Pierre et al v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Lamartine Pierre, Mark Whitlock, Lynn-Marie Rodrigues and Marissa Williams
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv05981
Filed: November 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Pursuant to Local Rule 6-3 filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley M. Bauer, #2 Proposed Order)(Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 1/12/2024)
December 15, 2023 Filing 15 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendant Apple Inc. to Respond to the Complaint Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-1(a) filed by Apple Inc., Lamartine Pierre, Mark Whitlock, Lynn-Marie Rodrigues, and Marissa Williams. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 12/15/2023) Modified on 12/18/2023 (jml, COURT STAFF).
December 15, 2023 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple Inc. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 12/15/2023)
December 15, 2023 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple Inc. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 12/15/2023)
December 15, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Marie Bauer on behalf of Defendant Apple Inc. (Bauer, Ashley) (Filed on 12/15/2023)
December 15, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Meyers Ray on behalf of Defendant Apple Inc. (Ray, Sarah) (Filed on 12/15/2023)
December 15, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Belinda S Lee on behalf of Defendant Apple Inc. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 12/15/2023)
December 11, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marissa Williams, Lamartine Pierre, Lynn-Marie Rodrigues, Mark Whitlock. Apple Inc. served on 11/30/2023, answer due 12/21/2023. (Dunne, Brian) (Filed on 12/11/2023)
November 21, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc.. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2023)
November 21, 2023 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Dunne, Brian) (Filed on 11/21/2023)
November 21, 2023 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 2/9/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/16/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2023)
November 21, 2023 #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. The summons filed is missing the district for which it is being issued. Please make the correction and re-file the summons in its entirety. Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by Marissa Williams, Lamartine Pierre, Mark Whitlock, Lynn-Marie Rodrigues (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2023)
November 20, 2023 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Vince Chhabria. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2023) Modified on 11/20/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Yavar Bathaee (Bathaee, Yavar) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 17, 2023 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lamartine Pierre, Lynn-Marie Rodrigues, Mark Whitlock, Marissa Williams.. (Dunne, Brian) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 17, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Dunne, Brian) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. with jury demand ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18850461.). Filed by Marissa Williams, Lamartine Pierre, Lynn-Marie Rodrigues, Mark Whitlock. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dunne, Brian) (Filed on 11/17/2023) Modified on 11/21/2023 (jml, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierre et al v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamartine Pierre
Represented By: Yavar Bathaee
Represented By: Brian James Dunne
Represented By: Andrew C. Wolinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Whitlock
Represented By: Yavar Bathaee
Represented By: Brian James Dunne
Represented By: Andrew C. Wolinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn-Marie Rodrigues
Represented By: Yavar Bathaee
Represented By: Brian James Dunne
Represented By: Andrew C. Wolinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marissa Williams
Represented By: Yavar Bathaee
Represented By: Brian James Dunne
Represented By: Andrew C. Wolinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Belinda S Lee
Represented By: Ashley Marie Bauer
Represented By: Sarah Meyers Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?