S.W. v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: S. W.
Defendant: Uber Technologies Inc. and Raiser L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2023cv05111
Filed: October 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting motions for leave to proceed anonymously. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/22/2023. Associated Cases: See Order. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 25 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Eastern; Case Number 5:23-cv-00317. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 5, 2023 MEMBER CASE OPENED: North Carolina Eastern, 5:23-cv-00317, S.W. v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:23-cv-05111-CRB pursuant to Per Transfer Order cc: JPMDL (exl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2023)
October 4, 2023 Filing 24 TRANSFER ORDER - This case is transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of California and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Karen K. Caldwell, Chair of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Mann, Stephanie)
September 27, 2023 Filing 23 Memorandum in Support regarding #22 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Raiser, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (King, C.)
September 27, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Raiser, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (King, C.)
September 15, 2023 TEXT ORDER granting the Consent Motion for Extension of Time #21 filed by Defendants Uber Technologies, inc. and Raiser, LLC. For good cause shown, it is ordered that these defendants have up to and including September 27, 2023, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint #20 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/15/2023. (Hockaday, A.)
September 15, 2023 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #20 Amended Complaint. (Mann, Stephanie)
September 13, 2023 Filing 21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #20 Amended Complaint filed by Raiser, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Proposed Order) (King, C.)
September 6, 2023 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by S. W.. (Abrams, Rachel)
August 18, 2023 Filing 19 Memorandum in Support regarding #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Raiser, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (King, C.)
August 18, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Raiser, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (King, C.)
August 17, 2023 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance filed by Hanna E. Eickmeier on behalf of Raiser, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Eickmeier, Hanna)
August 11, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion for Transfer of Actions to the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings. (Abrams, Rachel)
July 13, 2023 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Mann, Stephanie)
July 13, 2023 TEXT ORDER granting the Consent Motion for Extension of Time #15 filed by Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc., and Raiser, LLC. For good cause shown, it is ordered that these defendants have up to and including August 18, 2023, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/13/2023. (Hockaday, A.)
July 12, 2023 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, filed by Raiser, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order) (King, C.)
July 12, 2023 Filing 14 Financial Disclosure Statement by Raiser, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Uber Technologies, Inc. for Raiser, LLC. (King, C.)
July 12, 2023 Filing 13 Financial Disclosure Statement by Uber Technologies, Inc. (King, C.)
July 12, 2023 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance filed by C. Bailey King, Jr on behalf of Raiser, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (King, C.)
July 11, 2023 Filing 11 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Rachel Beth Abrams on behalf of S. W.. (Abrams, Rachel)
July 11, 2023 Notice to Counsel regarding: #2 Notice of Special Appearance. All counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). Each attorney must file his or her own notice of appearance. The CM/ECF electronic filing and docketing system does not recognize filings made on behalf of other attorneys for purposes of appearing on the court's docket. The appropriate form for becoming a registered e-filer in this district is available to out of district counsel on this court's website www.nced.uscourts.gov. Out of district counsel should use the event Notice of Special Appearance. (Mann, Stephanie)
July 10, 2023 Filing 10 Affidavit of Service for Complaint filed by S. W. served on Uber Technologies, Inc., a Delaware Corporation on 6/23/2023. (Katen, Samantha)
July 10, 2023 Filing 9 Affidavit of Service for Complaint filed by S. W. served on Rasier, LLC, a Liability on 6/23/2023. (Katen, Samantha)
July 6, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission and Affidavit for Rachel B. Abrams filed by S. W.. (Katen, Samantha)
July 5, 2023 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, #www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Mann, Stephanie)
June 15, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Raiser, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. (Mann, Stephanie)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Redesignating Division - At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is redesignated as a Western Division case. The Honorable James C. Dever III, United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future filings should reflect the new case number of 5:23-CV-317-D-BM. No further filing shall be made in 4:23-CV-96-D-BM. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 6/15/2023. (Mann, Stephanie)
June 15, 2023 Case transferred in from Eastern Division on 06/15/2023. Case Number 4:23-cv-96-D-BM. (Mann, Stephanie)
June 15, 2023 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #3 MOTION for Protective Order and Leave to Proceed Anonymously; Memorandum of Law in Support. (Mann, Stephanie)
June 14, 2023 Filing 5 Notice filed by S. W. [Proposed[ Summons Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Katen, Samantha)
June 14, 2023 Notice to Counsel - This case should have been filed in the Western division. The Clerk will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Rudd, D.)
June 14, 2023 Notice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed for defendant Uber Technologies, Inc. (Rudd, D.)
June 9, 2023 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by S. W. (Katen, Samantha)
June 9, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Protective Order and Leave to Proceed Anonymously; Memorandum of Law in Support filed by S. W.. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order) (Katen, Samantha)
June 9, 2023 Filing 2 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Samantha Katen on behalf of S. W.. (Katen, Samantha)
June 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Raiser, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., A Delaware Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCEDC-7129790.), filed by S. W.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Katen, Samantha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S.W. v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. W.
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Represented By: Samantha Katen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies Inc.
Represented By: C. Bailey King, Jr.
Represented By: Hanna E. Eickmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raiser L.L.C.
Represented By: Hanna E. Eickmeier
Represented By: C. Bailey King, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?