Johnson v. Matheson Tri-Gas, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jason Johnson
Defendant: Matheson Tri-Gas, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv05375
Filed: October 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Referring Judge: Rita F Lin
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1365 Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING #20 JOINT STIPULATION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Rita F. Lin on 12/15/2023. (afm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2023)
December 15, 2023 Filing 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #17 Order on Stipulation, JOINT STIPULATION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS; [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Matheson Tri-Gas, Inc.. (Ocampo Nunez, Hazel) (Filed on 12/15/2023)
December 15, 2023 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 3/7/2024. (afm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2023)
November 30, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Boulton for Defendant Matheson Tri-Gas, Inc. (Boulton, Ashley) (Filed on 11/30/2023)
November 30, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Hazel Ocampo Nunez for Defendant Matheson Tri-Gas, Inc. (Ocampo Nunez, Hazel) (Filed on 11/30/2023)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order by Judge Rita F. Lin granting #16 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading and Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 2/21/2024. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 2/28/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2023)
November 17, 2023 Filing 16 JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT MATHESON TRI-GAS, INC., TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO COMPLAINT AND OTHER DEADLINES; DECLARATION; [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Matheson Tri-Gas, Inc.. (Boulton, Ashley) (Filed on 11/17/2023) Modified on 11/20/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
November 15, 2023 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE UPON REASSIGNMENT. You are noticed that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Rita F. Lin upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Lin's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-rita-f-rfl/. Case Management Statement due by 1/17/2024. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 1/24/2024, at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-rita-f-rfl/General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2023)
November 15, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Johnson. Matheson Tri-Gas, Inc. served on 10/30/2023, answer due 11/20/2023. (Cardona, Ryan) (Filed on 11/15/2023)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Rita F. Lin for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 11/15/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2023)
November 15, 2023 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety using the ECF event Summons Returned Executed. Re: #10 Certificate of Service filed by Jason Johnson. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2023)
November 14, 2023 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2023)
November 14, 2023 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jason Johnson.. (Cardona, Ryan) (Filed on 11/14/2023)
November 14, 2023 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jason Johnson re #1 Complaint, #7 Summons Issued (Cardona, Ryan) (Filed on 11/14/2023)
November 13, 2023 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 11/27/2023. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/27/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2023)
October 27, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Paul Cardona (Cardona, Ryan) (Filed on 10/27/2023)
October 20, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Matheson Tri-Gas, Inc.. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2023)
October 20, 2023 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/15/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2024 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2023)
October 20, 2023 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/3/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2023)
October 20, 2023 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Smith, Evan) (Filed on 10/20/2023)
October 20, 2023 Filing 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Jason Johnson re #1 Complaint, (Smith, Evan) (Filed on 10/20/2023)
October 20, 2023 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Jason Johnson re #1 Complaint, (Smith, Evan) (Filed on 10/20/2023)
October 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Matheson Tri-Gas, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18756750.). Filed byJason Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Notice of Violations, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Evan) (Filed on 10/20/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Matheson Tri-Gas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Johnson
Represented By: Evan Jason Smith
Represented By: Ryan Paul Cardona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matheson Tri-Gas, Inc.
Represented By: Hazel Ocampo Nunez
Represented By: Ashley Boulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?