N.R. v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: N.R.
Defendant: Uber Technologies Inc. and Rasier LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv05104
Filed: October 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2023 Filing 30 Case transferred in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:23-cv-02603. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 5, 2023 Filing 29 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Case to be transferred to the Northern District of California for inclusion in MDL No. 3084. (dnb)
October 5, 2023 Civil Case Terminated. (dnb)
October 5, 2023 MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 3084: Northern District of Georgia, 1:23-cv-02603-VMC, N.R. v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:23-cv-05104-CRB pursuant to Transfer Order cc: JPMDL (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2023)
September 21, 2023 Filing 28 Request for Judicial NOTICE by Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re #27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Strike #23 Amended Complaint, (Norden, David) Modified to edit docket text on 9/27/2023 (dnb).
September 21, 2023 Filing 27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Strike #23 Amended Complaint, with Brief In Support by Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David F. Norden in Support, #2 Decl. Ex. A - 6-22-23 Order in the matter of In re Rideshare Cases - JCCP Case No. CJC-005188, #3 Decl. Ex. B - 8-6-21 Order in the matter of Estate of Stella Yeh v. Uber Techs., Inc., #4 Decl. Ex. C - 5-22-20 Order in the matter of Minzer v. Barga - N.Y. Super. Ct. N.Y. Cnty., #5 Decl. Ex. D - 8-9-21 Order in the matter of Rodriguez v. Uber Techs., Inc. - Fla. Cir. Ct. Osceola Cnty., #6 Decl. Ex. E - 11-9-22 Order in the matter of Jane Doe v. Uber Techs., Inc. - N.Y. Super. Ct. Erie Cnty., #7 Decl. Ex. F - 11-30-20 Order in the matter of Jane Doe No. 1 v. Uber Techs., Inc. - Cal. Super. Ct. L.A. Cnty., #8 Decl. Ex. G - 12-7-21 Order in the matter of Lopez v. Uber Techs., Inc. - Cal. Super. Ct. Santa Clara Cnty., #9 Decl. Ex. H - 5-13-21 Order in the matter of Polanco v. Lyft, Inc. - Cal. Super. Ct. Orange Cnty., #10 Decl. Ex. I - 4-14-21 Order in the matter of Toral v. Bazzi - Cal. Super. Ct. L.A. Cnty., #11 Decl. Ex. J - 3-10-23 Order in the matter of Jacobs v. Meta Platforms, Inc. - Cal. Super. Ct. Alameda Cnty., #12 Decl. Ex. K - 9-27-22 Order in the matter of Luna v. Uber Techs., Inc. - Cal. Super. Ct. L.A. Cnty., #13 Decl. Ex. L - 4-7-22 Order in the matter of Shannon v. Uber Techs., Inc. - Cal. Super. Ct. L.A. Cnty., #14 Decl. Ex. M - 3-9-22 Order in the matter of Baumgartner v. Uber Techs., Inc. - Wash. Super. Ct. King Cnty., #15 Decl. Ex. N - 6-14-21 Order in the matter of Garcia v. Peninsula Intl, Inc. - Cal. Super. Ct. San Mateo Cnty., #16 Decl. Ex. O - 7-20-20 Tent. Ruling; 7-21-20 Final Order in the matter of Jane Doe v. Uber Techs., Inc., #17 Decl. Ex. P - 10-22-21 Order in the matter of Burmakova v. Uber Techs., Inc. - Cal. Super. Ct. L.A. Cnty., #18 Decl. Ex. Q - 1-29-21 Order in the matter of Jane Doe v. Uber Techs., Inc. - Cal. Super. Ct. L.A. Cnty., #19 Decl. Ex. R - 10-25-18 Order in the matter of Flynn v. Bagumyan, - Cal. Super. Ct. L.A. Cnty., #20 Decl. Ex. S - 3-18-21 Order in the matter of Cho v. McEwan - Cal. Super. Ct. L.A. Cnty., #21 Decl. Ex. T - 4-21-21 Order in the matter of Echevarria v. Uber Techs., Inc. - Fla. Cir. Ct. Miami-Dade Cnty., #22 Decl. Ex. U - 3-11-21 Order in the matter of Owens v. Uber Techs., Inc. - Pa. Ct. C.P. Berks Cnty, #23 Decl. Ex. V - 6-12-20 Order in the matter of Coughlin v. Uber Techs., Inc. - Pa. Ct. C.P. Philadelphia Cnty., #24 Decl. Ex. W - 2-14-23 Order in the matter of Robinson v. Uber USA, LLC - S.C. Ct. C.P. Richmond Cnty., #25 Decl. Ex. X - 6-1-23 Order in the matter of Ramos v. Uber Techs., Inc. - Cal. Super. Ct. L.A. Cnty., #26 Decl. Ex. Y - 3-22-22 Order in the matter of Flores v. Uber Techs., Inc. - Cal. Super. Ct. L.A. Cnty., #27 Decl. Ex. Z - 3-8-22 Order in the matter of Norman v. Uber Techs., Inc. - Cal. Super. Ct. L.A. Cnty.)(Norden, David)
September 21, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE by Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. of Withdrawal of Original Motion to Dismiss (Norden, David)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time For Defendants to Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. The deadline is extended up through and including September 21, 2023. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 9/12/2023. (dnb)
