Turner et al v. Argo Group et al
Plaintiff: Terrance Turner, I, Christopher Martinez and Terrance Turner
Defendant: Argo Group, Argo Global Assicurazioni S.P.A., USSOCOM and Argo Group Limited, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv03542
Filed: July 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Maxine M Chesney
Referring Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 8/29/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 28, 2023 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 28, 2023 Filing 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #13 Amended Complaint filed by Terrance Turner. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 8/28/2023. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 15, 2023 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT [THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT][RE-WORKED CLAIMS TO FEDERAL STATUTES] against Argo Global Assicurazioni S.P.A., Argo Group, Argo Group Limited, Inc.. Filed byTerrance Turner. (Turner, Terrance) (Filed on 8/15/2023)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SECOND SCREENING ORDER. Third Amended Complaint due 9/14/2023. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 8/15/2023. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 30, 2023 Filing 11 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT [SOMEHOW FORGOT CO-PLAINTIFF TESTIMONY SECTION] against Argo Global Assicurazioni S.P.A., Argo Group. Filed byTerrance Turner. (Turner, Terrance) (Filed on 7/30/2023) Modified on 7/31/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2023 Filing 10 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis [RESPONSE TO JUDGE'S ORDER] filed by Christopher Martinez. (Turner, Terrance) (Filed on 7/30/2023)
July 30, 2023 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT [RESPONSE TO JUDGE'S ORDER TO FILE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT] against Argo Global Assicurazioni S.P.A., Argo Group. Filed byTerrance Turner. (Turner, Terrance) (Filed on 7/30/2023)
July 30, 2023 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Terrance Turner.. (Turner, Terrance) (Filed on 7/30/2023)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Amended Pleadings due by 8/21/2023. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 20, 2023 Filing 6 Response [REGARDING PLAINTIFF AND CORPORATION REPRESENTATION], Response to Order to Show Cause [AFFIRMING JUDICIAL RESPONSE] by Terrance Turner. (Turner, Terrance) (Filed on 7/20/2023) Modified on 7/21/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SEEKING CLARIFICATION RE: NAMED PLAINTIFFS AND IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION. Response due by 8/3/2023. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 7/19/2023. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 18, 2023 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/12/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/19/2023 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 17, 2023 Filing 3 Notice Regarding Resources Available to Pro Se Litigants. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2023)
July 17, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Christopher Martinez. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2023)
July 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Argo Global Assicurazioni S.P.A., Argo Group, Christopher Martinez, USSOCOM. Filed by Terrance Turner, I. Consent/Declination due by 7/31/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner et al v. Argo Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Turner, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Argo Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Argo Global Assicurazioni S.P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USSOCOM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Argo Group Limited, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?