Duckett v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Georgeann Duckett
Defendant: Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc, Actavis LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc, sanofi-aventis U.S LLC, Sandoz Inc., Accord Healthcare, Inc., McKesson Corporation doing business as McKesson Packaging, Hospira Worldwide, Inc., Hospira Inc, Sun Pharma Global FZE, Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories, Ltd., Pfizer Inc, Actavis Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc. and Sagent Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Case Number: 3:2023cv05631
Filed: November 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Referring Judge: Lisa J Cisneros
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by David Polyakov (Polyakov, David) (Filed on 12/18/2023)
November 16, 2023 Filing 14 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/2/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/9/2024 at 10:00 AM by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Friday, February 9, 2024, by no later than 12:00PM.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2023)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 11/16/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2023)
November 16, 2023 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2023)
November 15, 2023 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., sanofi-aventis U.S LLC.. (Weiler, Eva Marie) (Filed on 11/15/2023)
November 2, 2023 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff and Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/16/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2023)
November 1, 2023 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/25/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/1/2024 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2023)
November 1, 2023 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Acknowledging Receipt of Case transfer in from EASTERN DISTRICT OF LOUISIANA, 2:19-cv-10596-JTM-MBN. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2023)
November 1, 2023 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-10596. Case file, copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 11/1/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TRANSFER ORDER- Case transferred to Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, 16511)(nml)
September 28, 2023 Filing 5 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. JOINT DESIGNATION OF GENERAL AND CASE-SPECIFIC MDL RECORDS TO BE INCLUDED UPON REMAND (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Ratliff, Harley)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(ADI)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Accord Healthcare, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. (aj)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Accord Healthcare, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Sagent Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Sandoz Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7656420) filed by Georgeann Duckett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons)Attorney John Christopher Elliott added to party Georgeann Duckett(pty:pla).(Elliott, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duckett v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.
Represented By: Eva Marie Mannoia Weiler
Represented By: David Polyakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira Worldwide, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc
Represented By: Eva Marie Mannoia Weiler
Represented By: David Polyakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: sanofi-aventis U.S LLC
Represented By: Eva Marie Mannoia Weiler
Represented By: David Polyakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accord Healthcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation doing business as McKesson Packaging
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira Worldwide, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharma Global FZE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sagent Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgeann Duckett
Represented By: John Christopher Elliott
Represented By: Darin Lee Schanker
Represented By: Jere Kyle Bachus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?