Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund et al v. FE Demolition West, LLC
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund, Dan Reding, James E. Murray, Pension Trust Fund For Operating Engineers, Pensioned Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund, Operating Engineers And Participating Employers Pre-Apprentice, Apprentice And Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund, Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 Vacation, Holiday, And Sick Pay Trust Fund and Operating Engineers Local 3 Heavy And Highway Trust Fund
Defendant: FE Demolition West, LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv06079
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2023 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Initial Case Management Conference held via Zoom on 12/8/2023. Plaintiff informed the Court that defendant is not represented and they don't have the resources to obtain an attorney and would rather resolve the outstanding amounts through a payment plan with the stipulated judgment. Court concerned that the process was improper, with no indication that the complaint was served on the defendant. Plaintiff to file proof of service on the docket and obtain new signature from the defendant for the stipulated judgment. Any future renewed judgment to follow the verbiage as stated on the record regarding the Court retaining jurisdiction for purposes of enforcing the settlement. Court denied #10 Stipulated Judgment without prejudice for the reasons as stated on the record. Case Management Statement due by 2/2/2024. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/9/2024 at 10:00 AM by Videoconference Only. Total Time in Court: 10 minutes. Court Reporter: Hearing recorded via Zoom: 10:29 - 10:39. Plaintiff Attorney: Tino Do. Defendant Attorney: No appearance. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/8/2023)
December 1, 2023 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE PROVIDING ZOOM ACCESS AND REQUIRING ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF COUNSEL. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/8/2023 at 10:00 AM by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Monday, December 4, 2023, by no later than 4:00PM.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.),.(bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2023)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #10 Stipulated Judgment. A case management conference is scheduled for December 8, 2023, at 10:00 AM by Zoom. The parties do not need to file a case management statement beforehand. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on December 1, 2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2023)
November 27, 2023 Filing 10 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by James E. Murray, Operating Engineers And Participating Employers Pre-Apprentice, Apprentice And Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund, Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund, Operating Engineers Local 3 Heavy And Highway Trust Fund, Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 Vacation, Holiday, And Sick Pay Trust Fund, Pension Trust Fund For Operating Engineers, Pensioned Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund, Dan Reding. (Do, Tino) (Filed on 11/27/2023)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 11/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2023)
November 27, 2023 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2023)
November 24, 2023 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/19/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/26/2024 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (sec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2023)
November 24, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to FE Demolition West, LLC. (sec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2023)
November 22, 2023 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by James E. Murray, Operating Engineers And Participating Employers Pre-Apprentice, Apprentice And Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund, Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund, Operating Engineers Local 3 Heavy And Highway Trust Fund, Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 Vacation, Holiday, And Sick Pay Trust Fund, Pension Trust Fund For Operating Engineers, Pensioned Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund, Dan Reding.. (Do, Tino) (Filed on 11/22/2023)
November 22, 2023 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/6/2023. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2023)
November 22, 2023 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by James E. Murray, Operating Engineers And Participating Employers Pre-Apprentice, Apprentice And Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund, Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund, Operating Engineers Local 3 Heavy And Highway Trust Fund, Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 Vacation, Holiday, And Sick Pay Trust Fund, Pension Trust Fund For Operating Engineers, Pensioned Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund, Dan Reding re #1 Complaint,, #2 Proposed Summons (Do, Tino) (Filed on 11/22/2023)
November 22, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Do, Tino) (Filed on 11/22/2023)
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FE Demolition West, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18862666.). Filed by Operating Engineers And Participating Employers Pre-Apprentice, Apprentice And Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund, James E. Murray, Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 Vacation, Holiday, And Sick Pay Trust Fund, Dan Reding, Operating Engineers Local 3 Heavy And Highway Trust Fund, Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund, Pension Trust Fund For Operating Engineers, Pensioned Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Do, Tino) (Filed on 11/22/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund et al v. FE Demolition West, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Reding
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E. Murray
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pension Trust Fund For Operating Engineers
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pensioned Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers And Participating Employers Pre-Apprentice, Apprentice And Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 Vacation, Holiday, And Sick Pay Trust Fund
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local 3 Heavy And Highway Trust Fund
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FE Demolition West, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?