Golden Gate Village Resident Council v. County of Marin et al
Plaintiff: Golden Gate Village Resident Council
Defendant: County of Marin, Matthew Hymel, Marin County Pacific Associates, Pacific West Communities, Inc. and Affordable Housing Land Consultants, LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv04624
Filed: September 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2023 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants County of Marin and Matthew Hymel shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 11/14/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2023)
October 30, 2023 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by County of Marin, Matthew Hymel. (Halter, Brandon) (Filed on 10/30/2023)
October 27, 2023 Filing 15 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options on behalf of County of Marin and Mathew Hymel (Halter, Brandon) (Filed on 10/27/2023)
October 26, 2023 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Affordable Housing Land Consultants, LLC, Marin County Pacific Associates, Pacific West Communities, Inc... (Harris, Laura) (Filed on 10/26/2023)
October 18, 2023 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by Golden Gate Village Resident Council identifying Corporate Parent Golden Gate Village Resident Council for Golden Gate Village Resident Council. re #1 Complaint, (Haroff, Kevin) (Filed on 10/18/2023)
October 12, 2023 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants Marin County Pacific Associates, Pacific West Communities, Inc., & Affordable Housing Land Consultants, LLC shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 10/26/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2023)
October 11, 2023 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Pacific West Communities, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Cogency Global Inc., Other Affiliate TPC Holdings IX, LLC, Other Affiliate Central Valley Coalition for Affordable Housing for Pacific West Communities, Inc.. (Harris, Laura) (Filed on 10/11/2023)
October 11, 2023 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by Marin County Pacific Associates identifying Other Affiliate Cogency Global Inc., Other Affiliate TPC Holdings IX, LLC, Other Affiliate Central Valley Coalition for Affordable Housing for Marin County Pacific Associates. (Harris, Laura) (Filed on 10/11/2023)
October 11, 2023 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Affordable Housing Land Consultants, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Cogency Global Inc., Other Affiliate TPC Holdings IX, LLC, Other Affiliate Central Valley Coalition for Affordable Housing for Affordable Housing Land Consultants, LLC. (Harris, Laura) (Filed on 10/11/2023)
October 11, 2023 Filing 8 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief byAffordable Housing Land Consultants, LLC, Marin County Pacific Associates, Pacific West Communities, Inc.. (Harris, Laura) (Filed on 10/11/2023)
October 6, 2023 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #7 Certificate of Service filed by Golden Gate Village Resident Council (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2023)
October 5, 2023 Filing 7 ***INCORRECT EVENT*** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Golden Gate Village Resident Council (Haroff, Kevin) (Filed on 10/5/2023) Modified on 10/6/2023 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2023 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Golden Gate Village Resident Council.. (Haroff, Kevin) (Filed on 9/26/2023)
September 11, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Affordable Housing Land Consultants, LLC, County of Marin, Matthew Hymel, Marin County Pacific Associates, Pacific West Communities, Inc.. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2023)
September 11, 2023 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom D, 15th Floor. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2023)
September 11, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/25/2023. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2023)
September 8, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Haroff, Kevin) (Filed on 9/8/2023)
September 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18628113.). Filed byGolden Gate Village Resident Council. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Haroff, Kevin) (Filed on 9/8/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golden Gate Village Resident Council v. County of Marin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golden Gate Village Resident Council
Represented By: Kevin T. Haroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Marin
Represented By: Brandon William Halter
Represented By: Carolyn Ortler Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Hymel
Represented By: Brandon William Halter
Represented By: Carolyn Ortler Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marin County Pacific Associates
Represented By: Laura Marie Harris
Represented By: Howard Francis Wilkins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific West Communities, Inc.
Represented By: Howard Francis Wilkins, III
Represented By: Laura Marie Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affordable Housing Land Consultants, LLC
Represented By: Laura Marie Harris
Represented By: Howard Francis Wilkins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?