Cressy et al v. California Department of Transportation et al
Plaintiff: William Floyd Cressy, Francisco Yanez, Nathan Delgado, Christine Van Skike, Fabiola Serrano-Gutierrez, Sabrina Lee Gulbey-Spurgeon and Edward Ballard
Defendant: California Department of Transportation, Tony Tavares, County of Sonoma, Maria Christina Rivera, City of Santa Rosa and City Manager Maraskeshia Smith
Case Number: 3:2023cv05201
Filed: October 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2023 Filing 50 MOTION to Dismiss filed by California Department of Transportation, Tony Tavares. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 1/3/2024 02:00 PM. Responses due by 12/13/2023. Replies due by 12/20/2023. (Madrosen, Ian) (Filed on 11/24/2023)
November 9, 2023 Filing 49 Declaration of Dave Kiff in Support of #38 Show Cause Hearing, filed byCounty of Sonoma. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #38 ) (Lilligren, Matthew) (Filed on 11/9/2023)
November 9, 2023 Filing 48 Declaration of James Alexander in Support of #38 Show Cause Hearing, filed byCounty of Sonoma. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #38 ) (Lilligren, Matthew) (Filed on 11/9/2023)
November 9, 2023 Filing 47 RESPONSE Supplemental Declaration by City of Santa Rosa. (Fullerton, Raymond) (Filed on 11/9/2023)
November 9, 2023 Filing 46 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF IAN MADROSEN re EXPECTED DATE FOR POSTING NOTICE OF CLEARANCE re #38 Show Cause Hearing, by California Department of Transportation, Tony Tavares. (Madrosen, Ian) (Filed on 11/9/2023) Modified on 11/9/2023 (bar, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2023 Filing 45 SUMMONS Returned Executed California Department of Transportation served on 11/3/2023, answer due 11/24/2023. (bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2023)
October 30, 2023 Filing 44 Mail sent to Francisco Yanez returned as undeliverable re #15 Motion Hearing, Set Deadlines/Hearings. (bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2023)
October 30, 2023 Filing 43 Mail sent to Christine Van Skike returned as undeliverable re #15 Motion Hearing Set Deadlines/Hearings. (bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2023)
October 30, 2023 Filing 42 Mail sent to Fabiola Serrano-Gutierrez returned as undeliverable re #15 Motion Hearing Set Deadlines/Hearings. (bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2023)
October 30, 2023 Filing 41 Mail sent to Sabrina Lee Gulbey-Spurgeon returned as undeliverable re #15 Motion Hearing Set Deadlines/Hearings. (bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2023)
October 30, 2023 Filing 40 Mail sent to Nathan Delgado returned as undeliverable re #15 Motion Hearing Set Deadlines/Hearings(bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2023)
October 30, 2023 Filing 39 Mail sent to Edward Ballard returned as undeliverable re #15 Motion Hearing Set Deadlines/Hearings (bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2023)
October 27, 2023 Filing 38 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Show Cause Hearing held on 10/27/2023. Defendants shall file supplemental declarations by 3:00 p.m. 11/9/2023. Total Time in Court: 39 minutes. Court Reporter: Ruth Levine Ekhaus. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/27/2023)
October 27, 2023 Filing 37 CLERKS NOTICE RE ZOOM HEARING. The Order to Show Cause hearing scheduled for 10/27/2023 at 10:00 a.m. will be held via Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 26, 2023 Filing 36 Declaration of Fabiola Serrano Gutierrez in Support of #30 Response to Order to Show Cause, re issuance of a preliminary injunction filed byFabiola Serrano-Gutierrez. (Related document(s) #30 ) (Serrano-Gutierrez, Fabiola) (Filed on 10/26/2023)
October 26, 2023 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Maraskeshia Smith. Service waived by Maraskeshia Smith waiver sent on 10/26/2023, answer due 12/26/2023. (Fullerton, Raymond) (Filed on 10/26/2023)
October 26, 2023 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by City of Santa Rosa. Service waived by City of Santa Rosa waiver sent on 10/26/2023, answer due 12/26/2023. (Fullerton, Raymond) (Filed on 10/26/2023)
October 26, 2023 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Maria Christina Rivera. Service waived by Maria Christina Rivera waiver sent on 10/26/2023, answer due 12/26/2023. (Lilligren, Matthew) (Filed on 10/26/2023)
October 26, 2023 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by County of Sonoma. Service waived by County of Sonoma waiver sent on 10/26/2023, answer due 12/26/2023. (Lilligren, Matthew) (Filed on 10/26/2023)
October 26, 2023 Filing 31 Mail sent to William Floyd Cressy returned as undeliverable re #15 Motion Hearing Set Deadlines/Hearings. (bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2023)
October 25, 2023 Filing 30 Response to Order to Show Cause by Fabiola Serrano-Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Justin Milligan, #2 Declaration Christina Van Skike, #3 Declaration Sabrina Lee Gulley Spurgeon, #4 Declaration Nathan Delgado, #5 Declaration William Cressey)(Serrano-Gutierrez, Fabiola) (Filed on 10/25/2023)
October 23, 2023 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by California Department of Transportation, Tony Tavares re #23 Response to Order to Show Cause, #22 Response to Order to Show Cause, #24 Response to Order to Show Cause, #21 Response, Response to Order to Show Cause, #25 Response to Order to Show Cause (Madrosen, Ian) (Filed on 10/23/2023)
October 23, 2023 Filing 28 Proof of Service by City of Santa Rosa Proof of Service by Mail. (Fullerton, Raymond) (Filed on 10/23/2023) Modified on 10/23/2023 (bar, COURT STAFF).
