Adorno v. Uber Technologies Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: William Adorno
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc. and Raiser L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2023cv05101
Filed: October 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2023 Filing 20 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:23-cv-00875. Case file, copy of transfer order, and docket sheet received. Modified on 10/5/2023 (bar, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2023 MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 3084: District of Arizona, 2:23-cv-00875-DWL, Adorno v. Uber Technologies Incorporated et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:23-cv-05101-CRB pursuant to Transfer Order cc: JPMDL (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2023)
October 4, 2023 Filing 19 CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER Transferring Case to the Northern District of California Re MDL-3084. (MAP)
October 4, 2023 Remark: Case Transferred to the Northern District of California via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 31, 2023 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to #6 Preliminary Order, Unknown Parties (named as Does 1 through 50) terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the parties' stipulation (Doc. #16 ), which the Court construes as a motion to stay, is granted. This case is stayed pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's resolution of the July 14, 2023 motion to transfer. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall inform the Court within three days of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's resolution of the transfer motion. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 8/29/2023. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ)
August 25, 2023 Filing 16 STIPULATION Re: Extension of Time for Filing Rule 26(f) Joint Case Management Report by William Adorno. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brebner, Bartlet)
August 14, 2023 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Raiser LLC. (Rebholz, Jennifer)
August 14, 2023 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Uber Technologies Incorporated. (Rebholz, Jennifer)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 16(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court will issue a scheduling order after receiving the parties' Rule 26(f) report. After reviewing the Rule 26(f) report, the Court will set a case management conference if meeting with the parties appears necessary or helpful. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED as follows: The parties are directed to meet, confer, and develop a Rule 26(f) Joint Case Management Report, which must be filed no later than August 28, 2023 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 7/31/23. (MAW)
July 31, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Raiser LLC and Uber Technologies Incorporated. (MAW)
July 28, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Raiser LLC, Uber Technologies Incorporated.(Rebholz, Jennifer)
June 1, 2023 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by William Adorno: Declaration of Service re: Preliminary Order upon Rasier, L.L.C. on May 30, 2023. (Brebner, Bartlet)
June 1, 2023 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by William Adorno: Declaration of Service re: Preliminary Order upon Uber Technologies, Inc. on May 30, 2023. (Brebner, Bartlet)
May 30, 2023 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by William Adorno: Declaration of Service re: Summons / Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial upon Rasier, L.L.C. on May 24, 2023. (Brebner, Bartlet)
May 30, 2023 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by William Adorno: Declaration of Service re: Summons / Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial upon Uber Technologies, Inc. on May 24, 2023. (Brebner, Bartlet)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant(s) and file a notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on August 17, 2023, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 5/19/23. (MAW)
May 19, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by William Adorno. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c) - Documents shall be converted to PDF directly from a word processing program and per Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual must be text searchable. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAM)
May 19, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Raiser LLC, Uber Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(JAM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
May 18, 2023 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21924449. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-23-875-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM)
May 18, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by William Adorno. (Brebner, Bartlet) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(JAM)
May 18, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-21924449 filed by William Adorno. (Brebner, Bartlet) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adorno v. Uber Technologies Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Adorno
Represented By: Bartlet Brebner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Alexis Nicole Tinucci
Represented By: Jennifer Rebholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raiser L.L.C.
Represented By: Alexis Nicole Tinucci
Represented By: Jennifer Rebholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?