September 12, 2023 Filing 24 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time For Defendants to Move or Otherwise Respond re: #23 Amended Complaint, by Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Norden, David)
September 6, 2023 Submission of #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to District Judge Victoria M. Calvert. (vs)
August 31, 2023 Filing 23 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by N.R..(Tate, Andrew) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER. The Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file a Second Amended Complaint within 7 days of the date of entry of this Order properly alleging the Courts subject matter jurisdiction. The Parties are DIRECTED to confer as set forth in this Order. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond shall run from the date Plaintiff files a Second Amended Complaint pursuant to this Order. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 8/30/2023. (dnb)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STANDING ORDER:GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL IN CASES PROCEEDING BEFORETHE HONORABLE VICTORIA M. CALVERT. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 8/30/23. (vs)
August 30, 2023 Filing 20 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by N.R..(Tate, Andrew) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 15, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Dominyka Plukaite on behalf of Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. (Plukaite, Dominyka)
August 15, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by David F. Norden on behalf of Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. (Norden, David)
August 15, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles E. Peeler on behalf of Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. (Peeler, Charles)
August 10, 2023 Filing 16 Request for Judicial NOTICE by Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Uber Defs' Proposed Order re Mtn to Dismiss.pdf)(Carter, Kirk) Modified on 8/14/2023 (dnb).
August 10, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration Of Kirk A. Carter In Support Of Uber Technologies Inc. And Raiser Llcs Motion To Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - 6-22-23 Order in the matter of In re Rideshare Cases - JCCP Case No. CJC-005188, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - 8-6-21 Order in the matter of Estate of Stella Yeh v. Uber Techs., Inc., #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - 5-22-20 Order in the matter of Minzer v. Barga - N.Y. Super. Ct. N.Y. Cnty., #5 Exhibit Exhibit D - 8-9-21 Order in the matter of Rodriguez v. Uber Techs., Inc. - Fla. Cir. Ct. Osceola Cnty., #6 Exhibit Exhibit E - 11-9-22 Order in the matter of Jane Doe v. Uber Techs., Inc. - N.Y. Super. Ct. Erie Cnty., #7 Exhibit Exhibit F - 11-30-20 Order in the matter of Jane Doe No. 1 v. Uber Techs., Inc. - Cal. Super. Ct. L.A. Cnty., #8 Exhibit Exhibit G - 12-7-21 Order in the matter of Lopez v. Uber Techs., Inc. - Cal. Super. Ct. Santa Clara Cnty., #9 Exhibit Exhibit H - 5-13-21 Order in the matter of Polanco v. Lyft, Inc. - Cal. Super. Ct. Orange Cnty., #10 Exhibit Exhibit I - 4-14-21 Order in the matter of Toral v. Bazzi - Cal. Super. Ct. L.A. Cnty. Apr. 14, 2021., #11 Exhibit Exhibit J - 3-10-23 Order in the matter of Jacobs v. Meta Platforms, Inc. - Cal. Super. Ct. Alameda Cnty., #12 Exhibit Exhibit K - 9-27-22 Order in the matter of Luna v. Uber Techs., Inc. - Cal. Super. Ct. L.A. Cnty., #13 Exhibit Exhibit L - 4-7-22 Order in the matter of Shannon v. Uber Techs., Inc. - Cal. Super. Ct. L.A. Cnty., #14 Exhibit Exhibit M - 3-9-22 Order in the matter of Baumgartner v. Uber Techs., Inc. - Wash. Super. Ct. King Cnty., #15 Exhibit Exhibit N - 6-14-21 Order in the matter of Garcia v. Peninsula Intl, Inc. - Cal. Super. Ct. San Mateo Cnty., #16 Exhibit Exhibit O - July 7-20-21 Tent. Ruling & 7-21-20 Final Order in the matter of Jane Doe v. Uber Techs., Inc., #17 Exhibit Exhibit P - 10-22-21 Order in the matter of Burmakova v. Uber Techs., Inc. - Cal. Super. Ct. L.A. Cnty., #18 Exhibit Exhibit Q - 1-29-21 Order in the matter of Jane Doe v. Uber Techs., Inc. - Cal. Super. Ct. L.A. Cnty., #19 Exhibit Exhibit R - 10-25-18 Order in the matter of Flynn v. Bagumyan, - Cal. Super. Ct. L.A. Cnty., #20 Exhibit Exhibit S - 3-18-21 Order in