Lodato v. Becker et al
Plaintiff: Jane Lodato
Defendant: Gregory W. Becker, Daniel J. Beck, Joel P. Friedman and Does 1-10
Case Number: 3:2023cv04551
Filed: September 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Araceli Martinez-Olguin
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2023 Filing 30 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #27 MOTION to Remand ) filed byDaniel J. Beck, Gregory W. Becker, Joel P. Friedman. (Perla, Timothy) (Filed on 10/26/2023)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order Granting #28 Stipulation Extending Time for Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Rescheduling Initial Case Management Conference. Response to Motion to Remand due by 10/26/2023. Reply in support of Motion to Remand due by 11/6/2023. Case Management Statement due by 1/25/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/1/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. Signed by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin on October 18, 2023. (amolc1, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2023)
October 18, 2023 Filing 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time for Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Rescheduling Initial Case Management Conference filed by Joel P. Friedman, Daniel J. Beck, Gregory W. Becker, Jane Lodato. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Erika Schutzman in Support)(Schutzman, Erika) (Filed on 10/18/2023) Modified on 10/19/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2023 Filing 27 MOTION to Remand filed by Jane Lodato. Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin. Responses due by 10/19/2023. Replies due by 10/26/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Redenbarger, Tyson) (Filed on 10/5/2023)
September 20, 2023 Filing 26 Clerk's Notice Scheduling Case Management Conference. You are noticed that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Martinez-Olguin's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/martinez-olguin-araceli-amo/. Case Management Statement due by 1/11/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ads, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2023)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 09/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2023)
September 20, 2023 Filing 24 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2023)
September 20, 2023 Filing 23 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Daniel J. Beck.. (Windom, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/20/2023)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2023)
September 14, 2023 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 9/20/2023. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2023)
September 14, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Barry H. Berke ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18643262.) filed by Daniel J. Beck. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Berke, Barry) (Filed on 9/14/2023)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2023)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2023)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2023)
September 13, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18639114.) filed by Joel P. Friedman. (Schutzman, Erika) (Filed on 9/13/2023)
September 13, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18639088.) filed by Joel P. Friedman. (Perla, Timothy) (Filed on 9/13/2023)
September 13, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18639028.) filed by Joel P. Friedman. (Bongiorno, Michael) (Filed on 9/13/2023)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2023)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2023)
September 12, 2023 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint and Adjourning Case Deadlines filed by Joel P. Friedman. (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 9/12/2023)
September 11, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Jennifer S. Windom ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18632162.) filed by Daniel J. Beck. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Windom, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/11/2023)
September 11, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Daniel M. Ketani ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18632058.) filed by Daniel J. Beck. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Ketani, Daniel) (Filed on 9/11/2023)
September 11, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristopher Benjamin Kastens (Kastens, Kristopher) (Filed on 9/11/2023)
September 6, 2023 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joel P. Friedman (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 9/6/2023)
September 6, 2023 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/30/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/7/2023 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2023)
September 6, 2023 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/20/2023. (bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2023)
September 6, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly McCafferty (McCafferty, Molly) (Filed on 9/6/2023)
September 6, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander K. Talarides (Talarides, Alexander) (Filed on 9/6/2023)
September 6, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James Neil Kramer (Kramer, James) (Filed on 9/6/2023)
September 5, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California County of San Mateo. Their case number is 23-CIV-03579. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-18614801). Filed byJoel P. Friedman, Daniel J. Beck, Gregory W. Becker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 9/5/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lodato v. Becker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Lodato
Represented By: Elle D. Lewis
Represented By: Gia Jung
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Mark Cotton Molumphy
Represented By: Tyson Carl Redenbarger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory W. Becker
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Represented By: Molly McCafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel J. Beck
Represented By: Kristopher Benjamin Kastens
Represented By: Barry H. Berke
Represented By: Daniel Michael Ketani
Represented By: Jennifer S. Windom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel P. Friedman
Represented By: Michael A Mugmon
Represented By: Erika M. Schutzman
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Represented By: Timothy J. Perla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?