Attebury et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Ervel Attebury and Lutrecia Attebury
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Armstrong International Inc., Aurora Pump Company, Carrier Corporation, Crown Cork & Seal, Fireman's Fund Company and American Employers Insurance Company insurers of Associated Insulation of California, Inc., FMC Corporation, Individually and as successor in interest to Peerless Pump Company, General Electric Company, Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, Greene, Tweed & Co., Honeywell International Inc. fka Allied Signal Inc., Successor in Interest to the Bendix Corporation, IMO Industries, Inc., I.T.T. Industries, Inc., individually and as Successor to Bell & Gossett, Metalclad Insulation, Inc., Morse Tec LLC, f/k/a Borg Warner Morse Tech LLC, as Successor-by Merger to Borg-Warner Corporation, Nibco Inc., Paramount Globa f/k/a Viacom CBS Inc., f/k/a CBS Corporation, a Delaware corporation f/k/a Viacom Inc. successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Co, Redco Corporation, f/k/a Crane Co., Soco-West, Inc. f/k/a Brenntag West Inc. f/k/a Soco-Lynch Corporation, individually and as successor-in-interest to Western Chemical & Manufacturing Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corp., Warren Pumps LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. f/k/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc., Honeywell International Inc., Morse TEC LLC, Paramount Global, Redco Corporation, Soco-West, Inc., FMC Corporation, AlliedSignal Inc., Borg Warner Morse Tec LLC, ViacomCBS Inc., CBS Corporation, Viacom Inc., Successor by Merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania Corporation, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Crane Co., Brenntag West, Inc., Soco-Lynch Corporation, Goulds Pumps LLC and York International Corporation
Case Number: 3:2023cv05014
Filed: September 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2023 #Electronic filing error. ***NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Heather L. Weakley. Please update your personal profile on ECF and add your email address to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ECF shows SBN # with attorney's name as Heather Lynn Blume*** Re: #63 Notice of Appearance filed by Crown Cork & Seal (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2023)
November 8, 2023 Filing 65 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE: Counsel Heather Weakley is instructed to update their profile to reflect the correct name and information as listed in the Notice of Appearance. Counsel is also instructed to file a separate Notice of Appearance for their appearance. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2023)
November 8, 2023 Filing 64 CLERK'S NOTICE CORRECTING HEARING DATE: Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/29/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/5/2024 at 02:30 PM - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/si MANDATORY ZOOM REGISTRATION: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at sicrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 12/27/2023 at 2 pm.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 12/29/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/5/2024 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2023). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
November 8, 2023 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by William H. Armstrong and Heather L. Weakley (Armstrong, William) (Filed on 11/8/2023)
November 3, 2023 Filing 62 NOTICE by Ervel Attebury, Lutrecia Attebury re #61 Clerk's Notice,,,, Util - Teleconference Zoom,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Initial Case Management Guideline and Clerk's Notice on Reassignment)(Lewis, Stuart) (Filed on 11/3/2023)
October 30, 2023 Filing 61 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT GUIDELINE AND CLERK'S NOTICE ON REASSIGNMENT.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/si General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 12/29/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/5/2023 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2023)
October 30, 2023 Filing 60 Case Reassigned to Judge Susan Illston. Judge Vince Chhabria no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2023)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting (30) Motion to Relate Case in case 3:23-cv-05012-SI.Associated Cases: 3:23-cv-05012-SI, 3:23-cv-05014-VC(ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 23, 2023 #Electronic filing error. Document filed in wrong case. [err401]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: #58 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related must be filed in the lowest-numbered case. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2023)
October 20, 2023 Filing 58 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Glen R. Powell, #2 Proposed Order)(Powell, Glen) (Filed on 10/20/2023)
October 13, 2023 Filing 57 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Honeywell International Inc... (Rickenbacher, Lisa) (Filed on 10/13/2023)
October 13, 2023 Filing 56 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Morse TEC LLC.. (Hoye, Daniel) (Filed on 10/13/2023)
October 13, 2023 Filing 55 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Metalclad Insulation, Inc... (Hoye, Daniel) (Filed on 10/13/2023)
October 12, 2023 Filing 54 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company.. (Sandgren, Carmen) (Filed on 10/12/2023)
October 12, 2023 Filing 53 NOTICE by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company of Re-filing State Court Answer to Complaint (Sandgren, Carmen) (Filed on 10/12/2023)
October 12, 2023 Filing 52 Certificate of Interested Entities by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company (Sandgren, Carmen) (Filed on 10/12/2023)
October 12, 2023 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Carmen Dutton Sandgren (Sandgren, Carmen) (Filed on 10/12/2023)
October 11, 2023 Filing 50 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/5/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2024 at 10:00 AM by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Friday, January 5, 2024, by no later than 12:00PM.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2023)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 10/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2023)
