Healy v. Vella et al
Plaintiff: John Healy
Defendant: Malia Vella, James Oddie, John Knox White, Marilyn Ezzy Ashcraft, Andrew Thomas, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Office of Statewide Health Planning and Development, State of California, California Department of Social Services and City of Alameda
Interested Party: Alameda Point Collaborative, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv03302
Filed: July 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Alex G Tse
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal: Stipulation For Voluntary Dismissal Of Action (FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii)) by Alameda Point Collaborative, Inc., John Healy, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (Locke, R.) (Filed on 8/1/2023) Modified on 8/2/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants California Office of State Wide Health Planning and Development and California Department of Social Services by California Department of Social Services, Office of Statewide Health Planning and Development, State of California (Grainger, Katherine) (Filed on 7/25/2023)
July 25, 2023 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON REASSIGNMENT: Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2023. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 10/26/2023 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Parties may download Judge Alsup's standing orders from the Court's web page: https://cand.uscourts.gov/judges/alsup-william-wha/. (afm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 7/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 21, 2023 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. The Clerk will now reassign this case to a United States District Judge because one or more of the parties has requested reassignment to a United States District Judge or has not consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 21, 2023 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by Alameda Point Collaborative, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Lifelong Medical Care, Other Affiliate Alameda County Health Care Services, Other Affiliate Mercy Housing California, Other Affiliate EveryOne Home, Other Affiliate YIMBY Law, Other Affiliate East Bay Housing Organizations, Other Affiliate Senior Services Coalition of Alameda County, Other Affiliate https://www.alamedawellnesscampus.org/ for Alameda Point Collaborative, Inc.. (Locke, R.) (Filed on 7/21/2023)
July 21, 2023 #Electronic filing error. All interested entities listed must be included- the website was not listed, please refile and add the website. Re: #14 Certificate of Interested Entities, filed by Alameda Point Collaborative, Inc. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2023)
July 20, 2023 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by Alameda Point Collaborative, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Lifelong Medical Care, Other Affiliate Alameda County Health Care Services, Other Affiliate Mercy Housing California, Other Affiliate EveryOne Home, Other Affiliate YIMBY Law, Other Affiliate East Bay Housing Organizations, Other Affiliate Senior Services Coalition of Alameda County for Alameda Point Collaborative, Inc.. (Locke, R.) (Filed on 7/20/2023)
July 18, 2023 #Electronic filing error. Electronic filing error. Names of interested entities or person MUST be entered at the prompt. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: #12 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Alameda Point Collaborative, Inc. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2023)
July 17, 2023 Filing 13 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Alameda Point Collaborative, Inc. (Locke, R.) (Filed on 7/17/2023)
July 17, 2023 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by Alameda Point Collaborative, Inc. (Locke, R.) (Filed on 7/17/2023)
July 17, 2023 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Alameda Point Collaborative, Inc... (Locke, R.) (Filed on 7/17/2023)
July 17, 2023 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by City of Alameda.. (Sohagi, Robert) (Filed on 7/17/2023)
July 17, 2023 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by California Department of Social Services, Office of Statewide Health Planning and Development, State of California.. (Grainger, Katherine) (Filed on 7/17/2023)
July 7, 2023 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by California Department of Social Services, Office of Statewide Health Planning and Development, State of California, Malia Vella, James Oddie, John Knox White, Marilyn Ezzy Ashcraft, Andrew Thomas, City of Alameda, John Healy. (Grainger, Katherine) (Filed on 7/7/2023) Modified on 7/10/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2023 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by U.S. Department of Health and Human Services and John Healy. (Mehta, Sapna) (Filed on 7/6/2023) Modified on 7/7/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2023 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by U.S. Department of Health and Human Services re #4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #5 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (Mehta, Sapna) (Filed on 7/6/2023)
July 5, 2023 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by U.S. Department of Health and Human Services.. (Mehta, Sapna) (Filed on 7/5/2023)
July 5, 2023 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/29/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/6/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 3, 2023 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by U.S. Department of Health and Human Services re #1 Notice of Removal, (Mehta, Sapna) (Filed on 7/3/2023)
July 3, 2023 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/17/2023. (bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2023)
July 3, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG20072922. (Fee waived). Filed by U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mehta, Sapna) (Filed on 7/3/2023) Modified on 7/5/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Healy v. Vella et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malia Vella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Oddie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Knox White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Ezzy Ashcraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Sapna S. Mehta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Statewide Health Planning and Development, State of California
Represented By: Katherine Grainger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Social Services
Represented By: Katherine Grainger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Alameda
Represented By: Robert Tyson Sohagi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Alameda Point Collaborative, Inc.
Represented By: R. Christopher Locke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?