Signed by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin on July 26, 2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amolc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2023)
July 21, 2023 Filing 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline to Respond to Complaints filed by Mona Awad, Paul Tremblay, OpenAI, Inc.; OpenAI, L.P.; OpenAI GP, L.L.C.; OpenAI OpCo, LLC; OpenAI Startup Fund GP I, L.L.C.; OpenAI Startup Fund I, L.P.; and OpenAI Startup Fund Management, LLC. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/21/2023) Modified on 7/24/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2023 Filing 22 Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by OPENAI GP, L.L.C., OPENAI STARTUP FUND GP I, L.L.C., OPENAI STARTUP FUND I, L.P., OPENAI STARTUP FUND MANAGEMENT, LLC, OPENAI, INC., OPENAI, L.P., OpenAI OpCo, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent OPENAI STARTUP FUND GP I, L.L.C., Other Affiliate Microsoft Corporation for OPENAI STARTUP FUND I, L.P.; Corporate Parent OPENAI, INC. for OPENAI GP, L.L.C., OpenAI OpCo, L.L.C. (Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 7/21/2023) Modified on 7/24/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Richard Wetzel on Behalf of Defendants OpenAI, Inc.; OpenAI, L.P.; OpenAI OPCO, L.L.C.; OpenAI GP, L.L.C.; OpenAI Startup Fund GP I, L.L.C.; OpenAI Startup Fund I, L.P.; and OpenAI Startup Fund Management, L.L.C. (Wetzel, Joseph) (Filed on 7/21/2023)
July 21, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Michael Gass on Behalf of Defendants OpenAI, Inc.; OpenAI, L.P.; OpenAI OPCO, L.L.C.; OpenAI GP, L.L.C.; OpenAI Startup Fund GP I, L.L.C.; OpenAI Startup Fund I, L.P.; and OpenAI Startup Fund Management, L.L.C. (Gass, Andrew) (Filed on 7/21/2023)
July 21, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Allyson Roz Bennett (Bennett, Allyson) (Filed on 7/21/2023)
July 21, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany Cheung (Cheung, Tiffany) (Filed on 7/21/2023)
July 21, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Charles Gratz (Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 7/21/2023)
July 19, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Mona Awad, Paul Tremblay. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jospeh R. Saveri, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/19/2023)
July 13, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mona Awad, Paul Tremblay. OPENAI GP, L.L.C. served on 6/30/2023, answer due 7/21/2023. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/13/2023)
July 13, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mona Awad, Paul Tremblay. OPENAI, INC. served on 6/30/2023, answer due 7/21/2023. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/13/2023)
July 13, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mona Awad, Paul Tremblay. OPENAI STARTUP FUND MANAGEMENT, LLC served on 6/30/2023, answer due 7/21/2023. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/13/2023)
July 13, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mona Awad, Paul Tremblay. OpenAI OpCo, L.L.C. served on 6/30/2023, answer due 7/21/2023. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/13/2023)
July 13, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mona Awad, Paul Tremblay. OPENAI, L.P. served on 6/30/2023, answer due 7/21/2023. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/13/2023)
June 30, 2023 Filing 10 Clerk's Notice Scheduling Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 9/28/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2023 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ads, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2023)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 6/29/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2023)
June 29, 2023 Filing 8 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Copyrights (cc: form mailed to register). (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 6/29/2023)
June 29, 2023 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2023)
June 29, 2023 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/19/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2023)
June 29, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to OPENAI GP, L.L.C., OPENAI STARTUP FUND GP I, L.L.C., OPENAI STARTUP FUND I, L.P., OPENAI STARTUP FUND MANAGEMENT, LLC, OPENAI, INC., OPENAI, L.P., OpenAI OpCo, L.L.C. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2023)
June 29, 2023 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mona Awad, Paul Tremblay.. (Butterick, Matthew) (Filed on 6/29/2023)
June 29, 2023 #Electronic filing error. AO-CAND-121 Form is missing. Submit your document using Other Documents> Copyrights. [err201] Re: #1 Complaint filed by Paul Tremblay, Mona Awad. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2023)
June 28, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/12/2023. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2023)
June 28, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 6/28/2023)
June 28, 2023 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18405158). Filed by Mona Awad, Paul Tremblay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 6/28/2023) Modified on 6/29/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tremblay et al v. OPENAI, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Tremblay
Represented By: Joseph R. Saveri
Represented By: Cadio R. Zirpoli
Represented By: Christopher Kar-Lun Young
Represented By: Kathleen Jordan McMahon
Represented By: Matthew Butterick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mona Awad
Represented By: Joseph R. Saveri
Represented By: Cadio R. Zirpoli
Represented By: Christopher Kar-Lun Young
Represented By: Kathleen Jordan McMahon
Represented By: Matthew Butterick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPENAI, INC.
Represented By: Joseph Richard Wetzel
Represented By: Joseph Charles Gratz
Represented By: Andrew Michael Gass
Represented By: Allyson Roz Bennett
Represented By: Tiffany Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPENAI, L.P.
Represented By: Tiffany Cheung
Represented By: Andrew Michael Gass
Represented By: Joseph Charles Gratz
Represented By: Joseph Richard Wetzel
Represented By: Allyson Roz Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OpenAI OpCo, L.L.C.
Represented By: Andrew Michael Gass
Represented By: Allyson Roz Bennett
Represented By: Joseph Charles Gratz
Represented By: Joseph Richard Wetzel
Represented By: Tiffany Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPENAI GP, L.L.C.
Represented By: Joseph Richard Wetzel
Represented By: Allyson Roz Bennett
Represented By: Tiffany Cheung
Represented By: Andrew Michael Gass
Represented By: Joseph Charles Gratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPENAI STARTUP FUND GP I, L.L.C.
Represented By: Andrew Michael Gass
Represented By: Joseph Charles Gratz
Represented By: Joseph Richard Wetzel
Represented By: Allyson Roz Bennett
Represented By: Tiffany Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPENAI STARTUP FUND I, L.P.
Represented By: Joseph Richard Wetzel
Represented By: Allyson Roz Bennett
Represented By: Andrew Michael Gass
Represented By: Joseph Charles Gratz
Represented By: Tiffany Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPENAI STARTUP FUND MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Michael Gass
Represented By: Joseph Charles Gratz
Represented By: Joseph Richard Wetzel
Represented By: Allyson Roz Bennett
Represented By: Tiffany Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?