T. et al v. OpenAI LP et al
Plaintiff: A. T. and J. H.
Defendant: OpenAI LP, OpenAI Incorporated, OpenAI GP, OpenAI Startup Fund I, LP, OpenAI Startup Fund GP I, LLC, OpenAI Startup Fund Mangement, LLC and Microsoft Corporation
Case Number: 3:2023cv04557
Filed: September 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2023 Filing 34 STIPULATION To extend time for defendant's to respond to complaint filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Chaput, Isaac) (Filed on 9/29/2023) Modified on 10/2/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
September 29, 2023 Filing 33 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Microsoft Corporation (Chaput, Isaac) (Filed on 9/29/2023)
September 29, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Isaac Daniel Chaput (Chaput, Isaac) (Filed on 9/29/2023)
September 29, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Elizabeth Cahoy (Cahoy, Kathryn) (Filed on 9/29/2023)
September 29, 2023 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Johnson Henn (Henn, Emily) (Filed on 9/29/2023)
September 29, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Margaret Simonsen (Simonsen, Ashley) (Filed on 9/29/2023)
September 28, 2023 Filing 28 Certificate of Interested Entities by OpenAI Startup Fund Mangement, LLC and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 9/28/2023)
September 28, 2023 Filing 27 Certificate of Interested Entities by OpenAI Startup Fund GP I, LLC and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 9/28/2023)
September 28, 2023 Filing 26 Certificate of Interested Entities by OpenAI Startup Fund I, LP identifying Corporate Parent OpenAI Startup Fund GP I, LLC, Other Affiliate Microsoft Corporation for OpenAI Startup Fund I, LP. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 9/28/2023)
September 28, 2023 Filing 25 Certificate of Interested Entities by OpenAI GP identifying Corporate Parent OpenAI Inc. for OpenAI GP. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 9/28/2023)
September 28, 2023 Filing 24 Certificate of Interested Entities by OpenAI Incorporated and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 9/28/2023)
September 28, 2023 Filing 23 Certificate of Interested Entities by OpenAI LP identifying Corporate Parent OpenAI Global, LLC, Other Affiliate Microsoft Corporation for OpenAI LP. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 9/28/2023)
September 28, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Mayhugh (Mayhugh, Alexandra) (Filed on 9/28/2023)
September 28, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Nachiketa Baru (Baru, Nachiketa) (Filed on 9/28/2023)
September 28, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Barrett James Anderson (Anderson, Barrett) (Filed on 9/28/2023)
September 28, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Maximilian Sladek De La Cal (Sladek De La Cal, Maximilian) (Filed on 9/28/2023)
September 28, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Harrison Park (Park, Harrison) (Filed on 9/28/2023)
September 28, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Bethany Lobo (Lobo, Bethany) (Filed on 9/28/2023)
September 28, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Dean Brown (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 9/28/2023)
September 28, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Graham Rhodes (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 9/28/2023)
September 20, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J. H., A. T.. Microsoft Corporation served on 9/14/2023, answer due 10/5/2023. (Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 9/20/2023)
September 14, 2023 Filing 13 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/1/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/8/2023 at 10:00 AM by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Friday, December 1, 2023, by no later than 12:00PM.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2023)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 9/14/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2023)
September 14, 2023 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2023)
September 14, 2023 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by J. H., A.T.. (Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 9/14/2023) Modified on 9/15/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2023 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Microsoft Corporation, OpenAI GP, OpenAI Incorporated, OpenAI LP, OpenAI Startup Fund GP I, LLC, OpenAI Startup Fund I, LP, OpenAI Startup Fund Mangement, LLC. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2023)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order. Signed 9/7/2023 by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Ryan J. McGee for plaintiffs.(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2023)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order. Signed 9/7/2023 by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for John A. Yanchunis for plaintiffs.(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2023)
September 6, 2023 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/1/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/8/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom D, 15th Floor. (sec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2023)
September 6, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18617813.) filed by J. H., A. T.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(McGee, Ryan) (Filed on 9/6/2023)
September 6, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18617738.) filed by J. H., A. T.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 9/6/2023)
September 6, 2023 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Ram, Michael) (Filed on 9/6/2023)
September 6, 2023 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/20/2023. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2023)
September 5, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Microsoft Corporation, OpenAI GP, OpenAI Incorporated, OpenAI LP, OpenAI Startup Fund GP I, LLC, OpenAI Startup Fund I, LP, OpenAI Startup Fund Mangement, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18615816.). Filed byJ. H., A. T.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ram, Michael) (Filed on 9/5/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T. et al v. OpenAI LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. T.
Represented By: Michael Francis Ram
Represented By: John A. Yanchunis
Represented By: Ryan McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. H.
Represented By: Michael Francis Ram
Represented By: Ryan McGee
Represented By: John A. Yanchunis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OpenAI LP
Represented By: Harrison Park
Represented By: Matthew Dean Brown
Represented By: Maximilian Sladek De La Cal
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Alexandra Mayhugh
Represented By: Barrett James Anderson
Represented By: Bethany Lobo
Represented By: Nachiketa Baru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OpenAI Incorporated
Represented By: Bethany Lobo
Represented By: Harrison Park
Represented By: Matthew Dean Brown
Represented By: Maximilian Sladek De La Cal
Represented By: Nachiketa Baru
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Alexandra Mayhugh
Represented By: Barrett James Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OpenAI GP
Represented By: Alexandra Mayhugh
Represented By: Barrett James Anderson
Represented By: Bethany Lobo
Represented By: Harrison Park
Represented By: Matthew Dean Brown
Represented By: Maximilian Sladek De La Cal
Represented By: Nachiketa Baru
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OpenAI Startup Fund I, LP
Represented By: Harrison Park
Represented By: Matthew Dean Brown
Represented By: Maximilian Sladek De La Cal
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Alexandra Mayhugh
Represented By: Barrett James Anderson
Represented By: Bethany Lobo
Represented By: Nachiketa Baru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OpenAI Startup Fund GP I, LLC
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Alexandra Mayhugh
Represented By: Bethany Lobo
Represented By: Matthew Dean Brown
Represented By: Nachiketa Baru
Represented By: Maximilian Sladek De La Cal
Represented By: Barrett James Anderson
Represented By: Harrison Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OpenAI Startup Fund Mangement, LLC
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Alexandra Mayhugh
Represented By: Barrett James Anderson
Represented By: Bethany Lobo
Represented By: Harrison Park
Represented By: Matthew Dean Brown
Represented By: Maximilian Sladek De La Cal
Represented By: Nachiketa Baru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Kathryn Elizabeth Cahoy
Represented By: Ashley Margaret Simonsen
Represented By: Isaac Daniel Chaput
Represented By: Emily Johnson Henn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?