Cowsert v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kelly Cowsert
Defendant: Uber Technologies Inc., Rasier LLC and Does 1-50 Inclusive
Case Number: 3:2023cv05110
Filed: October 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2023 Filing 26 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Western; Case Number 2:23-cv-04133. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 5, 2023 MEMBER CASE OPENED re MDL 3084: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Missouri (Jefferson City), 2:23-cv-04133-BP, Kelly Cowsert v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:23-cv-05110-CRB pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order. cc: JPMDL (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2023)
October 4, 2023 Filing 25 MDL TRANSFER ORDER, from Karen K. Caldwell, Chair, transferring case to Northern District of California to be included in MDL No. 3084. Signed on 10/3/23. Case electronically transferred. (Moore, Terri)
September 22, 2023 Filing 24 DESIGNATION OF NEUTRAL naming George W. Quatman(Holland, Eric)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 The Joint Motion for Extension of Time for the Parties to make Rule 26 Initial Disclosures is GRANTED, up to and including October 23, 2023.. Signed on 9/22/23 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cordell, Annette)
September 22, 2023 Filing 22 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER and Discovery Plan by Kelly Cowsert. (Holland, Eric)
September 22, 2023 Filing 21 Joint MOTION for extension of time for the Parties to Make Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by Eric D. Holland on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/6/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Holland, Eric)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 motion for extension of time to file response/reply as to #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/16/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. Signed on 9/13/2023 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wolfe, Steve)
September 13, 2023 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, #17 Suggestions in Support of Motion,,, #18 Suggestions in Support of Motion, #16 Suggestions in Support of Motion, filed by Eric D. Holland on behalf of Kelly Cowsert. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/27/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #15 , #17 , #18 , #16 ) (Holland, Eric)
September 5, 2023 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 09/01/2023 as Document No. 15-1, Proposed Order. The proposed order attached to the motion has been deleted. Per Administrative Procedures any proposed orders are to be emailed to the Courtroom Deputy in Word format. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Lock, Tania)
September 1, 2023 Filing 18 SUGGESTIONS in support re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Clayton J. Callen on behalf of Defendants Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) #15 ) (Callen, Clayton)
September 1, 2023 Filing 17 SUGGESTIONS in support re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Declaration of Clayton J. Callen in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Clayton J. Callen on behalf of Defendants Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #15 ) (Callen, Clayton)
September 1, 2023 Filing 16 SUGGESTIONS in support re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Clayton J. Callen on behalf of Defendants Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) #15 ) (Callen, Clayton)
September 1, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Clayton J. Callen on behalf of Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/15/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order-This document has been deleted. )(Callen, Clayton) Modified on 9/5/2023 (Lock, Tania).
August 2, 2023 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/22/2023. Rule 26 conference due by 9/8/2023. Signed on 8/1/23 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Defendants Uber Technologies, Inc. and Raiser, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Respond, or Otherwise Plead as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is GRANTED, up to and including September 1, 2023. Signed on 7/31/23 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cordell, Annette)
July 31, 2023 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Clayton J. Callen on behalf of Defendants Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc..(Callen, Clayton)
July 31, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for extension of time to file answer Unopposed filed by Clayton J. Callen on behalf of Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/14/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Clayton J. Callen added to party Rasier, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Clayton J. Callen added to party Uber Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft))(Callen, Clayton)
July 13, 2023 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Kelly Cowsert. Rasier, LLC served on 7/12/2023, answer due 8/2/2023. (Holland, Eric)
July 13, 2023 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Kelly Cowsert. Uber Technologies, Inc. served on 7/12/2023, answer due 8/2/2023. (Holland, Eric)
July 12, 2023 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. filed by Eric D. Holland on behalf of Kelly Cowsert.(Holland, Eric)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. Within fourteen days, Plaintiff shall either file an Amended Complaint or show cause why the case should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Signed on 7/11/23 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Eric D. Holland for Kelly Cowsert allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
July 10, 2023 Filing 5 Motion to allow Eric D. Holland to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8528203) filed by Carl Kessinger on behalf of Kelly Cowsert. (Kessinger, Carl)
July 10, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by Carl Kessinger on behalf of Kelly Cowsert (Attorney Carl Kessinger added to party Kelly Cowsert(pty:pla))(Kessinger, Carl)
July 10, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Berner, Crystal)
July 10, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Eric D. Holland on behalf of Kelly Cowsert (Holland, Eric)
July 10, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. filed by Eric D. Holland on behalf of Kelly Cowsert. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-8527847. Service due by 10/10/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Summons for Uber, # 3 Exhibit Summons for Raiser)(Holland, Eric) Modified on 7/10/2023 and counsel contacted to resubmit summons accordingly. (Berner, Crystal).
July 10, 2023 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rasier, LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc. Summons directed to plaintiff for service. (Warren, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cowsert v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Cowsert
Represented By: Carl Kessinger
Represented By: Eric D. Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies Inc.
Represented By: Clayton J. Callen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rasier LLC
Represented By: Clayton J. Callen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?