October 23, 2023 Filing 27 Proof of Service by City of Santa Rosa Proof of Service by Email. (Fullerton, Raymond) (Filed on 10/23/2023) Modified on 10/23/2023 (bar, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2023 Filing 26 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by County of Sonoma, Maria Christina Rivera Response to OSC (#15) and Opposition to Request for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Umholtz in Support of Opposition, #2 Declaration of James Alexander in Support of Opposition, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Lilligren, Matthew) (Filed on 10/20/2023)
October 20, 2023 Filing 25 Response to Order to Show Cause #21 Response, Response to Order to Show Cause byCalifornia Department of Transportation, Tony Tavares. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration)(Madrosen, Ian) (Filed on 10/20/2023)
October 20, 2023 Filing 24 Response to Order to Show Cause #21 Response, Response to Order to Show Cause byCalifornia Department of Transportation, Tony Tavares. (Madrosen, Ian) (Filed on 10/20/2023)
October 20, 2023 Filing 23 Response to Order to Show Cause #21 Response, Response to Order to Show Cause byCalifornia Department of Transportation, Tony Tavares. (Madrosen, Ian) (Filed on 10/20/2023)
October 20, 2023 Filing 22 Response to Order to Show Cause #21 Response, Response to Order to Show Cause byCalifornia Department of Transportation, Tony Tavares. (Madrosen, Ian) (Filed on 10/20/2023)
October 20, 2023 Filing 21 Response re #1 Complaint,, , Response to Order to Show Cause byCalifornia Department of Transportation, Tony Tavares. (Madrosen, Ian) (Filed on 10/20/2023)
October 20, 2023 Filing 20 Declaration of Sergeant Tim Barrett in Support of #17 Response to Order to Show Cause filed byCity of Santa Rosa, Maraskeshia Smith. (Related document(s) #17 ) (Fullerton, Raymond) (Filed on 10/20/2023)
October 20, 2023 Filing 19 Declaration of Lee Rocchio in Support of #17 Response to Order to Show Cause filed byCity of Santa Rosa, Maraskeshia Smith. (Related document(s) #17 ) (Fullerton, Raymond) (Filed on 10/20/2023)
October 20, 2023 Filing 18 Declaration of Kelli Kuykendall in Support of #17 Response to Order to Show Cause filed byCity of Santa Rosa, Maraskeshia Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #17 ) (Fullerton, Raymond) (Filed on 10/20/2023)
October 20, 2023 Filing 17 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by City of Santa Rosa, Maraskeshia Smith . (Fullerton, Raymond) (Filed on 10/20/2023)
October 17, 2023 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to California Department of Transportation. (Attachments: #1 USM-285)(bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2023)
October 13, 2023 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 10/13/2023. Motions to proceed in forma paupers granted. The U.S. Marshal shall serve the California Department of Transportation with a copy of the Ex Parte Application for TRO and Preliminary Injunction, Verified Complaint For Injunctive Relief, any scheduling orders or other documents specified by the Clerk, and this Order, as soon as practicable and without prepayment of fees. Defendants' Response(s) to this Show Cause Order due by 10/20/2023. Plaintiffs' Replies due by 10/25/2023. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 10/27/2023 10:00 AM via videoconference. Total Time in Court: 18 minutes. Court Reporter: Stephen Franklin. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/13/2023)
October 13, 2023 Filing 14 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ) Opposition to TRO filed byCity of Santa Rosa, Maraskeshia Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Fullerton, Raymond) (Filed on 10/13/2023)
October 13, 2023 Filing 13 Response re #1 Complaint,, Ex Parte TRO byCounty of Sonoma, Maria Christina Rivera. (Lilligren, Matthew) (Filed on 10/13/2023)
October 13, 2023 Filing 12 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ) filed byCalifornia Department of Transportation, Tony Tavares. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Madrosen, Ian) (Filed on 10/13/2023)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON EMERGENCY MOTION FOR A TRO - Defendants shall file a response to #1 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Perliminary Injunction by 9:00 a.m. on 10/13/2023. Temporary Restraining Order Hearing set for 10/13/2023 02:00 PM. This proceeding will be held via Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2023)
October 12, 2023 Filing 10 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 1/9/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording, #2 Standing Orders)(bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 12, 2023 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by William Floyd Cressy. (bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2023)
October 12, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Francisco Yanez. (bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2023)
October 12, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by William Floyd Cressy. (bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2023)
October 12, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Sabrina Lee Gulbey-Spurgeon. (bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2023)
October 12, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Nathan Delgado. (bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2023)
October 12, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Fabiola Serrano-Gutierrez. (bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2023)
October 12, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Christine Van Skike. (bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2023)
October 12, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Edward Ballard. (bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2023)
October 12, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Ex Parte Application for TRO and Preliminary Injuction against California Department of Transportation, City of Santa Rosa, County of Sonoma, Maria Christina Rivera, Maraskeshia Smith, Tony Tavares. No Process Filed bySabrina Lee Gulbey-Spurgeon, Nathan Delgado, Edward Ballard, Francisco Yanez, William Floyd Cressy, Christine Van Skike, Fabiola Serrano-Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2023) Modified on 10/12/2023 (bar, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cressy et al v. California Department of Transportation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Floyd Cressy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Yanez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Van Skike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fabiola Serrano-Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Lee Gulbey-Spurgeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Transportation
Represented By: Ian Craig Madrosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Tavares
Represented By: Ian Craig Madrosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sonoma
Represented By: Matthew R. Lilligren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Christina Rivera
Represented By: Matthew R. Lilligren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Santa Rosa
Represented By: Raymond J. Fullerton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Manager Maraskeshia Smith
Represented By: Raymond J. Fullerton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?