Kadrey et al v. Meta Platforms, Inc.
Plaintiff: Richard Kadrey, Sarah Silverman and Christopher Golden
Defendant: Meta Platforms, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv03417
Filed: July 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 504 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2023 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by Christopher Golden, Richard Kadrey, Sarah Silverman (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 8/10/2023)
August 8, 2023 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by Meta Platforms, Inc. (Ghajar, Bobby) (Filed on 8/8/2023)
August 8, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela Lucille Dunning (Dunning, Angela) (Filed on 8/8/2023)
August 8, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Bobby A. Ghajar (Ghajar, Bobby) (Filed on 8/8/2023)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. The #15 stipulation to move the defendant's deadline to respond to the complaint to September 18, 2023, is GRANTED. The parties are reminded that, per Local Rule 6-1, a stipulation to extend the deadline to respond to a complaint does not require a court order if the change will not alter any dates or deadlines already fixed by court order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2023)
August 2, 2023 Filing 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Deadline to Respond to Complaint filed by Christopher Golden, Richard Kadrey, Sarah Silverman. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 8/2/2023)
July 26, 2023 Filing 14 REQUEST to Exclude submitted by Cody Philpot. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2023)
July 25, 2023 Filing 13 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/13/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/20/2023 at 10:00 AM by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Friday, October 13, 2023, by no later than 12:00PM.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2023)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 07/24/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2023)
July 24, 2023 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2023)
July 21, 2023 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Christopher Golden, Richard Kadrey, Sarah Silverman.. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/21/2023)
July 20, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Kadrey, Christopher Golden, Sarah Silverman. Meta Platforms, Inc. served on 7/13/2023, answer due 8/3/2023. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/20/2023)
July 20, 2023 Filing 8 REQUEST to Exclude submitted by Jerzy Gruca. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2023)
July 19, 2023 Filing 7 REQUEST to Exclude submitted by Emanuel McCray. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2023)
July 12, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Meta Platforms, Inc. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2023)
July 12, 2023 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/9/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2023 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2023)
July 12, 2023 Copy of #3 Report emailed to copyright office. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2023)
July 10, 2023 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/24/2023. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2023)
July 7, 2023 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Copyrights Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/7/2023)
July 7, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/7/2023)
July 7, 2023 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; Demand for Jury Trial against Meta Platforms, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18431228.). Filed by Richard Kadrey, Christopher Golden, Sarah Silverman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/7/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kadrey et al v. Meta Platforms, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Kadrey
Represented By: Joseph R. Saveri
Represented By: Cadio R. Zirpoli
Represented By: Christopher Kar-Lun Young
Represented By: Kathleen Jordan McMahon
Represented By: Matthew Butterick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Silverman
Represented By: Joseph R. Saveri
Represented By: Cadio R. Zirpoli
Represented By: Christopher Kar-Lun Young
Represented By: Kathleen Jordan McMahon
Represented By: Matthew Butterick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Golden
Represented By: Joseph R. Saveri
Represented By: Cadio R. Zirpoli
Represented By: Christopher Kar-Lun Young
Represented By: Kathleen Jordan McMahon
Represented By: Matthew Butterick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meta Platforms, Inc.
Represented By: Angela Lucille Dunning
Represented By: Bobby A. Ghajar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?