Silverman et al v. OpenAI, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Sarah Silverman, Christopher Golden and Richard Kadrey
Defendant: OPENAI, INC., OPENAI, L.P., OpenAI OpCo, L.L.C., OPENAI GP, L.L.C., OPENAI STARTUP FUND GP I, L.L.C., OPENAI STARTUP FUND I, L.P. and OPENAI STARTUP FUND MANAGEMENT, LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv03416
Filed: July 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Araceli Martinez-Olguin
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 504 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin granting #34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Allison L. Stillman. (ads, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2023)
August 30, 2023 Filing 34 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18592160.) Filing fee previously paid on 08/28/2023 filed by OpenAI GP, L.L.C., OpenAI OpCo, L.L.C., OpenAI Startup Fund GP I, L.L.C., OpenAI Startup Fund I, L.P., OpenAI Startup Fund Management, LLC, OpenAI, Inc., OpenAI, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Stillman, Allison) (Filed on 8/30/2023)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin granting #31 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Sarang Vijay Damle. (ads, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2023)
August 28, 2023 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss filed by OpenAI GP, L.L.C., OpenAI OpCo, L.L.C., OpenAI Startup Fund GP I, L.L.C., OpenAI Startup Fund I, L.P., OpenAI Startup Fund Management, LLC, OpenAI, Inc., OpenAI, L.P.. Motion Hearing set for 12/7/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin. Responses due by 9/27/2023. Replies due by 10/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gass, Andrew) (Filed on 8/28/2023)
August 28, 2023 Filing 31 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18592224.) filed by OpenAI GP, L.L.C., OpenAI OpCo, L.L.C., OpenAI Startup Fund GP I, L.L.C., OpenAI Startup Fund I, L.P., OpenAI Startup Fund Management, LLC, OpenAI, Inc., OpenAI, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Damle, Sarang) (Filed on 8/28/2023)
August 28, 2023 Filing 30 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18592160.) filed by OpenAI GP, L.L.C., OpenAI OpCo, L.L.C., OpenAI Startup Fund GP I, L.L.C., OpenAI Startup Fund I, L.P., OpenAI Startup Fund Management, LLC, OpenAI, Inc., OpenAI, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Stillman, Allison) (Filed on 8/28/2023)
August 10, 2023 Filing 29 Certificate of Interested Entities by Christopher Golden, Richard Kadrey, Sarah Silverman (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 8/10/2023)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin granting #22 Stipulation Regarding Defendants' Deadline to Respond to Complaints. Plaintiffs' oppositions due by 9/27/2023. Defendants' Replies due by 10/11/2023. Anticipated Motion(s) Hearing set for 12/7/2023 at 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin. (ads, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2023)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin for all further proceedings. Judge Trina L Thompson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 7/28/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2023)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER RELATING CASE. The Court has reviewed the motion and determined that Case No. 23-cv-3223 AMO is related to Case No. 23-cv-3416 TLT. Signed by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin on 7/28/2023. (ads, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2023) Modified on 7/28/2023 (ads, COURT STAFF).
July 24, 2023 Filing 25 CLERKS NOTICE - REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Trina L. Thompson upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Thompson's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/12/2023 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/5/2023. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/trina-l-thompson/General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rfm, COURT USER) (Filed on 7/24/2023)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Trina L Thompson for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Signed by The Clerk on 7/24/2023. (bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2023)
July 24, 2023 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2023)
July 21, 2023 Filing 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline to Respond to Complaints filed by Christopher Golden, Richard Kadrey, Sarah Silverman. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/21/2023)
July 21, 2023 Filing 21 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Christopher Golden, Richard Kadrey, Sarah Silverman.. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/21/2023)
July 21, 2023 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by OpenAI GP, L.L.C., OpenAI OpCo, L.L.C., OpenAI Startup Fund GP I, L.L.C., OpenAI Startup Fund I, L.P., OpenAI Startup Fund Management, LLC, OpenAI, Inc., OpenAI, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent OPENAI, INC. for OpenAI GP, L.L.C., OpenAI OpCo, L.L.C.; Corporate Parent OPENAI STARTUP FUND GP I, L.L.C., Other Affiliate Microsoft Corporation for OpenAI Startup Fund I, L.P.. (Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 7/21/2023)
July 21, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Richard Wetzel on Behalf of Defendants OpenAI, Inc.; OpenAI, L.P.; OpenAI OPCO, L.L.C.; OpenAI GP, L.L.C.; OpenAI Startup Fund GP I, L.L.C.; OpenAI Startup Fund I, L.P.; and OpenAI Startup Fund Management, L.L.C. (Wetzel, Joseph) (Filed on 7/21/2023)
July 21, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Michael Gass on Behalf of Defendants OpenAI, Inc.; OpenAI, L.P.; OpenAI OPCO, L.L.C.; OpenAI GP, L.L.C.; OpenAI Startup Fund GP I, L.L.C.; OpenAI Startup Fund I, L.P.; and OpenAI Startup Fund Management, L.L.C. (Gass, Andrew) (Filed on 7/21/2023)
July 21, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Allyson Roz Bennett (Bennett, Allyson) (Filed on 7/21/2023)