the matter of Cho v. McEwan - Cal. Super. Ct. L.A. Cnty., #21 Exhibit Exhibit T - 4-21-21 Order in the matter of Echevarria v. Uber Techs., Inc. - Fla. Cir. Ct. Miami-Dade Cnty., #22 Exhibit Exhibit U - 3-11-21 Order in the matter of Owens v. Uber Techs., Inc. - Pa. Ct. C.P. Berks Cnty., #23 Exhibit Exhibit V - 6-12-20 Order in the matter of Coughlin v. Uber Techs., Inc. - Pa. Ct. C.P. Philadelphia Cnty., #24 Exhibit Exhibit W - 2-14-23 Order in the matter of Robinson v. Uber USA, LLC - S.C. Ct. C.P. Richmond Cnty., #25 Exhibit Exhibit X - 6-1-23 Order in the matter of Ramos v. Uber Techs., Inc. - Cal. Super. Ct. L.A. Cnty., #26 Exhibit Exhibit Y - 3-22-22 Order in the matter of Flores v. Uber Techs., Inc. - Cal. Super. Ct. L.A. Cnty., #27 Exhibit Exhibit Z - 3-8-22 Order in the matter of Norman v. Uber Techs., Inc. - Cal. Super. Ct. L.A. Cnty.)(Carter, Kirk)
July 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting Defendants' #13 Motion for Extension of Time to 8/10/2023 to respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 7/3/2023. (bgt)
June 30, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer #1 Complaint by Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Extension, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Kirk) Modified on 7/1/2023 (lwb).
June 30, 2023 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Carter, Kirk)
June 30, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirk Andrew Carter on behalf of Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. (Carter, Kirk)
June 20, 2023 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by N.R.. Rasier, LLC served on 6/14/2023, answer due 7/5/2023. (Tate, Andrew)
June 20, 2023 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by N.R.. Uber Technologies, Inc. served on 6/14/2023, answer due 7/5/2023. (Tate, Andrew)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Protective Order. Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed in this action anonymously, under the pseudonym initials "N.R.," and all filed materials, judgments, and any other documents relating to this action shall refer to Plaintiff solely as "N.R.," without additional identifying information. Plaintiff is directed to promptly serve a copy of this Order upon counsel for Defendants, if known, or upon Defendants, by email or mail service, and file a certificate of service. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 6/20/2023. (tas)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rachel Beth Adams. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on June 20, 2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lwb)
June 20, 2023 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Attorney Rachel Beth Abrams re #7 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (lwb)
June 19, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Rachel B. Abrams Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12674075). Attorney Rachel Beth Abrams added appearing on behalf of N.R.. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (rvb)
June 14, 2023 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Rachel B. Abrams Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12674075).by N.R.. (Tate, Andrew) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
June 12, 2023 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by N.R.. (Tate, Andrew)
June 12, 2023 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Uber Technologies, Inc. (ane)
June 12, 2023 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Rasier, LLC. (ane)
June 9, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Protective Order and Leave to Proceed Anonymously by N.R. (ane)
June 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by N.R. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12665055) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ane) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: N.R. v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.R.
Represented By: Andrew Ready Tate
Represented By: Grace Arden Hancock
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies Inc.
Represented By: Charles E. Peeler
Represented By: David F. Norden
Represented By: Kirk Andrew Carter
Represented By: Dominyka Plukaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rasier LLC
Represented By: Charles E. Peeler
Represented By: Dominyka Plukaite
Represented By: Kirk Andrew Carter
Represented By: David F. Norden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?