Kamath v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: RESHMA KAMATH
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, San Francisco Police Department and Federal Protective Services
Case Number: 3:2023cv03531
Filed: July 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2023 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by Reshma Kamath (Kamath, Reshma) (Filed on 8/4/2023)
July 24, 2023 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 10/12/2023. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 10/19/2023 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than noon on 10/18/2023.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2023)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for all further proceedings. Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 7/24/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2023)
July 21, 2023 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2023)
July 21, 2023 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Reshma Kamath.. (Kamath, Reshma) (Filed on 7/21/2023)
July 21, 2023 Filing 9 Letter from PLAINTIFF . (Kamath, Reshma) (Filed on 7/21/2023)
July 21, 2023 #Electronic filing error. Summons will only be issued to the named defendants listed on the complaint. The correct case number is 4:23-cv-3531-DMR. Additionally, two summons should be prepared. One for San Francisco Police Department and the other for Federal Protective Services and United States Department of Homeland Security. [err201] This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety Re: #7 Proposed Summons filed by Reshma Kamath. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2023)
July 21, 2023 #Electronic filing error. Attached document is a Central District form and it is not completed. This Court's form can be located at www.cand.uscourts.gov. [err201] This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #8 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge filed by Reshma Kamath. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2023)
July 20, 2023 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Reshma Kamath.. (Kamath, Reshma) (Filed on 7/20/2023)
July 20, 2023 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Kamath, Reshma) (Filed on 7/20/2023)
July 18, 2023 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/11/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/18/2023 10:30 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2023)
July 17, 2023 Filing 5 Case assigned to Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/31/2023. (bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2023)
July 17, 2023 Filing 4 FEE PAID (Filing fee$402,receipt number ACANDC-18454987). (Kamath, Reshma) (Filed on 7/17/2023)
July 17, 2023 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Reshma Kamath AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Kamath, Reshma) (Filed on 7/17/2023)
July 17, 2023 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect Revision of Civil Cover Sheet used [err201]. Current Revision is JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 10/20). No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Please complete correct Civil Cover Sheet and e-file an Amended Civil Cover Sheet only. Event is located at: Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet. Re: #2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by RESHMA KAMATH (bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2023)
July 17, 2023 #Electronic filing error. Filing fee not paid. Please pay the filing fee through Pay.gov by clicking on Civil > Other Documents > New Case Filing Fee in CM/ECF. [err701] Re: #1 Complaint filed by Reshma Kamath (bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2023)
July 16, 2023 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by RESHMA KAMATH . (Kamath, Reshma) (Filed on 7/16/2023)
July 14, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. 42 U.S. Code 1983 - Civil action for deprivation of rights; 2. CONVERSION; 3. CIVIL ASSAULT (with jury demand) (no process) against All Defendants. Filed by Reshma Kamath. (Kamath, Reshma) (Filed on 7/14/2023) Modified on 7/18/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kamath v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RESHMA KAMATH
Represented By: Reshma Kamath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Protective Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?