October 11, 2023 Filing 48 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 47 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by York International Corporation.. (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 46 Certificate of Interested Entities by York International Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Johnson Controls International plc for York International Corporation. (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 45 Corporate Disclosure Statement by York International Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Johnson Controls International plc for York International Corporation. (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 44 ANSWER to Complaint byYork International Corporation. (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Duffy (Duffy, Joseph) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Jo Talarico (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 41 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Carrier Corporation.. (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 40 Certificate of Interested Entities by Carrier Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Carrier Global Corporation for Carrier Corporation. (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carrier Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Carrier Global Corporation for Carrier Corporation. (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 38 ANSWER to Complaint byCarrier Corporation. (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Duffy (Duffy, Joseph) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Jo Talarico (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 35 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by I.T.T. Industries, Inc., individually and as Successor to Bell & Gossett.. (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 34 Certificate of Interested Entities by I.T.T. Industries, Inc., individually and as Successor to Bell & Gossett identifying Corporate Parent InTelCo Management LLC, Other Affiliate Sapphire Topco, Inc. for I.T.T. Industries, Inc., individually and as Successor to Bell & Gossett. (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by I.T.T. Industries, Inc., individually and as Successor to Bell & Gossett identifying Corporate Parent InTelCo Management LLC, Other Affiliate Sapphire Topco, Inc. for I.T.T. Industries, Inc., individually and as Successor to Bell & Gossett. (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE by I.T.T. Industries, Inc., individually and as Successor to Bell & Gossett of Filing of State Court Answer to Complaint (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Duffy (Duffy, Joseph) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Jo Talarico (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 29 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Goulds Pumps LLC.. (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 28 Certificate of Interested Entities by Goulds Pumps LLC identifying Corporate Parent InTelCo Management LLC, Other Affiliate Sapphire Topco, Inc. for Goulds Pumps LLC. (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goulds Pumps LLC identifying Corporate Parent InTelCo Management LLC, Other Affiliate Sapphire Topco, Inc. for Goulds Pumps LLC. (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE by Goulds Pumps LLC of Filing of State Court Answer to Complaint (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Duffy (Duffy, Joseph) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Jo Talarico (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 6, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE by Metalclad Insulation, Inc. of Re-Filing State Court Answer to Complaint (Hoye, Daniel) (Filed on 10/6/2023)
October 6, 2023 Filing 22 Certificate of Interested Entities by Metalclad Insulation, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate ENTRX LLC (Holding Company), Other Affiliate Central National Insurance Company (ACE Group), Other Affiliate Industrial Underwriters (ACE Group), Other Affiliate Motor Vehicle Insurance Company (ACE Group), Other Affiliate Hartford Fire Insurance Company (Hartford Group), Other Affiliate Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company (Hartford Group), Other Affiliate First State Insurance Company (Hartford Group), Other Affiliate Continental Casualty Company (CNA Group), Other Affiliate Harbor Insurance Company (CNA Group), Other Affiliate Northbrook Insurance Company (Allstate), Other Affiliate Granite State Insurance Company (AIG Group), Other Affiliate National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA (AIG Group), Other Affiliate American Home Insurance Company (AIG Group), Other Affiliate American Motorist Insurance Company, in liquidation (Chubb Group), Other Affiliate Transport Case Insurance Company for Metalclad Insulation, Inc.. (Hoye, Daniel) (Filed on 10/6/2023)
October 6, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel B. Hoye and Lisa L. Oberg for Metalclad Insulation LLC (Hoye, Daniel) (Filed on 10/6/2023)
October 6, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Marie Rickenbacher (Rickenbacher, Lisa) (Filed on 10/6/2023)
October 6, 2023 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honeywell International Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Honeywell, The Bendix Corporation for Honeywell International Inc.. and Certification as to Interested Parties (Rickenbacher, Lisa) (Filed on 10/6/2023)
October 6, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE by Honeywell International Inc. of Re-Filing State Court Answer to Complaint (Rickenbacher, Lisa) (Filed on 10/6/2023)
October 6, 2023 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMorse TEC LLC. (Hoye, Daniel) (Filed on 10/6/2023)
October 6, 2023 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by Morse TEC LLC identifying Other Affiliate Enstar Holdings (US) LLC, a wholly-owned indirect subsidiary of Enstar Group Limited for Morse TEC LLC. (Hoye, Daniel) (Filed on 10/6/2023)
October 6, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel B. Hoye and Lisa L. Oberg (Hoye, Daniel) (Filed on 10/6/2023)
October 6, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Paige Gardiner on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Gardiner, Katherine) (Filed on 10/6/2023)
October 6, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles T. Sheldon on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Sheldon, Charles) (Filed on 10/6/2023)
