Castillo v. Prime Hydration LLC
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Castillo
Defendant: Prime Hydration LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv03885
Filed: August 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Referring Judge: Araceli Martinez-Olguin
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2023 Filing 30 Proposed Order re #28 First MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Prime Hydration LLCs Motion To Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint, #29 Request for Judicial Notice, [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant Prime Hydration LLCs Motion To Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint by Prime Hydration LLC. (Hamilton, Cindy) (Filed on 11/3/2023)
November 3, 2023 Filing 29 Request for Judicial Notice re #28 First MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Prime Hydration LLCs Motion To Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint Defendant Prime Hydration LLCs Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Motion To Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint filed byPrime Hydration LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #28 ) (Hamilton, Cindy) (Filed on 11/3/2023)
November 3, 2023 Filing 28 First MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Prime Hydration LLCs Motion To Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Prime Hydration LLC. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 2/22/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. Responses due by 11/17/2023. Replies due by 11/27/2023. (Hamilton, Cindy) (Filed on 11/3/2023)
October 19, 2023 Filing 27 STIPULATION re #26 Amended Complaint Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Response to Amended Complaint filed by Prime Hydration LLC. (Hamilton, Cindy) (Filed on 10/19/2023)
October 13, 2023 Filing 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Prime Hydration LLC. Filed byElizabeth Castillo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CLRA Declaration)(Kashima, Trenton) (Filed on 10/13/2023)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin granting #24 Stipulated Request for Order Enlarging Initial Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines. ADR Selection due by 11/28/2023. Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2023 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. (ads, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2023)
October 11, 2023 Filing 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Request for Order Enlarging Initial Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines; Proposed Order filed by Prime Hydration LLC. (Hamilton, Cindy) (Filed on 10/11/2023)
October 2, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert James Herrington (Herrington, Robert) (Filed on 10/2/2023)
October 2, 2023 Filing 22 Clerk's Notice Continuing Motion Hearing. Due to the Court's impacted calendar, the motion to dismiss hearing #17 is re-set to 2/22/2024 at 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin. The parties may be able to obtain an earlier hearing date by consenting to a magistrate judge using the form available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ads, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2023)
September 29, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Christopher Gee (Gee, Brian) (Filed on 9/29/2023)
September 29, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Cindy Hamilton (Hamilton, Cindy) (Filed on 9/29/2023)
September 29, 2023 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by Prime Hydration LLC identifying Corporate Parent Drink Prime Holding Company LLC for Prime Hydration LLC. (Hamilton, Cindy) (Filed on 9/29/2023)
September 29, 2023 Filing 18 Request for Judicial Notice re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Prime Hydration LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint Under 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities Defendant Prime Hydration LLC's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed byPrime Hydration LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #17 ) (Hamilton, Cindy) (Filed on 9/29/2023)
September 29, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Prime Hydration LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint Under 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Prime Hydration LLC. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 1/11/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. Responses due by 10/13/2023. Replies due by 10/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hamilton, Cindy) (Filed on 9/29/2023)
August 28, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elizabeth Castillo. Prime Hydration LLC served on 8/9/2023, answer due 8/30/2023. (Kashima, Trenton) (Filed on 8/28/2023)
August 21, 2023 Filing 15 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Response to Complaint filed by Prime Hydration LLC. (Hamilton, Cindy) (Filed on 8/21/2023)
August 9, 2023 Filing 14 Clerk's Notice Scheduling Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 10/26/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/2/2023 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
August 9, 2023 Filing 13 Case REASSIGNED to Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin for all further proceedings.. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan Van Keulen no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 8/9/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2023)
August 9, 2023 Filing 12 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #https://cand.uscourts.gov/notices/northern-district-extends-caseload-rebalancing-pilot-program/. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2023)
August 9, 2023 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND WILL BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2023)
August 9, 2023 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Elizabeth Castillo.. (Kashima, Trenton) (Filed on 8/9/2023)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Susan van Keulen granting #7 Application for Admission of Nick Suciu Pro Hac Vice. (svklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2023)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Susan van Keulen granting #6 Application for Admission of Erin Ruben Pro Hac Vice. (svklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2023)
August 4, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Nick Suciu III ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18513167.) filed by Elizabeth Castillo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Suciu, Nick) (Filed on 8/4/2023)
August 4, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Erin J. Ruben ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18513163.) filed by Elizabeth Castillo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standing)(Ruben, Erin) (Filed on 8/4/2023)
August 3, 2023 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/24/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2023 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (sec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2023)
August 3, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Prime Hydration LLC. (sec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2023)
August 2, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/16/2023. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2023)
August 2, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Kashima, Trenton) (Filed on 8/2/2023)
August 2, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Prime Hydration LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18509448.). Filed byElizabeth Castillo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kashima, Trenton) (Filed on 8/2/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castillo v. Prime Hydration LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Castillo
Represented By: Trenton Ross Kashima
Represented By: Erin Johnson Ruben
Represented By: Nick Suciu, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Hydration LLC
Represented By: Cindy Hamilton
Represented By: Brian Christopher Gee
Represented By: Robert James Herrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?