Johnson v. Sanofi US Services Inc et al
Plaintiff: Gayle Johnson
Defendant: Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc
Case Number: 3:2023cv05773
Filed: November 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by David Polyakov (Polyakov, David) (Filed on 12/18/2023)
December 18, 2023 Filing 17 ***Filing Error. Disregard. See Corrected Entry #18 *** NOTICE of Appearance by David Polyakov (Polyakov, David) (Filed on 12/18/2023) Modified Text on 12/19/2023 (krp, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Rhett McSweeney. (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2023)
December 4, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18901297.) filed by Gayle Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(McSweeney, Rhett) (Filed on 12/4/2023)
November 22, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Moze Cowper (Cowper, Christopher) (Filed on 11/22/2023)
November 22, 2023 #Electronic filing error. Judge name or initials are missing. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should reference the correct judge name/initials on future filings. Re: #14 Notice of Appearance filed by Gayle Johnson (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2023)
November 20, 2023 Filing 13 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/9/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/16/2024 at 10:00 AM by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Friday, February 9, 2024, by no later than 12:00PM.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2023)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 11/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2023)
November 20, 2023 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2023)
November 17, 2023 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.. (Weiler, Eva Marie) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 9, 2023 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/5/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/12/2024 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2023)
November 9, 2023 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-12661. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TRANSFER ORDER- Case transferred to Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, 16511)(nml)
September 26, 2023 Filing 6 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. JOINT DESIGNATION OF GENERAL AND CASE-SPECIFIC MDL RECORDS TO BE INCLUDED UPON REMAND (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Ratliff, Harley)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI)
December 1, 2017 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (cc)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI)
November 17, 2017 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (Stall, Ellen)
November 17, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6479145) filed by Gayle Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Rhett A McSweeney added to party Gayle Johnson(pty:pla).(McSweeney, Rhett) (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/27/2017) (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Sanofi US Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.
Represented By: Eva Marie Mannoia Weiler
Represented By: David Polyakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Eva Marie Mannoia Weiler
Represented By: David Polyakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc
Represented By: Eva Marie Mannoia Weiler
Represented By: David Polyakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gayle Johnson
Represented By: David M Langevin
Represented By: Rhett A. McSweeney
Represented By: Christopher Moze Cowper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?