Stephens v. United Parcel Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nicholas Stephens
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv06081
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2024 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Counsel is instructed that all future filings shall bear the initials JSC immediately after the case number. Re: #13 Reply to Opposition/Response filed by United Parcel Service, Inc. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2024)
January 18, 2024 Filing 13 REPLY (re #6 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byUnited Parcel Service, Inc.. (Prine, Robert) (Filed on 1/18/2024)
January 2, 2024 Filing 12 Declaration of Nicholas Stephens in Support of #10 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Nicholas Stephens. (Related document(s) #10 ) (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2024)
December 29, 2023 Received one USB drive re: #11 EXHIBIT. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2023)
December 29, 2023 Filing 11 EXHIBIT 5 re #10 Opposition/Response to Motion and Proof of Service filed byNicholas Stephens. (Related document(s) #10 ) (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2023)
December 29, 2023 Filing 10 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #6 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed by Nicholas Stephens. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2023)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: PENDING MOTION TO DISMISS AND RESOURCES FOR UNREPRESENTED LITIGANTS. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/30/2023. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 11/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 30, 2023 Remark: ECF #9 mailed to plaintiff on 11/20/2023. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2023)
November 30, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 1/4/2024. Replies due by 1/18/2024. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2023)
November 30, 2023 Remark: ECF #9 emailed to Plaintiff at nickstephens120@yahoo.com on 11/30/2023. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2023)
November 29, 2023 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 29, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by United Parcel Service, Inc.. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 1/11/2024 01:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Responses due by 12/13/2023. Replies due by 12/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Prine, Robert) (Filed on 11/29/2023)
November 22, 2023 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United Parcel Service, Inc... (Prine, Robert) (Filed on 11/22/2023)
November 22, 2023 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/14/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/21/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 22, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/6/2023. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2023)
November 22, 2023 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by United Parcel Service, Inc. (Prine, Robert) (Filed on 11/22/2023)
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Court. Their case number is 23CV047357. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-18862972). Filed by United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Prine, Robert) (Filed on 11/22/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephens v. United Parcel Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Represented By: Robert D. Prine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?