Center For Biological Diversity et al v. Regan
Plaintiff: Center For Biological Diversity, Sierra Club and Center for Environmental Health
Defendant: Michael S. Regan
Case Number: 3:2023cv04979
Filed: September 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Rita F Lin
Referring Judge: Alex G Tse
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 7604 Clear Air Act (Emission Standards)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Rita F. Lin on 12/6/2023. Case Management Statement due by 2/26/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/6/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-rita-f-rfl/General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2023)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER. The parties are directed to email a Word compatible copy of their stipulation and proposed order (Dkt. No. 20) to rflpo@cand.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Rita F. Lin on 12/6/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rfllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2023)
December 4, 2023 Filing 20 Proposed Order to Continue Case Management Conference and Case Management Deadlines by Michael S. Regan. (Martinez, Rachel) (Filed on 12/4/2023)
November 29, 2023 Filing 19 Case Reassigned to Judge Rita F. Lin. Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2023)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE.IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to the Honorable Rita F. Lin in the San Francisco Division for all further proceedings.1. All future filings shall bear the initials RFL immediately after the case number.2. All case management conference dates are vacated and will be reset by the Court.3. All hearing dates presently scheduled are VACATED. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. All pending motions (regardless of whether they are presently scheduled for hearing) must be RENOTICED for hearing before Judge Lin by the moving party for a date consistent with the Courts law and motion calendar, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule.4. Deadlines for ADR compliance and discovery cutoffs remain unchanged.5. All pretrial conference and trial dates currently set for after March 4, 2024, and all other deadlines associated with the case, will remain in place unless otherwise ordered.6. All pretrial conference and trial dates scheduled on or before March 4, 2024, are vacated. Other pretrial deadlines (eg., motions in limine, pretrial statements, proposed joint trial exhibits, etc.) will remain in place. The Court will notify the parties when a status conference will be held to schedule a new pretrial conference and trial dates for affected cases.7. Matters currently referred to a Magistrate Judge will remain before that Magistrate Judge absent further notice.8. Each party is expected to review and become familiar with all applicable standing orders and scheduling notes.9. On or before December 11, 2023, the parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement (separate statements are appropriate if either party is proceeding without counsel). The statement should not exceed ten pages in length and should address the following items in the following order: a. Date Filed: The date the case was filed; b. Parties: A list or description of each party; c. Claims: A summary of all claims, counter-claims, cross-claims, or third party claims; d. Facts: A brief chronology of the facts and a statement of the principal factual issues in dispute; e. Legal Issues: A brief statement, without extended legal argument, of the disputed points of law, including reference to specific statutes and decisions; f. Relief: A description of the relief sought and the damages claimed with an explanation as to how damages have been (or will be) computed; g. Discovery: The status of discovery, including any significant discovery management issues, as well as any limits or cutoff dates; h. Related Cases: The status, case name, and case number of any related cases or proceedings pending before another judge of this court, or before another court or administrative body; i. Procedural History: A procedural history of the case, including any previous motions that were decided or submitted, any ADR proceedings or settlement conferences that have been scheduled or concluded, any appellate proceedings that are pending or concluded, and any previous referral to a magistrate judge; j. Deadlines: A description of any other deadlines in place before reassignment, including those for ADR, dispositive motions, pretrial conferences, and trials; k. Any modification of deadlines: Any requested modification of these dates, and the reasons for the request; l. Consent to Magistrate: Whether the parties will consent to a magistrate judge for trial; and m. Emergency: Whether there exists an immediate need for a case management conference to be scheduled in the action, and why the parties believe such a need exists.10. The Joint Case Management Statement will not constitute a motion to extend or modify dates. If emergency relief is needed to modify a deadline, and the deadline is not of the type that can be modified via stipulation of the parties without a court order, the requesting party or parties shall additionally file a motion or stipulation for such relief in compliance with Local Rule 6.11. The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. Hearings and trials in any civil case assigned to a judge participating in the Pilot Project are eligible for video recording, upon request and with the consent of the parties and the presiding judge. Please see the #Northern Districts webpage about participation in the Pilot Project and # General Order 65 for more information. IT IS SO ORDERED.Dated: 11/27/2023FOR THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEEMark B. Busby, Clerk of Court (kab-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2023)
November 27, 2023 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE PROVIDING ZOOM ACCESS INFORMATION. Case Management Statement is due by 2/26/2024. Initial Case Management Conference is reset for 3/7/2024 at 1:30 p.m. by a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at JSCcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than noon on 3/6/2024.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2023)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #15 Stipulation to Enlarge Time for Defendant's Responsive Pleading and to Continue Case Management Conference and Associated ADR and Case Management Deadlines. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2023)
November 24, 2023 Filing 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Enlarge Time for Defendant's Responsive Pleading and to Continue Case Management Conference and Associated ADR and Case Management Deadlines filed by Michael S. Regan. (Martinez, Rachel) (Filed on 11/24/2023)
October 16, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Center For Biological Diversity, Center for Environmental Health, Sierra Club. Michael S. Regan served on 10/13/2023, answer due 12/12/2023. Proof of Service of Process (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Electronic certified mail receipts)(Evans, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/16/2023)
October 16, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Martinez Dorothy Martinez (Martinez, Rachel Martinez) (Filed on 10/16/2023)
October 12, 2023 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference is reset for 1/4/2024 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by a Zoom webinar. Joint statement is due by 12/28/2023.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at JSCcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than noon on 1/3/2024.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2023)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 10/12/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2023)
October 12, 2023 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2023)
October 12, 2023 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Center For Biological Diversity, Center for Environmental Health, Sierra Club.. (Maher, Ryan) (Filed on 10/12/2023)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting #7 Application. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2023)
October 4, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18706316.) filed by Center For Biological Diversity, Center for Environmental Health, Sierra Club. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Maher, Ryan) (Filed on 10/4/2023)
September 28, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Michael S. Regan.(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2023)
September 28, 2023 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/22/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/29/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2023)
September 28, 2023 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/12/2023. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2023)
September 28, 2023 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Center For Biological Diversity, Center for Environmental Health, Sierra Club (Evans, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/28/2023)
September 28, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Evans, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/28/2023)
September 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Michael S. Regan ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18687585.). Filed byCenter For Biological Diversity, Center for Environmental Health, Sierra Club. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Evans, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/28/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center For Biological Diversity et al v. Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center For Biological Diversity
Represented By: Jonathan Carter Evans
Represented By: Ryan Maher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Jonathan Carter Evans
Represented By: Ryan Maher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Environmental Health
Represented By: Jonathan Carter Evans
Represented By: Ryan Maher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael S. Regan
Represented By: Rachel Dorothy Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?