July 21, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany Cheung (Cheung, Tiffany) (Filed on 7/21/2023)
July 21, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Charles Gratz (Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 7/21/2023)
July 20, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Kadrey, Christopher Golden, Sarah Silverman. OpenAI Startup Fund I, L.P. served on 7/12/2023, answer due 8/2/2023. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/20/2023)
July 20, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Kadrey, Christopher Golden, Sarah Silverman. OpenAI Startup Fund GP I, L.L.C. served on 7/12/2023, answer due 8/2/2023. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/20/2023)
July 14, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Kadrey, Christopher Golden, Sarah Silverman. OpenAI Startup Fund Management, LLC served on 7/11/2023, answer due 8/1/2023. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/14/2023)
July 14, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Kadrey, Christopher Golden, Sarah Silverman. OpenAI OpCo, L.L.C. served on 7/11/2023, answer due 8/1/2023. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/14/2023)
July 14, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Kadrey, Christopher Golden, Sarah Silverman. OpenAI, L.P. served on 7/11/2023, answer due 8/1/2023. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/14/2023)
July 14, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Kadrey, Christopher Golden, Sarah Silverman. OpenAI, Inc. served on 7/11/2023, answer due 8/1/2023. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/14/2023)
July 14, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Kadrey, Christopher Golden, Sarah Silverman. OpenAI GP, L.L.C. served on 7/11/2023, answer due 8/1/2023. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/14/2023)
July 10, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to OpenAI GP, L.L.C., OpenAI OpCo, L.L.C., OpenAI Startup Fund GP I, L.L.C., OpenAI Startup Fund I, L.P., OpenAI Startup Fund Management, LLC, OpenAI, Inc., OpenAI, L.P.. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2023)
July 10, 2023 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding copyright (cc: form mailed to register). (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2023)
July 10, 2023 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/3/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/10/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2023)
July 10, 2023 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/24/2023. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2023)
July 7, 2023 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Copyrights (cc: form mailed to register). (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/7/2023)
July 7, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/7/2023)
July 7, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18431213.). Filed byRichard Kadrey, Christopher Golden, Sarah Silverman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/7/2023)
July 7, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18431213.). Filed byRichard Kadrey, Christopher Golden, Sarah Silverman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/7/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silverman et al v. OpenAI, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Silverman
Represented By: Joseph R. Saveri
Represented By: Kathleen Jordan McMahon
Represented By: Cadio R. Zirpoli
Represented By: Christopher Kar-Lun Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Golden
Represented By: Joseph R. Saveri
Represented By: Kathleen Jordan McMahon
Represented By: Cadio R. Zirpoli
Represented By: Christopher Kar-Lun Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Kadrey
Represented By: Joseph R. Saveri
Represented By: Cadio R. Zirpoli
Represented By: Christopher Kar-Lun Young
Represented By: Kathleen Jordan McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPENAI, INC.
Represented By: Allison L Stillman
Represented By: Allyson Roz Bennett
Represented By: Sarang Damle
Represented By: Tiffany Cheung
Represented By: Andrew Michael Gass
Represented By: Joseph Charles Gratz
Represented By: Joseph Richard Wetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPENAI, L.P.
Represented By: Andrew Michael Gass
Represented By: Allison L Stillman
Represented By: Joseph Charles Gratz
Represented By: Joseph Richard Wetzel
Represented By: Sarang Damle
Represented By: Tiffany Cheung
Represented By: Allyson Roz Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OpenAI OpCo, L.L.C.
Represented By: Sarang Damle
Represented By: Allyson Roz Bennett
Represented By: Andrew Michael Gass
Represented By: Joseph Charles Gratz
Represented By: Joseph Richard Wetzel
Represented By: Allison L Stillman
Represented By: Tiffany Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPENAI GP, L.L.C.
Represented By: Andrew Michael Gass
Represented By: Joseph Charles Gratz
Represented By: Sarang Damle
Represented By: Tiffany Cheung
Represented By: Joseph Richard Wetzel
Represented By: Allison L Stillman
Represented By: Allyson Roz Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPENAI STARTUP FUND GP I, L.L.C.
Represented By: Andrew Michael Gass
Represented By: Joseph Charles Gratz
Represented By: Joseph Richard Wetzel
Represented By: Allison L Stillman
Represented By: Allyson Roz Bennett
Represented By: Sarang Damle
Represented By: Tiffany Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPENAI STARTUP FUND I, L.P.
Represented By: Andrew Michael Gass
Represented By: Allison L Stillman
Represented By: Allyson Roz Bennett
Represented By: Sarang Damle
Represented By: Joseph Charles Gratz
Represented By: Joseph Richard Wetzel
Represented By: Tiffany Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPENAI STARTUP FUND MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By: Sarang Damle
Represented By: Tiffany Cheung
Represented By: Joseph Charles Gratz
Represented By: Allison L Stillman
Represented By: Allyson Roz Bennett
Represented By: Andrew Michael Gass
Represented By: Joseph Richard Wetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?