October 6, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Joinder In In Greene, Tweed & Co.s Notice Of Removal Under 28 U.S.C. 1331, 1442(A)(1), And 1446 filed by General Electric Company. (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 10/6/2023)
October 6, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE by General Electric Company of Related Cases (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 10/6/2023)
October 6, 2023 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by General Electric Company identifying Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc. for General Electric Company. (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 10/6/2023)
October 6, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Johnson on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 10/6/2023)
October 6, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis Dennis Pond on behalf of Defendant FMC Corporation (Pond, Francis) (Filed on 10/6/2023)
October 5, 2023 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by FMC Corporation identifying Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group for FMC Corporation. and Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 and Local Rule 3-15 (Gittler, Marissa) (Filed on 10/5/2023)
October 5, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE by FMC Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, of Filing State Court Answer and Demand for Jury Trial (Gittler, Marissa) (Filed on 10/5/2023)
October 5, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Marissa Kacy Gittler on behalf of Defendant FMC Corporation (Gittler, Marissa) (Filed on 10/5/2023)
October 2, 2023 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/2/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/9/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2023)
October 2, 2023 Answer to Removal Complaint by FMC Corporation, General Electric Company, Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, Honeywell International Inc., Metalclad Insulation, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2023)
September 29, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE by Greene, Tweed & Co. re #1 Notice of Removal, Defendant Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement (Weiss, Lindsay) (Filed on 9/29/2023)
September 29, 2023 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/13/2023. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2023)
September 29, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda Superior Court. Their case number is 23CV041058. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-18693577). Filed byGreene, Tweed & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A iso Removal, #2 Exhibit B iso Removal, #3 Exhibit C iso Removal, #4 Exhibit D iso Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weiss, Lindsay) (Filed on 9/29/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Attebury et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ervel Attebury
Represented By: Anya Fuchs
Represented By: Stuart Barron Lewis
Represented By: Timothy F. Pearce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lutrecia Attebury
Represented By: Anya Fuchs
Represented By: Stuart Barron Lewis
Represented By: Timothy F. Pearce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Glen R. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal
Represented By: Heather Lynn Blume
Represented By: William H. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fireman's Fund Company and American Employers Insurance Company insurers of Associated Insulation of California, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation, Individually and as successor in interest to Peerless Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Charles T. Sheldon
Represented By: Derek S. Johnson
Represented By: Katherine Paige Gardiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company
Represented By: Carmen Dutton Sandgren
Represented By: Jennifer Anne Cormier
Represented By: Stephen Vincent Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene, Tweed & Co.
Represented By: Lindsay Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc. fka Allied Signal Inc., Successor in Interest to the Bendix Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.T.T. Industries, Inc., individually and as Successor to Bell & Gossett
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel B. Hoye
Represented By: Lisa Lurline Oberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morse Tec LLC, f/k/a Borg Warner Morse Tech LLC, as Successor-by Merger to Borg-Warner Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nibco Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Globa f/k/a Viacom CBS Inc., f/k/a CBS Corporation, a Delaware corporation f/k/a Viacom Inc. successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redco Corporation, f/k/a Crane Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soco-West, Inc. f/k/a Brenntag West Inc. f/k/a Soco-Lynch Corporation, individually and as successor-in-interest to Western Chemical & Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. f/k/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Michael Eric Sandgren
Represented By: Natalie Garcia Lashinsky
Represented By: Lisa Marie Rickenbacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morse TEC LLC
Represented By: Daniel B. Hoye
Represented By: Lisa Lurline Oberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Global
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redco Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soco-West, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Francis Dennis Pond
Represented By: Marissa Kacy Gittler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AlliedSignal Inc.
Represented By: Michael Eric Sandgren
Represented By: Natalie Garcia Lashinsky
Represented By: Lisa Marie Rickenbacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borg Warner Morse Tec LLC
Represented By: Daniel B. Hoye
Represented By: Lisa Lurline Oberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc., Successor by Merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag West, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soco-Lynch Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps LLC
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York International Corporation
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?