Poye-Perez v. Diaz et al
Plaintiff: Serguey Poye-Perez
Defendant: R Diaz, K Allison, R Davis, R. Broomfield, A. Pachynski, J Arnold, D. Borders, J Bink, Ralph Diaz, Kathaleen Allison, Ron Davis, Ronald Broomfield, J. Arnold, Dean Borders and Dr. Joseph Bick
Case Number: 3:2023cv04933
Filed: September 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
2 Judge: PSLC SJT
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of CDCR Report of E-Service Waiver Received. This document is restricted to court users only; no NEF has been issued, and the document is not available electronically. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 17, 2023 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by A. Pachynski, Kathaleen Allison, J. Arnold, Joseph Bick, Ralph Diaz, Dean Borders, Ron Davis, Ronald Broomfield. Service waived by A. Pachynski waiver sent on 11/16/2023, answer due 1/16/2024; Kathaleen Allison waiver sent on 11/16/2023, answer due 1/16/2024; J. Arnold waiver sent on 11/16/2023, answer due 1/16/2024; Joseph Bick waiver sent on 11/16/2023, answer due 1/16/2024; Ralph Diaz waiver sent on 11/16/2023, answer due 1/16/2024; Dean Borders waiver sent on 11/16/2023, answer due 1/16/2024; Ron Davis waiver sent on 11/16/2023, answer due 1/16/2024; Ronald Broomfield waiver sent on 11/16/2023, answer due 1/16/2024. (Goldstein, Chase) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 14, 2023 CDCR E-Service Waiver Form and related documents emailed pursuant to Order (doc. #11). (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2023)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/13/2023. Habeas Answer or Dispositive Motion due by 1/12/2024. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 13, 2023 Remark: ECF #11 mailed to Petitioner on 11/13/2023. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2023)
November 3, 2023 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Serguey Poye-Perez.. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2023)
October 3, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER of Reply; DEMAND for Jury Trial by K. Allison, J. Arnold, J. Bick, D. Borders, R. Broomfield, R. Davis, R. Diaz, A. Pachynski. (Goldstein, Chase) (Filed on 10/3/2023) Modified text on 10/4/2023 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 9/28/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 28, 2023 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 27, 2023 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by J. Arnold, A. Pachynski, J. Bick, R. Broomfield, K. Allison, R. Davis, D. Borders, R. Diaz.. (Goldstein, Chase) (Filed on 9/27/2023)
September 27, 2023 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/11/2023. (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 26, 2023 Filing 4 Request For Screening Under the Prison Litigation Reform Act. filed by K Allison, J Arnold, J Bink, D. Borders, R. Broomfield, R Davis, R Diaz, A. Pachynski. Responses due by 10/10/2023. Replies due by 10/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Chase) (Filed on 9/26/2023) Modified Text on 9/27/2023 (krp, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/10/2023. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2023)
September 26, 2023 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by K Allison, J Arnold, J Bink, D. Borders, R. Broomfield, R Davis, R Diaz, A. Pachynski . (Goldstein, Chase) (Filed on 9/26/2023)
September 26, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marin County Superior Court. Their case number is CV0000539. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-18680424). Filed byA. Pachynski, K Allison, J Arnold, J Bink, R Diaz, D. Borders, R Davis, R. Broomfield. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chase Goldstein)(Goldstein, Chase) (Filed on 9/26/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poye-Perez v. Diaz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Serguey Poye-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Diaz
Represented By: Chase Samuel Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Allison
Represented By: Chase Samuel Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Davis
Represented By: Chase Samuel Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Broomfield
Represented By: Chase Samuel Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Pachynski
Represented By: Chase Samuel Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Arnold
Represented By: Chase Samuel Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Borders
Represented By: Chase Samuel Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Bink
Represented By: Chase Samuel Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Diaz
Represented By: Chase Samuel Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathaleen Allison
Represented By: Chase Samuel Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Davis
Represented By: Chase Samuel Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Broomfield
Represented By: Chase Samuel Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Arnold
Represented By: Chase Samuel Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Borders
Represented By: Chase Samuel Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Joseph Bick
Represented By: Chase Samuel Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?